Parrish et al v. National Football League Players Incorporated Featured Case

Plaintiff, a class of retired National Football League (NFL) players, seeks an accounting of funds received and distributed by defendant National Football League Players Inc. in connection with its promotional, marketing and licensing businesses conducted on behalf of plaintiffs.

Plaintiff: Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley and Walter Roberts, III
Defendant: National Football League Players Incorporated and National Football League Players Association
Case Number: 3:2007cv00943
Filed: February 14, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2010 Filing 743 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/10/2011. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 742 ORDER REGARDING FINAL ROUND OF SETTLEMENT PAYMENTS TO THE CLASS by Judge Alsup taking under advisement 739 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 Filing 741 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 740 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 740 ORDER SEALING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS by Judge Alsup granting 737 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 739 Supplemental MOTION -- Class Counsels' Supplemental Interim report Regarding Payments to the GLA re 732 MOTION -- Class Counsels' Further Interim Report Regarding Payments to the GLA Class and Motion Regarding Irregular Claim Forms, 725 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,,, filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 738 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley -- Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit A to the Declaration of Ronald S. Katz (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 Filing 737 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
October 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 736 ORDER GRANTING CLASS COUNSEL'S MOTION RE PAYMENTS TO THE CLASS AND IRREGULAR CLAIM FORMS by Judge Alsup granting 732 Motion for Approval of Payments to GLA Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 735 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 734 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 1 to Katz Declaration 733 by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2 to Katz Declaration 733 )(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 734 ORDER SEALING CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS by Judge Alsup granting 729 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 733 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 732 MOTION -- Class Counsels' Further Interim Report Regarding Payments to the GLA Class and Motion Regarding Irregular Claim Forms filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 732 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 732 MOTION -- Class Counsels' Further Interim Report Regarding Payments to the GLA Class and Motion Regarding Irregular Claim Forms filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 731 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley of Manual Filing of Exhibits 1-2 to the Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of Class Counsels' Further Interim Report Regarding Payments to the GLA Class and Motion Regarding Irregular Claim Forms (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 730 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 729 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 729 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 Filing 729 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 728 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR REIMBURSEMENT OF MCKOOL SMITH by Judge Alsup granting 726 Motion for Reimbursement (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 727 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 726 MOTION for Approval of Reimbursement to McKool Smith, P.C. filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 726 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Filing 726 MOTION for Approval of Reimbursement to McKool Smith, P.C. filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 725 ORDER APPROVING FINAL ROUND OF PAYMENTS TO THE GLA CLASS by Judge Alsup denying 692 Motion for Approval of Final Payments to the GLA Class; granting 720 Motion for Approval of Final Payments to the GLA Class (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/12/2010)
October 8, 2010 Filing 724 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 723 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 2, # 2 Exhibit 3, # 3 Exhibit 4, # 4 Exhibit 5)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 723 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting 718 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 722 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 720 MOTION For Final Order Approving Payments to GLA Class filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Declaration, # 2 Exhibit B to Declaration, # 3 Exhibit C to Declaration, # 4 Exhibit D to Declaration)(Related document(s) 720 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 721 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 720 MOTION For Final Order Approving Payments to GLA Class filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 6 to Declaration)(Related document(s) 720 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 720 MOTION For Final Order Approving Payments to GLA Class filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
October 5, 2010 Filing 719 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, THIS IS NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH G.O. 62*** NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits 1-5 to the Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of Class Counsels' Status Update and Motion for Final Order Approving Payments to the GLA Class (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/5/2010) Modified on 10/6/2010 (gba, COURT STAFF).
October 5, 2010 Filing 718 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Materials filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in support of Miscellaneous Administrative Request, # 2 Proposed Order Sealing Confidential Documents)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
August 31, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 717 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: (28 in 3:10-cv-03200-WHA) MOTION for Recusal of United States District Judge William H. Alsup filed by Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP (rcs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2010)
August 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 716 ORDER REGARDING RELATED CASES AND REFERRAL OF PENDING MOTION FOR RECUSAL: (28 in 3:10-cv-03200-WHA) MOTION for Recusal -Notice of Motion and Motion for Recusal of United States District Judge William H. Alsup and Request That Motion Be Heard By A Different Judge filed by Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 30, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2010)
August 25, 2010 Filing 715 Transcript of Proceedings held on 7-30-09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/23/2010. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 714 ORDER AUTHORIZING THIRD ROUND OF MAILINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 13, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Filing 713 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 712 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Ronald S. Katz 711 in support of Response to July 21, 2010 Order by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 712 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SEAL by Judge Alsup granting 707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 711 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 709 Response to July 21, 2010 Order filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2 - Cover Sheet only, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 709 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 710 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 709 Response to July 21, 2010 Order filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 709 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 709 Response re 701 Order Class Counsels' Response to July 21, 2010 Order byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 708 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit 2 to the Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of Class Counsels Response to July 21, 2010 Order (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Filing 707 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials under Seal filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 706 ORDER RELATING CASE. Cases C07-0943 WHA and C10-3200 SI are related. The more recently filed case shall be reassigned to Judge Alsup. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/12/10. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 2, 2010 Filing 705 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish OF RELATED CASE (Blecher, Maxwell) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
August 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 704 ORDER REGARDING REQUEST FOR STATUS CONFERENCE AND EXTENSION OF TIME. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 2, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 703 Letter from Ronald S. Katz to Judge William H. Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Parrish-Manatt Complaint)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 28, 2010 Filing 702 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11/19/2009, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lydia Zinn, Telephone number (415) 531-6587. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/26/2010. (Zinn, Lydia) (Filed on 7/28/2010)
July 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 701 ORDER APPROVING ADDITIONAL SEARCHES AND MAILINGS. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 21, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 19, 2010 Filing 700 RESPONSE to re 699 Order -- Class Counsels' and Defendants' Response to July 12, 2010 Order by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/19/2010)
July 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 699 ORDER REGARDING UNDELIVERABLE CLAIM FORMS. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 12, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 12, 2010 Filing 698 Response re 697 Order Class Counsels' Response to July 6, 2010 Order byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Supplemental Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair, # 2 Supplemental Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/12/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 697 QUESTIONS FOR COUNSEL REGARDING PENDING MOTION TO APPROVE FINAL DISTRIBUTION OF SETTLEMENT FUNDS. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 6, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Filing 696 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 695 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal -- Exhibit F to Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 695 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO FILE CONFIDENTIAL DOCUMENTS UNDER SEAL by Judge Alsup granting 690 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 694 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 692 MOTION for Approval Re Second Distribution from the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 692 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 693 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 692 MOTION for Approval Re Second Distribution from the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Cover Page for Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 692 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 692 MOTION for Approval Re Second Distribution from the Settlement Fund filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 691 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibit F to the Declaration of Lewis T. Leclair in Support of Class Counsels Motion for Approval Re Second Distribution from the Settlement Fund (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 2, 2010 Filing 690 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Materials filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz, # 2 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 689 ORDER GRANTING FIFTH MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE COSTS FROM SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge Alsup granting 687 Motion for Payment of Admin Costs (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 688 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 687 Fifth MOTION Regarding Payment of Administration Costs from the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 687 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
May 27, 2010 Filing 687 Fifth MOTION Regarding Payment of Administration Costs from the Settlement Fund filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 7/8/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 5/27/2010)
April 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 686 ORDER GRANTING CLASS COUNSEL'S MOTION REGARDING PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE COSTS by Judge Alsup granting 684 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 685 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 684 Fourth MOTION Payment of Administration Costs from the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 684 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 Filing 684 Fourth MOTION Payment of Administration Costs from the Settlement Fund filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 6/17/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Fourth Motion)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 683 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 681 Notice (Other) Class Counsels' Notice Regarding Distributions from the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 681 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 682 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 681 Notice (Other) Class Counsels' Notice Regarding Distributions from the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 681 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 22, 2010 Filing 681 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley Class Counsels' Notice Regarding Distributions from the Settlement Fund (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 680 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF ADMINISTRATIVE COSTS FROM SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge Alsup granting 678 Motion for Payment of Administrative Costs (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 679 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 678 Third MOTION Regarding Payment of Administration Costs From the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 678 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
March 11, 2010 Filing 678 Third MOTION Regarding Payment of Administration Costs From the Settlement Fund filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
February 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 677 ORDER GRANTING CLASS COUNSELS' SECOND MOTION FOR PAYMENT OF ADMIN COSTS FROM SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge Alsup granting 675 Motion Payment of Admin Costs (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 676 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 675 Second MOTION Regarding Payment of Administration Costs from the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 675 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
