Shubert et al v. Bush et al

Plaintiff: Virginia Shubert, Noha Arafa, Sarah Dranoff and Hilary Botein
Defendant: George W. Bush, Michael V. Hayden, Keith B. Alexander, Alberto Gonzales and John Ashcroft
Case Number: 3:2007cv00693
Filed: February 2, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Vaughn R. Walker
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1981 Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2015 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT ON FOURTH AMENDMENT CLAIM. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 5/20/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2015)
February 10, 2015 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 2/10/15. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2015)
September 30, 2014 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR EXCESS PAGES; DENYING REQUEST TO STRIKE CROSS-MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE AND CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/30/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2014)
August 11, 2014 144 Opinion or Order of the Court CORRECTED ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO UNSEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/11/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2014)
August 5, 2014 143 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO UNSEAL. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2014)
June 6, 2014 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING HEARING. APPLICATION TO ENFORCE Temporary Restraining Order Hearing set for 6/6/2014 02:00 PM.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/6/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/6/2014) Modified on 6/6/2014 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2014 125 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE EMERGENCY APPLICATION TO ENFORCE THE COURT'S TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 6/5/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2014)
April 1, 2014 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE UNDER SEAL DOCUMENTS. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 4/1/14. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2014)
August 5, 2013 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 99 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Case Management Statement due by 9/20/2013. Case Management Conference set for 9/27/2013 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 5, 2013. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2013)
July 23, 2013 98 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 23, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2013)
July 8, 2013 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING IN PART and DEFERRING RULING IN PART 69 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2013)
February 27, 2013 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 27, 2013. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/27/2013)
December 12, 2012 81 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS FOR HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 12, 2012. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2012)
October 25, 2012 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING (78 in 3:07-cv-00693-JSW) STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Govt. Defs. to File their Reply in Supp. of Summ. Judgment. Replies due by 11/2/2012.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2012)
October 17, 2012 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 74 STIPULATION TO DEEM CERTAIN DOCUMENTS FILED. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/17/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2012)
October 3, 2012 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING STIPULATION TO RESET BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 10/3/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2012)
September 25, 2012 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 67 STIPULATION RE: Request to Reset Hearing Date; Set Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 10/18/2012. Replies due by 10/26/2012. Motion Hearing set for 12/14/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 9/25/12. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/25/2012)
September 6, 2012 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, Case reassigned to Hon. Yvonne Gonzalez-Rogers. Hon. Vaughn R. Walker no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 9/6/12. (ha, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2012)
February 4, 2010 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re (Doc #46 in 3:07-cv-00693-VRW, Doc #703 in M:06-cv-01791-VRW) 1/21/2010 Order on Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 2/4/2010. (hlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2010)
November 3, 2009 42 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re doc 36 THIRD STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE RENEWED MOTION TO DISMISS AND FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT filed by United States of America. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 11/2/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 29, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER. Government's motion due 10/30/09; plaintiffs' opposition due 12/04/09; reply due 12/08/09; hearing 12/15/09 at 10:00 am. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/28/09. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 22, 2009 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 Stipulation filed by United States of America. Govt to file motion no later than 10/27/2009. Opposition due no later than 12/2/2009. Reply due no later than 12/8/2009. Hearing on Govt Defendants motion to dismiss and for summary judgment 12/15/2009 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/21/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
October 7, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER granting doc 32 in C07-0693 Shubert v Bush filed by United States of America. The government defendants' renewed motion to dismiss and for summary judgment shall be filed no later than 10/20/2009. The plaintiffs' op position to that motion shall be filed no later than 11/24/2009. Reply shall be filed no later than 12/4/2009. The hearing shall remain set for 12/15/2009 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 10/7/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
May 14, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 25 Letter filed by Hilary Botein, Virginia Shubert, Sarah Dranoff, Noha Arafa. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 5/14/2009. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shubert et al v. Bush et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Virginia Shubert
Represented By: Ilann Margalit Maazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Noha Arafa
Represented By: Ilann Margalit Maazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Dranoff
Represented By: Ilann Margalit Maazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hilary Botein
Represented By: Ilann Margalit Maazel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George W. Bush
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael V. Hayden
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith B. Alexander
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alberto Gonzales
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Ashcroft
Represented By: Alexander Kenneth Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?