Yates v. Nimeh et al

Plaintiff: Royal Yates
Defendant: Kinan Nimeh and Syed Zaidi
Case Number: 3:2007cv00798
Filed: February 7, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 21, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 6/24/2009 10:00 AM. Show Cause Response due by 6/10/2009.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/21/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 18, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO DEFENDANT KINAN NIMEH. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/18/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
April 13, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Defendant Kinan Nimeh's Request to Excuse Attendance at Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/13/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
April 10, 2009 53 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/10/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
March 12, 2009 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/12/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 18, 2009 46 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/18/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/18/2009)
December 16, 2008 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/16/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yates v. Nimeh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kinan Nimeh
Represented By: Robert Todd Sullwold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Syed Zaidi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Royal Yates
Represented By: Laurence Fred Padway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?