February 1, 2010 Filing 675 Second MOTION Regarding Payment of Administration Costs from the Settlement Fund filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 3/11/2010 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
December 16, 2009 Filing 674 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 673 Notice (Other) Class Counsels' Notice of Compliance with Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 673 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
December 16, 2009 Filing 673 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley Class Counsels' Notice of Compliance with Order Granting Final Approval of Settlement (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 671 ORDER GRANTING MOTION REGARDING PAYMENT OF ADMIN COSTS FROM SETTLEMENT FUND by Judge Alsup granting 667 Motion to Pay Administrative Costs from Fund (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 670 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT AND DISTRIBUTION PLAN by Judge Alsup granting 652 Motion for Settlement (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 669 ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES, COSTS, AND COMPENSATION FOR CLASS REPRESENTATIVE ON CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Judge William Alsup [granting in part and denying in part 642 Motion for Attorney Fees]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2009)
November 20, 2009 Filing 668 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 667 MOTION Regarding Payment of Administration Costs from the Settlement Fund filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 667 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 20, 2009 Filing 667 MOTION Regarding Payment of Administration Costs from the Settlement Fund filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 19, 2009 Filing 672 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 11/19/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/19/2009). Settlement and Plan of Distribution is approved. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2009)
November 18, 2009 Filing 666 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 665 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 665 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 18, 2009 Filing 665 RESPONSE to re 664 Order -- Class Counsels' Response to November 17, 2009 Order by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 664 ORDER SEEKING ADDITIONAL RESPONSE BY CLASS COUNSEL TO OBJECTIONS RE CLASS LIST. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 17, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 Filing 663 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 652 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and of Proposed Plan of Distribution, 662 Response ( Non Motion ), 661 Order -- Revised Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough Re: Class Notification filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 652 , 662 , 661 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Filing 662 RESPONSE to re 661 Order by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 661 ORDER REGARDING EXHIBIT A OF DECLARATION OF JENNIFER M. KEOUGH RE CLASS NOTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 12, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 660 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley Re Unavailability of Class Representative Herbert Anthony Adderley (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 659 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley re 635 Order on Motion for Settlement -- Class Counsels' Notice of Compliance with Paragraph 4 of Court's Order Preliminarily Approving Proposed Settlement (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 658 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 657 Response ( Non Motion ) filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 657 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 Filing 657 RESPONSE to Objections and Class Counsels' Objection to Participation By Non-Class Members in Any Phase of the Settlement Proceedings by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
October 19, 2009 Filing 656 NOTICE by National Football League Players Association, National Football League Players Incorporated Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Paragraph 4 of Court's Order Preliminarily Approving Proposed Settlement (Samel, Charles) (Filed on 10/19/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 655 Declaration of Herbert Anthony Adderley in Support of 652 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and of Proposed Plan of Distribution filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 652 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 654 Declaration of Jennifer M. Keough in Support of 652 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and of Proposed Plan of Distribution filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 652 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 653 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 652 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and of Proposed Plan of Distribution filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 652 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 15, 2009 Filing 652 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Final Approval of Settlement and of Proposed Plan of Distribution filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 11/19/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
October 14, 2009 Filing 650 NOTICE RE OBJECTIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 14, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 651 Letter re: settlement from Billy Ray Barnes. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 649 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League Players Association, National Football League Players Incorporated re 648 Affidavit, 647 Notice (Other) Proof of Service (Samel, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 648 AFFIDAVIT re 647 Notice (Other) Decl. of Joel K. Botzet in Support of Defendants' Notice of Compliance with Requirements of the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005, 28 U.S.C. § 1715, Exhibits A & B by National Football League Players Association, National Football League Players Incorporated. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit)(Samel, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 13, 2009 Filing 647 NOTICE by National Football League Players Association, National Football League Players Incorporated Notice of Compliance with Requirements of the Class Action Fairness Act of 2005, 28 U.S.C. § 1715 (Samel, Charles) (Filed on 10/13/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 646 EXHIBIT D re 644 Declaration in Support, filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley, Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III. (Related document(s) 644 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 645 EXHIBIT D re 643 Declaration in Support, filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley, Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III. (Related document(s) 643 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 644 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 642 MOTION for Attorney Fees -- Class Counsels' Renewed Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 642 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 643 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 642 MOTION for Attorney Fees -- Class Counsels' Renewed Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 642 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 642 MOTION for Attorney Fees -- Class Counsels' Renewed Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 11/17/2009 02:00 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
October 2, 2009 Filing 641 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley -- Notice of Manual Filing of Exhibits to Declarations in Support of Class Counsels' Renewed Application for Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/2/2009)
September 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 640 ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION by Judge Alsup (re 638 Motion for Leave to File). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 15, 2009 Filing 639 SECOND NOTICE RE BERNARD PAUL PARRISH. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2009)
September 4, 2009 Filing 638 MOTION for Leave to File -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration of Order Re Attorney's Fees and Costs; Exhibit A filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 2, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 637 ORDER RE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 2, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
August 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 636 ORDER RE BERNARD PAUL PARRISH. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 20, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 18, 2009 Set/Reset Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 11/19/2009 02:00 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 635 ORDER PRELIMINARILY APPROVING PROPOSED SETTLEMENT by Judge Alsup (re 623 Motion for Settlement). (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 Filing 634 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley re 630 Notice (Other) -- Class Counsels' Notice of Attempts to Comply with August 7, 2009 Order re Bernard Paul Parrish (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 633 EXHIBITS re 632 Notice (Other) -- Exhibit A to the Notice of Class Action Settlement filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 632 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 632 NOTICE by Herbert Anthony Adderley -- Notice of Class Action Settlement (Attachments: # 1 Order Preliminarily Approving Proposed Settlement)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 Filing 631 Letter from Chad S. Hummel to The Honorable William Alsup. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 7, 2009 Filing 630 NOTICE RE BERNARD PAUL PARRISH. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 7, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 6, 2009 Filing 629 NOTICE RE AMENDED SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 6, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
August 4, 2009 Filing 627 Letter from Chad S. Hummel to the Honorable William Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Hummel, Chad) (Filed on 8/4/2009).
August 4, 2009 Filing 626 Letter from Chad S. Hummel to The Honorable William Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Hummel, Chad) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
July 30, 2009 Filing 628 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/30/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/30/2009) re 623 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/30/2009)
July 21, 2009 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 623 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement. Motion Hearing set for 7/30/2009 02:00 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 625 STIPULATION AND ORDER SHORTENING HEARING DATE FOR MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 20, 2009. Hearing date rescheduled for 2:00 p.m. on July 30, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 13, 2009 Filing 624 STIPULATION re 623 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement -- Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Shortening Hearing Date for Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement by Herbert Anthony Adderley . (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/13/2009) Modified on 7/14/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
July 13, 2009 Filing 623 MOTION for Settlement -- Notice of Motion and Motion for Preliminary Approval of Settlement filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 8/20/2009 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/13/2009) Modified on 7/14/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2009 Filing 622 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
July 1, 2009 Filing 621 MANDATE of USCA- Appeal is dismissed without prejudice to reinstatement as to 612 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
June 30, 2009 Filing 620 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles H. Samel (Samel, Charles) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 12, 2009 Filing 619 Letter from Chad S. Hummel -- Re Court Approval for Class Settlement. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 6/12/2009)
June 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 618 ORDER RE REPORTED SETTLEMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 11, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
March 3, 2009 Filing 617 Certificate of Record Mailed to USCA re appeal 612 Notice of Appeal, (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
March 2, 2009 Filing 616 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION and Ordering Form by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Greenspan, David) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
February 11, 2009 Filing 615 USCA Case Number 09-15226 Ninth Circuit for 612 Notice of Appeal,,, filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009)
February 4, 2009 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 612 Notice of Appeal(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 4, 2009 Filing 614 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 613 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association re 612 Notice of Appeal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
February 3, 2009 Filing 612 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to 391 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Shorten Time, 353 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Summary Judgment, 275 Order on Motion to Certify Class, Order on Motion to Strike, Order on Motion for Leave to File, 611 Judgment, 605 Order on Motion to Shorten Time,, Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law,, Order on Motion for Bill of Costs,, Order on Motion for Attorney Fees, 494 Order, 563 Judgment 557 497 492 500 505 523 524 525 526 554 555 556 557 558 559 560 - Minute Entries, 561 Jury Verdict, 562 Jury Verdict re: Damages by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Filing fee $ 455. Receipt No. 34611028384. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 28, 2009 Filing 611 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/28/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 610 ORDER RE FINALITY. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/28/2009. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 609 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley Memorandum re Finality of Judgment and Plan of Distribution to Class Members (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 27, 2009 Filing 608 Letter Brief in Response to the Court's Request in Its January 13, 2009 Order filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
