Hile v. Max Rave, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Zachary Hile
Defendant: Max Rave, LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv00738
Filed: February 5, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 34 Stipulation of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
June 5, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 15 Stipulation for Extension re Submission on ReAssignment to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on June 5, 2007. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2007)
May 24, 2007 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 10 Stipulation selecting Mediation. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/24/07. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/24/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hile v. Max Rave, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Rave, LLC
Represented By: Maryn Louise Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zachary Hile
Represented By: Eric A. Grover
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?