Wamboldt v. Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.

Plaintiff: Steven Wamboldt
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv00884
Filed: February 12, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Diego
Presiding Judge: Phyllis J. Hamilton
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 190 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE, ***Civil Case Terminated. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/9/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
April 12, 2012 185 Opinion or Order of the Court REVISED CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 4/12/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2012)
March 23, 2011 179 Opinion or Order of the Court CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER re 178 Case Management Conference - Further. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/23/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2011)
January 21, 2011 175 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE TO MARCH 10, 2011 AT 2:00 P.M.; Case Management Conference reset to 3/10/2011 at 2:00 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/21/2011. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2011)
January 10, 2011 173 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 172 Stipulation filed by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/27/2011. Case Management Conference set for 2/3/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/10/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 9, 2010 170 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Joint Case Management Statement due by 1/6/2011. Further Case Management Conference set for 1/13/2011 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/9/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2010)
October 20, 2010 169 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 168 Joint Case Management Statement filed by Steven Wamboldt, Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/20/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 165 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Hamilton Granting 142 Motion to Decertify Class (pjhlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
March 15, 2010 139 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO SET CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 138 Letter filed by Steven Wamboldt. Joint Case Management Statement due by 4/15/2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/22/2010 02:00 PM. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/15/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
December 10, 2008 127 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re 126 Stipulation filed by Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/10/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2008)
February 12, 2007 3 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 2 ADR Scheduling Order (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wamboldt v. Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wamboldt
Represented By: Jeremy R. Fietz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Robert William Tollen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?