January 20, 2009 Filing 607 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1-8-09, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 925-212-5224. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/17/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 605 ORDER DENYING ALL POST-TRIAL MOTIONS by Judge William Alsup [denying 573 Motion to Shorten Time; denying 580 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; denying 583 Motion for Bill of Costs; denying 584 Motion for Attorney Fees]. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 13, 2009 Filing 604 NOTICE OF FILINGS OF TWO DRAFT CHARGES TO THE JURY PROVIDED TO COUNSEL ON OCTOBER 30 AND NOVEMBER 4, 2008. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 1/13/2009. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix Instructions Provided 10/31/2008, # 2 Appendix Instructions Provided 11/4/2008)(whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
January 12, 2009 Filing 603 Letter Brief in Response to Plaintiffs' Submission Dated January 9, 2009 filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 9, 2009 Filing 602 Brief Plaintiffs' Submission of Three Examples of Non-Speculative Ways Jury Could Have Reasonably Awarded $7.1 Million Compensatory Class-Wide Damages Based on Evidence in Trial Record filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 1/9/2009)
January 8, 2009 Filing 606 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 1/8/2009 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 1/8/2009) re 580 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association, 584 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/8/2009)
December 26, 2008 Filing 601 Declaration of Ian Papendick in Support of 600 Reply Memorandum, Defendants' Reply Brief in Further Support of Their Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 600 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 12/26/2008)
December 26, 2008 Filing 600 Reply Memorandum re 580 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 12/26/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 599 Reply Memorandum re 584 MOTION for Attorney Fees --Class Counsel's Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley, as well as Determination of Form of Class Notice and -- Class Counsels' Reply in Support of Their Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 23, 2008 Filing 598 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motions Hearing set for 1/8/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 597 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 596 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q pt 1, # 18 Exhibit Q pt 2, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S pt 1, # 21 Exhibit S pt 2a, # 22 Exhibit S 2b, # 23 Exhibit S pt 3, # 24 Exhibit S pt 4, # 25 Exhibit S pt 5, # 26 Exhibit S pt 6, # 27 Exhibit T pt 1, # 28 Exhibit T pt 2, # 29 Exhibit U, # 30 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) 596 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 596 Memorandum in Opposition re 580 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 595 Response Defendants' Response To Class Counsel's Fee Application For Preliminary And Final Determination Of Costs, Fees, Expenses, And An Incentive Payment For Class Representative, Herbert Adderley byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 18, 2008 Filing 594 NOTICE RE JANUARY 8, 2009, CALENDAR. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/17/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 11, 2008 Filing 593 OBJECTIONS to 583 Plaintiffs' Bill of Costs by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 12/11/2008) Modified on 12/12/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 9, 2008 Filing 592 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
December 8, 2008 Filing 591 MANDATE of USCA - Appeal is dismissed for failure to prosecute as to 507 Notice of Appeal, filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 590 ORDER RE LETTER DATED DECEMBER 2, 2008 [re 588 Letter Brief, filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 12/3/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 589 Proposed Order re 588 Letter Brief, REGARDING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY AND FINAL DETERMINATION OF COSTS, FEES, EXPENSES AND AN INCENTIVE PAYMENT FOR CLASS REPRESENTATIVE HERBERT ADDERLEY AND PLAINTIFFS BILL OF COSTS by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
December 2, 2008 Filing 588 Letter Brief REGARDING PLAINTIFFS APPLICATION FOR PRELIMINARY AND FINAL DETERMINATION OF COSTS, FEES, EXPENSES AND AN INCENTIVE PAYMENT FOR CLASS REPRESENTATIVE HERBERT ADDERLEY AND PLAINTIFFS BILL OF COSTS filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 587 Declaration of Herbert Anthony Adderley in Support of 584 MOTION for Attorney Fees --Class Counsel's Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley, as well as Determination of Form of Class Notice and filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 584 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 586 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 584 MOTION for Attorney Fees --Class Counsel's Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley, as well as Determination of Form of Class Notice and filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 584 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 585 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 584 MOTION for Attorney Fees --Class Counsel's Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley, as well as Determination of Form of Class Notice and filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 584 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 584 MOTION for Attorney Fees --Class Counsel's Application for Preliminary and Final Determination of Costs, Fees, Expenses, and an Incentive Payment for Class Representative, Herbert Adderley, as well as Determination of Form of Class Notice and Scheduling Order filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 1/8/2009 08:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 583 MOTION for Bill of Costs filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 582 Proposed Order re 580 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, 581 Declaration in Support, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 581 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 580 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 580 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 26, 2008 Filing 580 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 24, 2008 Filing 579 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley to the Court of an Apparent Communication From a Juror (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Notice)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 578 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT PENDING DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANTS' RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Judge Alsup granting 571 Motion to Stay (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 576 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATION ON RENEWED MOTION FOR JUDGMENT AS A MATTER OF LAW by Judge Alsup granting 567 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 575 Proposed Order re 573 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Disposition of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 574 Declaration of Ian Papendick in Support of 573 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Disposition of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 573 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 573 MOTION to Shorten Time Defendants' Motion for Stay of Execution of Judgment Pending Disposition of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 572 Proposed Order re 571 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Disposition of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 18, 2008 Filing 571 MOTION to Stay Execution of Judgment Pending Disposition of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 577 Exhibit Location - 3 Boxes - Bin #31; 1 manila envelope - sealed document - Bin #7. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/19/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/22/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 14, 2008 Filing 570 Brief Statement in Response to Court's Request for Information re Disposition of Award and Award of Attorneys' Fees and Costs filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 569 Proposed Order re 567 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 568 Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of 567 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 567 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 567 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages on Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 566 Letter from Defendants Re Distribution Plan and Attorneys' Fees. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 14, 2008 Filing 565 Jury Notes. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008)
November 13, 2008 Filing 564 Trial Sheet, Exhibit and Witness List. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
November 12, 2008 Filing 563 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 12, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 562 JURY VERDICT FORM RE PUNITIVE DAMAGES. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 561 JURY VERDICT. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 560 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 11/10/2008 before William Alsup. Jury reached a verdict in favor of plaintiff. Punitive Damages trial immediately followed. Plt called witness R. Berthelsen. Closing arguments and instruction given. Jury deliberated and reached a verdict. (Date Filed: 11/10/2008). (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 553 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-10-08, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Powell Sullivan, CSR, RPR, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 10, 2008 Filing 552 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 31, 2008, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, CSR, RPR, CRR, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2009. (Sullivan, Katherine) (Filed on 11/10/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 559 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 11/7/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/7/2008). Closing Arguments. Court gave the jury instructions. Jury began deliberations. Further Jury Trial set for 11/10/2008 07:45 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 551 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-7-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 550 Exhibit List -- Joint List of Admitted Trial Exhibits by Herbert Anthony Adderley.. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 7, 2008 Filing 549 Final Jury Instructions. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/7/2008)
November 6, 2008 Filing 558 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 11/6/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/6/2008). Chargin Conference held. Further Jury Trial set for 11/7/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/6/2008)
November 6, 2008 Filing 548 Letter Brief -- Letter from L. Peter Parcher to Judge Alsup filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Letter from L. Peter Parcher to Judge Alsup)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 6, 2008 Filing 547 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-6-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 6, 2008 Filing 546 Jury Instructions for Closing Arguments (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Special Verdict Form)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 557 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 11/5/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/5/2008). Dfts witnesses: R. Noll and E. Upshaw (by deposition). Plt's rebuttal witness H. Skull (by deposition). Charging conference set for 11/6/08. Counsel argued dfts' Rule 50 Motion. Jury Trial set for 11/7/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 545 Reply Memorandum to Defendants' Brief re: "Court's Draft Charge to the Jury" provided November 4, 2008 filed byHerbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 544 Letter Brief Defendants' Reply Letter Brief Regarding Defendants' Motion for an Instruction to the Jury to Disregard Plaintiffs' Hypothetical filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 543 Reply Memorandum Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' November 5, 2008 Brief Re: "Court's Draft Charge to the Jury" Provided November 4, 2008 filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 542 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-5-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/2/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 541 Brief Defendants' Memorandum Regarding and Objections to the Court's Draft Charge to the Jury and Special Verdict Form of November 4, 2008 filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 540 Brief re Court's Draft Charge to the Jury Provided November 4, 2008 filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 5, 2008 Filing 539 Letter Brief re Tying filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 556 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 11/4/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/4/2008). Plt's witness P. Allen. Dfts' witnesses: T. Aramstrong and R. Noll. Draft jury instructions given to counsel. Charging conference set for 11/6/08. Further Jury Trial set for 11/5/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 538 MOTION Instruction to the Jury to Disregard any Suggestion by Plaintiffs That it Was a Breach of any Duty for Defendants Not To Attempt to Tie Retired Player Group Licensing Rights to Active Player Rights filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Motion Hearing set for 11/5/2008 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 4, 2008 Filing 537 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-4-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/30/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 555 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 11/3/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 11/3/2008). Plt's witness P. Rowley. Plt's REST, subject to calling witness. Dft's Rule 50 Motion deemed submitted. Dfts' witnesses: T. Armstrong and D Goich. Jury Trial set for 11/4/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 536 Letter Brief re Motion to Strike Testimony filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 535 Transcript of Proceedings held on 11-3-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/29/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 534 Response re 531 Brief "Court's Draft Charge to the Jury" Provided October 31, 2008 byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 3, 2008 Filing 533 Reply Memorandum Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Brief Re: "Court's Draft Charge to the Jury" Provided October 31, 2008; Objections Thereto filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
November 2, 2008 Filing 532 Letter Brief re: Jury Instructions filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/2/2008)
November 2, 2008 Filing 531 Brief Defendants' Memorandum Regarding the Court's Draft Charge to the Jury filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 11/2/2008)
November 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 530 ORDER RE FIVE-PAGE SUBMISSION. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 1, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 554 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 10/31/2008 before Wiliam Alsup (Date Filed: 10/31/2008). Plt's witnesses: R. Berthelsen; J. Nahra; and D. Rascher. Further Jury Trial set for 11/3/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/31/2008) (Additional attachment(s) added on 11/14/2008: # 1 Stipulated List of Exhibits) (dt, COURT STAFF).
