Silicon Image, Inc. v. Analogix Semiconductor, Inc.

Plaintiff: Silicon Image, Inc.
Defendant: Analogix Semiconductor, Inc.
Counter-claimant: Analogix Semiconductor, Inc.
Counter-defendant: Silicon Image, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00635
Filed: January 31, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Santa Clara
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 5, 2008 235 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/5/8. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
November 21, 2008 231 Opinion or Order of the Court REDACTED ORDER FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 207 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Silicon Image, Inc., 175 REDACTED MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Analogix Semiconductor, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/3/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)
November 3, 2008 227 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO FILE UNDER SEAL COURT'S NOVEMBER 3, 2008 ORDER; re 226 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/3/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Silicon Image, Inc. v. Analogix Semiconductor, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Silicon Image, Inc.
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Analogix Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Darin Walter Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Analogix Semiconductor, Inc.
Represented By: Darin Walter Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Silicon Image, Inc.
Represented By: Jedediah Wakefield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?