Mann v. Lee et al

Plaintiff: Jesse Mann
Defendant: C. Lee, Bowman and Milner
Case Number: 3:2007cv00781
Filed: February 6, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 22, 2009 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 41 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION AND DISCOVERY; GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO OPPOSE MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; SCHEDULING REPLY. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 22, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
September 24, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 37 PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; DENYING 36 MOTION FOR HEARING ON ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 24, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
February 26, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 29 DEFENDANTS' FIRST REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 26, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
January 26, 2009 28 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING 21 MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT; DENYING 27 MOTION TO APPOINT PRIVATE INVESTIGATOR OR ORDER PERSONAL SERVICE ON DEFENDANTS; DIRECTING DEPUTY ATTORNEY GENERAL TO SECURE WAIVERS OF SERVICE FROM DEFENDANTS AND FILE APPEARANCE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mann v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bowman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Milner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Mann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?