October 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 529 ORDER of USCA- Within 14 days, Appellant shall move for a voluntary dismissal as to 507 Notice of Appeal, filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008)
October 31, 2008 Filing 528 *** FILED IN ERROR - SEE DOC. # 529 *** ORDER of USCA- Within 14 days Appellant shall move for a voluntary dismissal as to 507 Notice of Appeal, filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/31/2008) Modified on 10/31/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
October 30, 2008 Filing 527 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-30-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 526 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 10/30/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/30/2008). Plts witness G. Eyrich (depo read-in) continued. Dfts called witness S. Berg. Plts called witness H. Adderly. Further Jury Trial set for 10/31/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/30/2008)
October 30, 2008 Filing 522 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-29-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/26/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 525 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 10/29/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/29/2008). Plts witness W. Beach continued. Plts called witnesses: J. Linzner, P. Rhee, and G. Eyrich (depo read-in). Further Jury Trial set for 10/30/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 521 Letter Brief filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 520 Letter Brief re Constitution filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 519 MEMORANDUM of USCA - Petition Granted - Trial Exhibit 80 to be filed under seal in District Court- as to Writ of Mandamus, filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 518 ORDER of USCA- Parties are to be prepared for telephonic oral arguments on 10/27/08 @ 3:00pm as to Writ of Mandamus, filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 29, 2008 Filing 517 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/29/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 524 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 10/28/2008 before Willam Alsup (Date Filed: 10/28/2008). Plts witness D. Allen continued. Plts called witnesses: B. Laird and W. Beach. Further Jury Trial set for 10/29/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 516 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-28-08, before Judge Judge Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 28, 2008 Filing 513 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-27-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/23/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 523 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 10/27/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/27/2008). Plts' witness D. Allen continued. Further Jury Trial set for 10/28/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 515 ORDER of USCA- Court temporarily stays introduction at trial of the disputed portion of the 2006 license agreement (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 514 USCA Case Number 08-17327 Ninth Circuit for 507 Notice of Appeal, filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 Filing 512 TIME SCHEDULE ORDER of USCA as to 507 Notice of Appeal filed by Electronic Arts, Inc. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 510 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER RE TX 80 ON ELECTRONIC ARTS' MOTION TO REDACT. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 27, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
October 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 509 ORDER RE ELECTRONIC ART'S MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 24, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re 507 Notice of Appeal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 24, 2008 Filing 508 Copy of Notice of Appeal and Docket sheet mailed to all counsel (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/24/2008)
October 23, 2008 Filing 511 USCA Case Number 08-74426 Ninth Circuit re: Writ of Mandamus(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008) Modified on 10/28/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
October 23, 2008 Filing 506 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-22-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 487-9834. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/20/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/23/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 507 NOTICE OF APPEAL re: 505 Minute Entry by Electronic Arts, Inc.. Filing fee $ 455. Receipt No. 34611024673. Case No. 08-17327 (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008) Modified on 10/27/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF). Modified on 10/28/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2008 Filing 505 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 10/22/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/22/2008). Third-Party EA's Motion to Seal Pricing Information is denied. Plts' called witness D. Allen. Further Jury Trial set for 10/27/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Filing 504 Letter from R. James Slaughter Requesting Stay of 10/22/08 Ruling. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 503 Transcript of Proceedings held on 10-21-08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Sullivan, Telephone number 415-794-6659. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/16/2009. (kpw, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 502 Letter Brief re 490 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 490 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 501 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION -- Joint Summary of Warren Friss Deposition Designations by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley before Judge William H. Alsup.. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 500 Minute Entry: Jury Trial held on 10/21/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/21/2008). Opening statements made. Plts' witness C. McNeil. Further Jury Trial set for 10/22/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Kathy Sullivan.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 499 Declaration of Jacob J. Schatz in Support of 498 MOTION To File Document Under Seal filed byElectronic Arts, Inc.. (Related document(s) 498 ) (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 498 MOTION To File Document Under Seal filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2008 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Filing 496 *** INCORRECT FILING - SEE DOC. # 498 *** MOTION To File Document Under Seal filed by Electronic Arts, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/22/2008 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Slaughter, Robert) (Filed on 10/21/2008) Modified on 10/22/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 495 ORDER RE DEPOSITION DESIGNATION OF WARREN FRISS. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/21/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 21, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 494 ORDER ADOPTING SUMMARY OF RULINGS ON MOTIONS IN LIMINE SUBJECT TO STATED MODIFICATIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 21, 2008. (Attachments: # 1 Supplement Summary of Rulings on Motions In Limine)(whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/21/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 493 AMENDED Minute Entry: Jury Trial began on 10/20/2008 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/20/2008). (Court Reporter Belle Ball) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 492 Minute Entry: Jury Trial began on 10/20/2008 before Judge William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/20/2008). (Court Reporter Belle Ball) (ls, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 491 Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of 490 Letter Brief Defendants' Letter Brief Regarding Objections to Friss Designations filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 490 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 490 Letter Brief Defendants' Letter Brief Regarding Objections to Friss Designations filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 489 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 20, 2008, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, e-mail belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415) 373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/15/2009. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 488 Exhibit List -- First Amended Joint Trial Exhibit List by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley.. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 487 Brief Defendants Brief Re: The Inadmissibility Of Trial Exhibit No. 1184 filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 486 NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 20, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 20, 2008 Filing 485 Brief Plaintiffs' Brief Re: Admissibility of Trial Exhibit No. 1184; Exhibits A and B filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/20/2008)
October 19, 2008 Filing 484 Declaration of Noel S. Cohen in Support of 483 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Cohen Declaration)(Related document(s) 483 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/19/2008)
October 19, 2008 Filing 483 Letter Brief re 478 Letter Brief, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 478 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/19/2008)
October 18, 2008 Filing 482 STIPULATION Amended Joint Stipulated Facts by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/18/2008)
October 18, 2008 Filing 481 Transcript of Proceedings held on October 15, 2008, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Belle Ball, CSR, RMR, CRR, e-mail belle_ball@cand.uscourts.gov, Telephone number (415) 373-2529. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/13/2009. (Ball, Belle) (Filed on 10/18/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 480 Declaration of Jason Clark in Support of 478 Letter Brief, Defendants' Supplemental Letter Brief to Exclude Statement by Gene Upshaw Regarding Collective Bargaining filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5 - Pages 1-11, # 6 Exhibit 5 - Pages 12-23, # 7 Exhibit 5 - Pages 24-32, # 8 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 478 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 479 ORDER TO JURY COMMISSIONER to furnish daily refreshments for the members of the jury. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/17/08. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 478 Letter Brief Defendants' Supplemental Letter Brief to Exclude Statement by Gene Upshaw Regarding Collective Bargaining filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 477 STIPULATION Summary of Rulings Made at the Pretrial Conference Held on October 15, 2008 by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 476 Declaration of Anthony M. Garza in Support of 474 Brief, Supplemental Brief on Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4 Requesting Exclusion of Parol Evidence filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 474 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 475 Declaration of Molly Donovan in Support of 473 Letter Brief In Further Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 4 filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 473 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 474 Brief Supplemental Brief on Plaintiffs' Motion in Limine No. 4 Requesting Exclusion of Parol Evidence Tending to Prove the Intent of the Parties to Third-Party License Agreements filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 17, 2008 Filing 473 Letter Brief In Further Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion In Limine No. 4 filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/17/2008)
October 16, 2008 Filing 472 NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 16, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 471 FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2008 07:20 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Rulings on motions in limine shall be summarized jointly by counsel and submitted by noon on 10/17/2008. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 10/16/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/16/2008)
October 15, 2008 Filing 497 Minute Entry: Final Pretrial Conference held on 10/15/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 10/15/2008). Jury Trial set for 10/20/2008 07:30 AM. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 470 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO BRING EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 15, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 469 CLERKS NOTICE Rescheduling Hearing. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 14, 2008 Filing 468 STIPULATION and Proposed Order to Bring Equipment into the Courtroom by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/14/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 467 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 421 Declaration in Support, 420 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DANIEL A. RASCHER, 424 Proposed Order, 423 Declaration in Support, CORRECTION OF DOCKET #422 - PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 421 , 420 , 424 , 423 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 9, 2008 Filing 466 Letter Brief (Joint) CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 404 filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/9/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 465 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 464 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 464 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 464 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages Re Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion in Limine No. 4 filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 463 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Trial Exhibits by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 462 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine No. 1 Through 10 filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Greenspan Declaration, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Greenspan Declaration, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Greenspan Declaration, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Greenspan Declaration, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Greenspan Declaration, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Greenspan Declaration, # 7 Exhibit 7 to Greenspan Declaration, # 8 Exhibit 8 to Greenspan Declaration, # 9 Exhibit 9 to Greenspan Declaration, # 10 Exhibit 10 to Greenspan Declaration, # 11 Exhibit 11 to Greenspan Declaration, # 12 Exhibit 12 to Greenspan Declaration, # 13 Exhibit 13 to Greenspan Declaration, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Greenspan Declaration, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Greenspan Declaration, # 16 Exhibit 16 to Greenspan Declaration, # 17 Exhibit 17 to Greenspan Declaration)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 461 Proposed Pretrial Order EXHIBIT R-2 OF EXS. A-R by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R-2)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 460 Proposed Pretrial Order EXHIBIT R-1 OF EXS. A-R by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit R-1)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 459 EXHIBITS re 458 Proposed Pretrial Order, EXHIBITS K-Q OF A-R filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit K, # 2 Exhibit L, # 3 Exhibit M, # 4 Exhibit N, # 5 Exhibit O, # 6 Exhibit P, # 7 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 458 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 458 Proposed Pretrial Order JOINT FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER WITH EXS. A-J OF