Levi Strauss & Co. v. Esprit US Distribution, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co.
Defendant: Esprit US Distribution, Ltd.
Mediator: Christopher D. Sullivan
Case Number: 3:2007cv00910
Filed: February 13, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER OF DISMISSAL UPON SETTLEMENT with prejduice. Within 90 days of the date hereof, that settlement has not in fact occurred, the foregoing order shall be vacated and this cause shall forthwith be restored to the calendar for further proceedings. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER continuing motion and case management to 8/21/09 at 9 am and 3:00 pm, respectively (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 196 sealing ORDER re 194 . (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER RE: SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTIONS AND MOTION TO STAY (SIGNED) (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
September 30, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER granting to file under seal portions of the Declaration of Gia L. Cincone in opposition motion of defendants Esprit US Distribution, Ltd. and Esprit International for partial Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Susan Illston on 9/29/08. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER by Judge Alsup denying 117 Motion to Seal ; Counsel to contact clerk re: return of original documents (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER GRANTING 51 PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Levi Strauss & Co. v. Esprit US Distribution, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Levi Strauss & Co.
Represented By: Gregory S. Gilchrist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esprit US Distribution, Ltd.
Represented By: John Paul Margiotta, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Christopher D. Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?