A-R by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 457 MOTION in Limine No. 10, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence of Homages for Gene Upshaw, Including the "GU 63" Badge Worn by Active Players, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony M. Garza in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Garza Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Garza Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Garza Declaration)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 456 OBJECTIONS to DEFENDANTS OBJECTIONS TO PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 455 MOTION in Limine No. 9, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence and Argument Relating to the Justin V. Players Inc. Lawsuit, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 454 DEFENDANTS PRETRIAL DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO FED. R. CIV. P. 26(a)(3) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008) Modified on 10/10/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2008 Filing 453 MOTION in Limine No. 8, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence and Arguments Relating to Plaintiffs' Counsel's Contingency Fee Interest, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declarlation of Anthony M. Garza in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Garza Declaration, # 3 Exhibit B to Garza Declaration, # 4 Exhibit C to Garza Declaration, # 5 Exhibit D to Garza Declaration, # 6 Exhibit E to Garza Declaration)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 452 Proposed Order re 450 MOTION to Seal Document DEFENDANTS MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL, 451 Declaration in Support, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 451 Declaration of ROY TAUB in Support of 450 MOTION to Seal Document DEFENDANTS MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 450 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 450 MOTION to Seal Document DEFENDANTS MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 449 Declaration of ROY TAUB in Support of 445 Pretrial Memorandum filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 445 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 448 MOTION in Limine No. 7, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence, Testimony and Argument Related to the NFL Sponsorship and Internet Agreement, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 447 MOTION in Limine No. 6, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence and Arguments of Legal Conclusions Made by Herb Adderley, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Anthony M. Garza in Support, # 2 Exhibit A to Garza Declaration)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 446 MOTION in Limine No. 5, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence or Argument Relating to Dismissed Causes of Action and the Uncertified Putative Class, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 445 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM DEFENDANTS MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF THEIR POSITION ON DISPUTED JURY INSTRUCTIONS by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 444 MOTION in Limine No. 4, Requesting Exclusion of Parol Evidence Tending to Prove the Intent of the Parties to Third-Party Licensing Agreements, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 443 Proposed Order re 438 Declaration in Support, 441 Declaration in Support, 436 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7, 440 Memorandum in Opposition, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 442 MOTION in Limine No. 3, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence and Argument Related to Mr. Adderley's Purported Fiduciary Relationship with Members of Retired Professional Football Players for Justice filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 441 Declaration of NOEL S. COHEN in Support of 438 Declaration in Support, 436 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7, 440 Memorandum in Opposition, INCLUDING EXHIBITS A-G filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 438 , 436 , 440 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 440 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 438 Declaration in Support, 436 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE OR ALLEGATIONS REGARDING ELECTRONIC ARTSS SCRAMBLING OF RETIRED PLAYERS IMAGES IN THE MADDEN NFL VIDEOGAMES filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 438 , 436 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 439 MOTION in Limine No. 2, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence or Argument Relating to the Possibility of Suing Additional Parties for Relief, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 438 Declaration of IAN PAPENDICK in Support of 436 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 436 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 437 MOTION in Limine No. 1, Requesting Exclusion of Evidence and Argument Related to Bernard Parrish, and Defendants' Opposition Thereto filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 436 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 7 filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 435 Proposed Order re 434 Declaration in Support, 433 Memorandum in Opposition, 432 Declaration in Support,, 431 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PETER RHEE AND TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE THE SUMMARY EXHIBITS PREPARED BY MR. RHEE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 434 Declaration of NOEL S. COHEN in Support of 433 Memorandum in Opposition, 432 Declaration in Support,, 431 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PETER RHEE AND TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE THE SUMMARY EXHIBITS PREPARED BY MR. RHEE INCLUDING EXHIBITS A-D filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 433 , 432 , 431 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 433 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 432 Declaration in Support,, 431 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PETER RHEE AND TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE THE SUMMARY EXHIBITS PREPARED BY MR. RHEE PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 432 , 431 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 432 Declaration of MOLLY DONOVAN in Support of 431 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PETER RHEE AND TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE THE SUMMARY EXHIBITS PREPARED BY MR. RHEE filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9)(Related document(s) 431 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 431 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 6 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PETER RHEE AND TO EXCLUDE FROM EVIDENCE THE SUMMARY EXHIBITS PREPARED BY MR. RHEE filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 430 Proposed Order re 425 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PHILIP Y. ROWLEY, 429 Declaration in Support, 427 Memorandum in Opposition, 426 Declaration in Support, 428 Declaration in Support, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 429 Declaration of RYAN S. HILBERT in Support of 425 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PHILIP Y. ROWLEY, 427 Memorandum in Opposition, 426 Declaration in Support, 428 Declaration in Support, INCLUDING EXHIBITS A-B filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 425 , 427 , 426 , 428 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 428 Declaration of PHILIP Y. ROWLEY in Support of 425 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PHILIP Y. ROWLEY, 427 Memorandum in Opposition, 426 Declaration in Support, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 425 , 427 , 426 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 427 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 425 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PHILIP Y. ROWLEY, 426 Declaration in Support, PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 425 , 426 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 426 Declaration of JASON CLARK in Support of 425 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PHILIP Y. ROWLEY filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 425 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 425 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 5 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF PHILIP Y. ROWLEY filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 424 Proposed Order re 421 Declaration in Support, 422 Memorandum in Opposition, 420 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DANIEL A. RASCHER, 423 Declaration in Support, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 423 Declaration of RYAN S. HILBERT in Support of 421 Declaration in Support, 422 Memorandum in Opposition, 420 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DANIEL A. RASCHER INCLUDING EXHIBITS A-B filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 421 , 422 , 420 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 422 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 467 . *** MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 421 Declaration in Support, 420 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DANIEL A. RASCHER PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 421 , 420 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008) Modified on 10/10/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 8, 2008 Filing 421 Declaration of JASON CLARK in Support of 420 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DANIEL A. RASCHER filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 420 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 420 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 4 TO EXCLUDE THE TESTIMONY OF DANIEL A. RASCHER filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 419 Proposed Order re 415 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS RELATING TO AD HOC AGREEMENTS, 418 Declaration in Support, 417 Memorandum in Opposition, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 418 Declaration of ANTHONY M. GARZA in Support of 415 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS RELATING TO AD HOC AGREEMENTS, 417 Memorandum in Opposition, INCLUDING EXHIBITS A-C filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 415 , 417 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 417 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 415 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS RELATING TO AD HOC AGREEMENTS PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 415 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 416 PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Support of Disputed Jury Instructions Offered by Plaintiffs by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 415 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 3 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS RELATING TO AD HOC AGREEMENTS filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 414 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. Plaintiffs' Amended Pre-Trial Disclosures Pursuant to FRCP 26(a)(3). (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 413 Proposed Order re 410 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ABOUT PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS RELATING TO RETIRED PLAYER PENSION AND DISABILITY BENEFITS, COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AND OTHER UNION ISSUES, 411 Memorandum in Opposition, 412 Declaration in Support, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 412 Declaration of ANTHONY M. GARZA in Support of 410 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ABOUT PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS RELATING TO RETIRED PLAYER PENSION AND DISABILITY BENEFITS, COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AND OTHER UNION ISSUES, 411 Memorandum in Opposition, INCLUDING EXHIBITS A-D filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 410 , 411 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 411 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 410 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ABOUT PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS RELATING TO RETIRED PLAYER PENSION AND DISABILITY BENEFITS, COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AND OTHER UNION ISSUES PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 410 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 410 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 2 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE ABOUT PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINTS RELATING TO RETIRED PLAYER PENSION AND DISABILITY BENEFITS, COLLECTIVE BARGAINING AND OTHER UNION ISSUES filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 409 Declaration of ANTHONY M. GARZA in Support of 407 Proposed Order, 405 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING HOW DEFENDANTS ALLEGEDLY SPENT MONIES CLAIMED BY PLAINTIFFS, AND EVIDENCE REGARDING THE ECONOMIC WEALTH OF DEFENDANTS AND ACTIVE NFL PLAYERS, 406 Declaration in Support, 408 Memorandum in Opposition,, INCLUDING EXHIBITS A-B filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 407 , 405 , 406 , 408 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 408 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 407 Proposed Order, 405 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING HOW DEFENDANTS ALLEGEDLY SPENT MONIES CLAIMED BY PLAINTIFFS, AND EVIDENCE REGARDING THE ECONOMIC WEALTH OF DEFENDANTS AND ACTIVE NFL PLAYERS, 406 Declaration in Support, PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION THERETO filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 407 , 405 , 406 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 407 Proposed Order re 405 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING HOW DEFENDANTS ALLEGEDLY SPENT MONIES CLAIMED BY PLAINTIFFS, AND EVIDENCE REGARDING THE ECONOMIC WEALTH OF DEFENDANTS AND ACTIVE NFL PLAYERS, 406 Declaration in Support, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 406 Declaration of ROY TAUB in Support of 405 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING HOW DEFENDANTS ALLEGEDLY SPENT MONIES CLAIMED BY PLAINTIFFS, AND EVIDENCE REGARDING THE ECONOMIC WEALTH OF DEFENDANTS AND ACTIVE NFL PLAYERS filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 405 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 405 MOTION in Limine DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE NO. 1 TO EXCLUDE EVIDENCE REGARDING HOW DEFENDANTS ALLEGEDLY SPENT MONIES CLAIMED BY PLAINTIFFS, AND EVIDENCE REGARDING THE ECONOMIC WEALTH OF DEFENDANTS AND ACTIVE NFL PLAYERS filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 10/8/2008)
October 8, 2008 Filing 404 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 466 . *** Letter Brief (Joint) filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Letter Brief)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/8/2008) Modified on 10/10/2008 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
October 3, 2008 Filing 403 NOTICE of Appearance by Chad S. Hummel -- Notice of Appearance of Chad S. Hummel as Additional Counsel for Plaintiffs -- (Hummel, Chad) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 402 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CHOICE OF LAW. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 2, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
October 1, 2008 Filing 401 STIPULATION -- Stipulation and Proposed Order Regarding Choice of Law -- by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/1/2008)
September 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 400 ORDER RE TRIAL PREPARATION. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 9/29/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 399 STIPULATION -- Stipulation Regarding Testimony of Joel Linzner (CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 398 ) -- by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 19, 2008 Filing 398 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 399 . *** STIPULATION -- Stipulation Regarding Testimony of Joel Linzner -- by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 9/19/2008) Modified on 9/22/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 397 ORDER RE TRIAL DATE. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 19, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 396 ORDER by Judge Alsup terminating 393 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 395 STIPULATION AND ORDER RESCHEDULING DEADLINE TO SERVE AND FILE OBJECTIONS TO PROPOSED EXHIBITS. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 5, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 394 STIPULATION re 393 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Bernard Paul Parrish's Unopposed Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 393 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff Bernard Paul Parrish's Unopposed Motion for Dismissal With Prejudice filed by Bernard Paul Parrish. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 4, 2008 Filing 392 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Rescheduling Deadline To Serve and File Objections To Proposed Exhibits by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 2, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 391 ORDER by Judge Alsup denying 361 Motion to Certify Class; denying 364 Motion to Shorten Time (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2008)
August 28, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Jury Trial set for 10/20/2008 07:30 AM. Pretrial Conference set for 10/15/2008 02:00 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 390 ORDER RE TRIAL SCHEDULE. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 28, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 389 Declaration of Ian Papendick in Support of 388 Reply to Response to Motion Declaration of Ian Papendick in Further Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify the GLA Class filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 388 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/28/2008)
August 28, 2008 Filing 388 REPLY to Response to Motion 361 Reply Brief in Support of Defendants' Motion to Decertify the GLA Class filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/28/2008) Modified on 8/29/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 28, 2008 Filing 387 Memorandum in Opposition 358 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Parrish's Individual Claim Without Prejudice for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/28/2008) Modified on 8/29/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2008 Filing 386 Amended MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/26/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 385 Declaration of Jeffrey Kessler in Support of 384 Letter Dated August 1, 2008 filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19)(Related document(s) 384 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 384 Letter from Defendants Regarding Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 383 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 382 Reply Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12)(Related document(s) 382 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 382 Reply Memorandum 380 Defendants' Reply Brief In Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/25/2008) Modified on 8/26/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 25, 2008 Filing 381 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 380 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47)(Related document(s) 380 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 380 MOTION for Summary Judgment Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 379 Proposed Order re 378 Letter Requesting a 45-day postponement of the September 22, 2008 trial date, by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 25, 2008 Filing 378 Letter from Jeffrey L. Kessler To The Honorable William H. Alsup re: 45-day postponement of the September 22, 2008 trial date. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 8/25/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 377 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 311 Declaration in Support,,,,,, of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P - Part 1, # 17 Exhibit P - Part 2, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC, # 31 Exhibit DD, # 32 Exhibit EE, # 33 Exhibit FF, # 34 Exhibit GG, # 35 Exhibit HH, # 36 Exhibit II, # 37 Exhibit JJ, # 38 Exhibit KK, # 39 Exhibit LL, # 40 Exhibit MM, # 41 Exhibit NN, # 42 Exhibit OO, # 43 Exhibit PP, # 44 Exhibit QQ, # 45 Exhibit RR, # 46 Exhibit SS, # 47 Exhibit TT, # 48 Exhibit UU 1 of 5, # 49 Exhibit UU 2 of 5, # 50 Exhibit UU 3 of 5, # 51 Exhibit UU 4 of 5, # 52 Exhibit UU 5 of 5, # 53 Exhibit VV 1 of 2, # 54 Exhibit VV 2 of 2, # 55 Exhibit WW 1 of 2, # 56 Exhibit WW 2 of 2, # 57 Exhibit XX 1 of 4, # 58 Exhibit XX 2 of 4, # 59 Exhibit XX 3 of 4, # 60 Exhibit XX 4 of 4, # 61 Exhibit YY, # 62 Exhibit ZZ, # 63 Exhibit AAA, # 64 Exhibit BBB, # 65 Exhibit CCC, # 66 Exhibit DDD, # 67 Exhibit EEE, # 68 Exhibit FFF, # 69 Exhibit GGG, # 70 Exhibit HHH, # 71 Exhibit III 1 of 3, # 72 Exhibit III 2 of 3, # 73 Exhibit III 3 of 3, # 74 Exhibit JJJ, # 75 Exhibit KKK, # 76 Exhibit LLL, # 77 Exhibit MMM, # 78 Exhibit NNN, # 79 Exhibit OOO, # 80 Exhibit PPP, # 81 Exhibit QQQ)(Related document(s) 311 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 376 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 310 Memorandum in Opposition, -- Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 310 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 375 Declaration of Laura M. Franco in Support of 374 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 374 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Filing 374 Letter Brief re 340 Letter Brief, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 340 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 373 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR A SUSPENSION OF ALL DEADLINES UNTIL AUGUST 27, 2008. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 22, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 372 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for a Suspension of All Deadlines Until August 27, 2008 by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 21, 2008 Filing 371 Memorandum in Opposition re 361 MOTION to Certify Class DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE GLA CLASS -- Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Decertify the GLA Class -- filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/21/2008)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 370 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 330 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Anthony M. Garza. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 369 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 329 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Brett Charhon. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2008)
August 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 368 ORDER DENYING MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 19, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2008)
August 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 367 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DECERTIFY. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 18, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 366 Proposed Order re 364 MOTION to Shorten Time DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME ON THEIR MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE GLA CLASS by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 365 Declaration of ROY TAUB in Support of 364 MOTION to Shorten Time DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME ON THEIR MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE GLA CLASS filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 364 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 364 MOTION to Shorten Time DEFENDANTS MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME ON THEIR MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE GLA CLASS filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 363 Proposed Order re 361 MOTION to Certify Class DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE GLA CLASS by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 362 Declaration of ROY TAUB in Support of 361 MOTION to Certify Class DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE GLA CLASS filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1)(Related document(s) 361 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 15, 2008 Filing 361 MOTION to Certify Class DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DECERTIFY THE GLA CLASS filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/15/2008)
August 13, 2008 Filing 360 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction --Plaintiff's Notice of Motion and Motion to Dismiss Parrish's Individual Claim Without Prejudice For Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Bernard Paul Parrish. Motion Hearing set for 9/18/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Notice of Motion, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 13, 2008 Filing 359 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motions to File Under Seal by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/13/2008)
August 12, 2008 Filing 358 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff Parrish's Individual Claim Without Prejudice for Lack of Jurisdiction and [Proposed] Order filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 8/12/2008)
August 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 357 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 352 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Ian L. Papendick (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2008)
August 8, 2008 Filing 356 Memorandum Regarding Documents to be Filed Under Seal filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit H (redacted) to Hilbert Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 8/8/2008) Modified on 8/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
August 8, 2008 Filing 355 Reply Memorandum Defendants' Memorandum Regarding Sealing of Confidential Documents filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Defendants' Memorandum Regarding Sealing of Confidential Documents)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/8/2008)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 354 ORDER RE PENDING MOTIONS TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 6, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 353 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 347 Motion for Leave to File; granting 349 Motion for Leave to File; denying 305 Motion for Summary Judgment (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 350 Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of 349 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration in Support of Their August 1, 2008 Reply Letter Brief filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 349 ) (Feher, David) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 4, 2008 Filing 349 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration in Support of Their August 1, 2008 Reply Letter Brief filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Supplemental Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of Defendants' August 1, 2008 Reply Letter Brief, # 2 Proposed Order)(Feher, David) (Filed on 8/4/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 352 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Ian L. Papendick, Esq., filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 351 Proposed Order re 345 MOTION to Seal Document 343 Letter Brief DEFENDANTS REPLY LETTER BRIEF by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 348 Declaration of Laura M. Franco in Support of 347 MOTION for Leave to File -- Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration In Support of Their July 30, 2008 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Laura M. Franco)(Related document(s) 347 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 347 MOTION for Leave to File -- Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request for Leave to File a Supplemental Declaration In Support of Their July 30, 2008 Letter Brief filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A -- Supplemental Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert ISO July 30, 2008 Letter Brief, # 2 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert ISO July 30, 2008 Letter Brief, # 3 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 346 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO WITHDRAW PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATIONS OF LINDA CASTILLON, ADAM SULLINS, JASON BRENNER, CHRISTINE FINCH AND STEVE BYRD. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 1, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 345 MOTION to Seal Document 343 Letter Brief DEFENDANTS REPLY LETTER BRIEF filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 344 Declaration of JEFFREY KESSLER in Support of 343 Letter Brief DEFENDANTS REPLY LETTER BRIEF filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1 MANUAL FILING NOTICE, # 2 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2 MANUAL FILING NOTICE, # 3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3 MANUAL FILING NOTICE, # 4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4 MANUAL FILING NOTICE, # 5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, # 6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6 MANUAL FILING NOTICE, # 7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7 MANUAL FILING NOTICE, # 8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 8, # 9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9 MANUAL FILING NOTICE, # 10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 10, # 11 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11, # 12 Exhibit EXHIBIT 12, # 13 Exhibit EXHIBIT 13, # 14 Exhibit EXHIBIT 14, # 15 Exhibit EXHIBIT 15, # 16 Exhibit EXHIBIT 16, # 17 Exhibit EXHIBIT 17 MANUAL FILING NOTICE, # 18 Exhibit EXHIBIT 18, # 19 Exhibit EXHIBIT 19 MANUAL FILING NOTICE)(Related document(s) 343 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
August 1, 2008 Filing 343 Letter Brief DEFENDANTS REPLY LETTER BRIEF; MANUAL FILING NOTIFICATION; DOCUMENT SUBMITTED UNDER SEAL filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 8/1/2008)
July 30, 2008 Filing 342 EXHIBITS re 341 Declaration in Support, CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 341 -- Exhibit C to the Declaration of Laura M. Franco in Support of July 30, 2008 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 341 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
July 30, 2008 Filing 341 Declaration of Laura M. Franco in Support of 340 Letter Brief, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to the Declaration of Laura M. Franco - UNDER SEAL CAPTION SHEET ONLY, # 2 Exhibit B to the Declaration of Laura M. Franco, *** # 3 Exhibit C to the Declaration of Laura M. Franco FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 342 . *** )(Related document(s) 340 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/30/2008) Modified on 7/31/2008 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 30, 2008 Filing 340 Letter Brief -- Plaintiffs' 7-30-2008 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Plaintiffs' 7-30-2008 Letter Brief, # 2 Exhibit B to Plaintiffs' 7-30-2008 Letter Brief)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
July 30, 2008 Filing 339 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley -- Notice of Manual Filing of Plaintiffs' July 30, 2008 Letter Brief; and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Laura M. Franco in Support of the July 30, 2008 Letter Brief (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
July 30, 2008 Filing 338 MOTION to Seal Document -- Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal, # 2 [Proposed] Order Sealing Confidential Documents)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/30/2008)
July 28, 2008 Filing 337 Transcript of Proceedings held on July 24, 2008, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/23/2008. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 7/28/2008)
July 25, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 336 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 332 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Jason D. Clark. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 25, 2008 Filing 335 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Withdraw Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Declarations of Linda Castillon, Adam Sullins, Jason Brenner, Christine Finch and Steve Byrd by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 7/25/2008)
July 24, 2008 Filing 333 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/24/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 7/24/2008) re 305 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Parties may file supplemental briefing on the motion. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/24/2008)
July 22, 2008 Filing 330 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Anthony M. Garza, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021309.) filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
July 22, 2008 Filing 329 Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice for Brett Charhon, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021338.) filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/22/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 334 USCA ORDER - This court denies petition for permission to Appeal (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 332 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Jason D. Clark, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021518.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 21, 2008 Filing 331 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Ian L. Papendick, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021516.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2008)
July 18, 2008 Filing 328 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley re 324 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021309.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021309.) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/18/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 327 MOTION Request for Oral Argument re 308 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Linda Castillon, Adam Sullins, Jason Brenner, Christine Finch and Steve Byrd Filed in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 17, 2008 Filing 326 Reply Memorandum re 308 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Linda Castillon, Adam Sullins, Jason Brenner, Christine Finch and Steve Byrd Filed in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/17/2008)
July 16, 2008 Filing 325 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Brett Charhon, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021338.) filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2008)
July 15, 2008 Filing 324 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Anthony M. Garza, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611021309.) filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2008)
July 14, 2008 Filing 323 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing Time. Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2008 02:00 PM. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 322 Proposed Order re 321 Declaration in Support,,, 319 Proposed Order, 317 Memorandum in Opposition, 318 Declaration in Support, 320 Proposed MOTION to Seal Document 319 Proposed Order, 317 Memorandum in Opposition, 318 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under SealProposed MOTION to Seal Document 319 Proposed Order, 317 Memorandum in Opposition, 318 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 321 Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of 319 Proposed Order, 317 Memorandum in Opposition, 318 Declaration in Support, 320 Proposed MOTION to Seal Document 319 Proposed Order, 317 Memorandum in Opposition, 318 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under SealProposed MOTION to Seal Document 319 Proposed Order, 317 Memorandum in Opposition, 318 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 319 , 317 , 318 , 320 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 320 Proposed MOTION to Seal Document 319 Proposed Order, 317 Memorandum in Opposition, 318 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008) Modified on 8/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2008 Filing 319 Proposed Order re 317 Memorandum in Opposition, 318 Declaration in Support, [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Declarations of Linda Castillon, Adam Sullins, Jason Brenner, Christine Finch and Steve Byrd by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 318 Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of 317 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Declarations of Linda Castillon, Adam Sullins, Jason Brenner, Christine Finch and Steve Byrd filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Related document(s) 317 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 317 Memorandum in Opposition 308 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike the Declarations of Linda Castillon, Adam Sullins, Jason Brenner, Christine Finch and Steve Byrd filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008) Modified on 7/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2008 Filing 316 Proposed Order re 315 Declaration in Support,, 312 Response in Support, 314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Document 312 Response in Support, 313 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under SealProposed MOTION to Seal Document 312 Response in Support, 313 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 313 Declaration in Support, [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 315 Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of 312 Response in Support, 314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Document 312 Response in Support, 313 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under SealProposed MOTION to Seal Document 312 Response in Support, 313 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 313 Declaration in Support, Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motions to File Under Seal filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 312 , 314 , 313 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 314 Proposed MOTION to Seal Document 312 Response in Support, 313 Declaration in Support, Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008) Modified on 8/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 10, 2008 Filing 313 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 312 Response in Support Declaration of David Greenspan in Further Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 312 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008)
July 10, 2008 Filing 312 RESPONSE in Support 305 Defendants' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 7/10/2008) Modified on 7/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2008 Filing 311 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 310 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT, # 47 Exhibit UU Part 1 of 5, # 48 Exhibit UU Part 2 of 5, # 49 Exhibit UU Part 3 of 5, # 50 Exhibit UU Part 4 of 5, # 51 Exhibit UU Part 5 of 5, # 52 Exhibit VV, # 53 Exhibit WW, # 54 Exhibit XX, # 55 Exhibit YY, # 56 Exhibit ZZ, # 57 Exhibit AAA, # 58 Exhibit BBB, # 59 Exhibit CCC, # 60 Exhibit DDD, # 61 Exhibit EEE, # 62 Exhibit FFF, # 63 Exhibit GGG, # 64 Exhibit HHH, # 65 Exhibit III, # 66 Exhibit JJJ, # 67 Exhibit KKK, # 68 Exhibit LLL, # 69 Exhibit MMM, # 70 Exhibit NNN, # 71 Exhibit OOO, # 72 Exhibit PPP, # 73 Exhibit QQQ)(Related document(s) 310 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 Filing 310 Memorandum in Opposition re 305 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Public Version) filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 Filing 309 Declaration of Brett Charhon in Support of 308 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Linda Castillon, Adam Sullins, Jason Brenner, Christine Finch and Steve Byrd Filed in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P)(Related document(s) 308 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 Filing 308 MOTION to Strike the Declarations of Linda Castillon, Adam Sullins, Jason Brenner, Christine Finch and Steve Byrd Filed in Support of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Strike)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
July 1, 2008 Filing 307 NOTICE 305 by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley Notice of Manual Filing of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment and Exhibits C-P, R-RR, TT, VV-ZZ, EEE, HHH-LLL, NNN, AND PPP-QQQ to the Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert Filed in Support Thereof (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/1/2008) Modified on 7/2/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 1, 2008 Filing 306 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request, # 2 Proposed Order Sealing Confidential Documents)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/1/2008)
June 16, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 304 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 16, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2008)
June 13, 2008 Received Order re 298 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 305 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. REDACTED VERSION Motion Hearing set for 7/24/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 303 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association re 298 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 299 Declaration in Support, (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 302 Proposed Order re 301 Declaration in Support,,,,,,,,,,,, 300 Notice (Other) [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 301 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 300 Notice (Other) Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 2 Exhibit 2 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 4 Exhibit 4 to Greenspan Dec, # 5 Exhibit 5 to Greenspan Dec, # 6 Exhibit 6 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 7 Exhibit 7 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 8 Exhibit 8 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 9 Exhibit 9 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 10 Exhibit 10 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 11 Exhibit 11 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 12 Exhibit 12 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 13 Exhibit 13 to Greenspan Dec, # 14 Exhibit 14 to Greenspan Dec, # 15 Exhibit 15 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 16 Exhibit 16 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 17 Exhibit 17 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 18 Exhibit 19 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 19 Exhibit 20 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 20 Exhibit 21 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 21 Exhibit 22 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 22 Exhibit 23 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 23 Exhibit 24 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 24 Exhibit 25 to Greenspan Dec, # 25 Exhibit 26 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 26 Exhibit 27 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 27 Exhibit 28 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 28 Exhibit 30 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 29 Exhibit 31 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 30 Exhibit 32 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 31 Exhibit 33 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 32 Exhibit 34 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 33 Exhibit 35 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 34 Exhibit 36 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 35 Exhibit 37 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 36 Exhibit 38 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 37 Exhibit 39 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 38 Exhibit 40 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 39 Exhibit 41 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 40 Exhibit 42 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 41 Exhibit 18 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 42 Exhibit 43 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 43 Exhibit 44 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 44 Exhibit 45 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 45 Exhibit 46 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 46 Exhibit 29 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification), # 47 Exhibit 47 to Greenspan Dec (Manual Filing Notification))(Related document(s) 300 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 300 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association Manual Filing Notification of Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment (Filed Under Seal) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 299 Declaration in Support of 298 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal by Roy Taub filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of Defendants' Misc Admin Motion to File Under Seal)(Related document(s) 298 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 13, 2008 Filing 298 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 6/13/2008)
June 12, 2008 Filing 297 Proposed Order re 290 Letter Brief, Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 296 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF MARC EDELMAN. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 12, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
June 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 295 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF JEFFREY S. RUGG. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 12, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2008)
June 11, 2008 Filing 294 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 6/11/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 6/11/2008). (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/11/2008)
June 11, 2008 Filing 293 Transcript of Proceedings held on June 11, 2008, before Judge William H. Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 9/8/2008. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
June 11, 2008 Filing 292 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association of Withdrawal of Counsel (Jeffrey S. Rugg) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Feher, David) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
June 11, 2008 Filing 291 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association of Withdrawal of Counsel (Marc Edelman) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Feher, David) (Filed on 6/11/2008)
June 10, 2008 Filing 290 Letter Brief to the Honorable William H. Alsup in Response to Plaintiffs' June 4, 2008 Letter Brief, filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Feher, David) (Filed on 6/10/2008)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 289 STIPULATION AND ORDER REVISING CLASS DEFINITION AND CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on June 9, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 288 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 284 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2008)
June 6, 2008 Filing 287 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Revising Class Definition and Class Notice by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 6/6/2008)
June 5, 2008 Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 6/11/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
June 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 286 ORDER SETTING HEARING RE PLAINTIFFS' LETTER OF JUNE 4, 2008, RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 285 Letter Brief filed by Walter Roberts, III, Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/5/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2008)
June 4, 2008 Filing 285 Letter Brief to The Honorable William Alsup filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
June 4, 2008 Filing 284 MOTION Defendants' Unopposed Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limits and Set a Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of Defendants' Unopposed Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limits and Set a Briefing Schedule for Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Unopposed Administrative Motion to Exceed Page Limits and Set Briefing Schedule)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 6/4/2008)
May 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 283 ORDER APPROVING JOINT CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 22, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2008)
May 21, 2008 Filing 282 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley re 281 Order Revised Jointly Proposed Form of Class Notice (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/21/2008)
May 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 281 ORDER RE JOINT CLASS NOTICE. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 20, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2008)
May 15, 2008 Filing 280 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley Joint Class Notice Proposal and Dissemination Plans (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Proposed Order (Defendants'), # 5 Proposed Order (Plaintiffs'))(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 5/15/2008)
May 14, 2008 Filing 279 Transcript of Proceedings held on 04/24/08, before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter/Transcriber Katherine Wyatt. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2008)
May 2, 2008 Filing 278 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 04/11/08 before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter Joan Columbini. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2008)
May 1, 2008 Filing 277 RESPONSE to PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT PURSUANT TO APRIL 29, 2008 COURT ORDER by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 5/1/2008)
April 30, 2008 Filing 276 Statement of Non-Opposition Pursuant to April 29, 2008 Court Order filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/30/2008)
April 29, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 275 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 217 Motion to Certify Class; finding as moot 229 Motion to Strike ; granting 264 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2008)
April 24, 2008 Filing 274 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 4/24/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/24/2008) re 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Walter Roberts, III, Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Court Reporter Kathy Wyatt.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/24/2008)
April 11, 2008 Filing 272 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 4/11/2008 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 4/11/2008). Parties had a meet and confer in the jury room and resolved the discovery dispute. (Court Reporter Joan Columbini.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 4/11/2008)
April 10, 2008 Filing 271 Reply to Opposition 229 DEFENDANTS REPLY IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO STRIKE THE DECLARATION OF MARVIN MILLER filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/10/2008) Modified on 4/11/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 10, 2008 Filing 270 EXHIBITS re 254 Declaration in Support, Redacted Exhibit 10 to the Declaration of Ronald Katz in support of Reply Memorandum filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 254 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 Filing 269 EXHIBITS re 236 Declaration in Support,,,,,,, Exhibit 14, redacted, to the Declaration of David Greenspan filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 16, redacted, to the Declaration of David Greenspan, # 2 Exhibit 22, redacted, to the Declaration of David Greenspan, # 3 Exhibit 23, redacted, to the Declaration of David Greenspan, # 4 Exhibit 26, redacted, to the Declaration of David Greenspan, # 5 33, redacted, to the Declaration of David Greenspan)(Related document(s) 236 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 10, 2008 Filing 268 Memorandum in Opposition re 264 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum on Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/10/2008)
April 9, 2008 Filing 267 Letter from Jeffrey L. Kessler to The Honorable William H. Alsup. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/9/2008)
April 8, 2008 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 4/11/2008 09:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 266 Proposed Order re 265 Declaration in Support, 264 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum on Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 265 Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of 264 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum on Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 264 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 264 MOTION for Leave to File A Supplemental Memorandum on Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A: Supplemental Memorandum on Plaintiffs' Class Certification Motion)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Filing 263 NOTICE RE MATERIALS FOR HEARING [re 262 Order]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/8/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 262 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY DISPUTE [re 258 Letter Brief filed by Walter Roberts, III, Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/8/2008. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2008)
April 7, 2008 Filing 258 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 Filing 257 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 256 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 250 Motion to Seal Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 7, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 255 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 231 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 242 Motion to Seal Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/7/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 273 FILED UNDER SEAL - Reply Memorandum re 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 261 FILED UNDER SEAL- EXHIBITS 7,12,14 re 254 Declaration in Support, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 254 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 254 Declaration of Ronald Katz in Support of 253 Reply Memorandum, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 253 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 253 Reply Memorandum re 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 252 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley Notice of Manual Filing of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Their Motion for Class Certification and Exhibits to the Declaration of Ronald S. Katz Filed in Support Thereof (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 251 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 250 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 250 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 250 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Sealing Confidential Documents)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 249 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST TO MOVE HEARING ON MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 4, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Filing 248 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association of Withdrawal of Counsel (Christopher Hurd) (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Feher, David) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 247 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** ORDER RE PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FURTHER MEET AND CONFER. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 4, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2008) Modified on 4/4/2008 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2008 Filing 246 Memorandum in Opposition re 229 MOTION to Strike The Declaration Of Marvin Miller Filed In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Motion to Strike)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/4/2008)
April 2, 2008 Filing 245 Proposed Order re 244 Memorandum in Opposition, [PROPOSED] ORDER GRANTING IN PART DEFENDANTS MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFFS MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS UNDER SEAL by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
April 2, 2008 Filing 244 Memorandum in Opposition 242 IN PART TO PLAINTIFFS MISCELLANEOUS ADMINISTRATIVE REQUEST TO FILE CERTAIN CONFIDENTIAL MATERIALS UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO MARCH 31, 2008 COURT ORDER filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/2/2008) Modified on 4/3/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 2, 2008 Filing 243 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 242 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal Pursuant to March 31, 2008 Court Order filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 242 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
April 2, 2008 Filing 242 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal Pursuant to March 31, 2008 Court Order filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Sealing Confidential Documents)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 4/2/2008)
April 1, 2008 Filing 241 Letter from Ronald S. Katz to Judge Alsup re Hearing on Class Certification. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
April 1, 2008 Filing 240 Letter from Jeffrey L. Kessler to the Honorable William Alsup. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 4/1/2008)
March 31, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 239 ORDER REQUESTING RESPONSE FROM PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 31, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 260 FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBITS 4,5,7-9,29, 35-47, 50-52 re 236 Declaration in Support, filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 236 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 259 Memorandum in Opposition- Redacted Version re 227 MOTION to Certify Class filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 238 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 234 236 by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008) Modified on 3/31/2008 (sis, COURT STAFF).
March 28, 2008 Filing 237 Proposed Order re 234 Notice (Other) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 236 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 234 Notice (Other) In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 (Manual Filing Notification - Document Submitted Under Seal), # 2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit Exhibits 4-5 (Manual Filing Notification - Documents Submitted Under Seal), # 5 Exhibit Exhibit 6, # 6 Exhibit Exhibits 7-10 (Manual Filing Notification - Documents Submitted Under Seal), # 7 Exhibit Exhibit 11, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit 12, # 9 Exhibit Exhibits 13-14 (Manual Filing Notification - Documents Submitted Under Seal), # 10 Exhibit Exhibit 15, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit 16 (Manual Filing Notification - Document Submitted Under Seal), # 12 Exhibit Exhibit 17, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit 18, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit 19, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit 20, # 16 Exhibit Exhibits 21-23 (Manual Filing Notification - Documents Submitted Under Seal), # 17 Exhibit Exhibit 24, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit 25, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit 26 (Manual Filing Notification - Document Submitted Under Seal), # 20 Exhibit Exhibit 27, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit 28, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit 29 (Manual Filing Notification - Document Submitted Under Seal), # 23 Exhibit Exhibit 30, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit 31, # 25 Exhibit Exhibits 32-33 (Manual Filing Notification - Documents Submitted Under Seal), # 26 Exhibit Exhibit 34, # 27 Exhibit Exhibits 35-47 (Manual Filing Notification - Documents Submitted Under Seal), # 28 Exhibit Exhibit 48, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit 49, # 30 Exhibit Exhibits 50-52 (Manual Filing Notification - Documents Submitted Under Seal))(Related document(s) 234 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 235 Declaration of Richard Berthelsen in Support of 234 Notice (Other) Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 234 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 234 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Class Certification (Manual Filing) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 233 Proposed Order re 231 MOTION to Seal (Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 232 Declaration of Roy Taub in Support of 231 MOTION to Seal (Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 231 ) (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 231 MOTION to Seal (Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 230 Proposed Order re 229 MOTION to Strike The Declaration Of Marvin Miller Filed In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 28, 2008 Filing 229 MOTION to Strike The Declaration Of Marvin Miller Filed In Support Of Plaintiffs Motion For Class Certification filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/28/2008)
March 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 215 Motion to Seal Document ; granting 225 Motion to Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2008)
March 20, 2008 Filing 225 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Materials Filed By Plaintiffs filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Joel Linzer, # 2 Declaration of Gene Upshaw, # 3 Declaration of Molly Donovan, # 4 [Proposed] Order)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 3/20/2008)
March 19, 2008 Filing 224 REQUEST FOR RESPONSE RE MOTION TO SEAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 19, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 228 FILED UNDER SEAL - EXHIBITS G,I,K-V,X,Z,AA AND CC-TT re 218 Declaration in Support, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 218 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 227 FILED UNDER SEAL - NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Certify Class and Brief in Support filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 223 Declaration of Philip Y. Rowley in Support of 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 217 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 222 Declaration of Bernard Paul Parrish in Support of 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 217 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 221 Declaration of Marvin Miller in Support of 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 217 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 220 Declaration of Lewis T. Leclair in Support of 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 217 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 219 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 217 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 218 Declaration of Jill Adler Naylor in Support of 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit D, # 4 Exhibit E, # 5 Exhibit F, # 6 Exhibit G, # 7 Exhibit H, # 8 Exhibit I, # 9 Exhibit J, # 10 Exhibit K, # 11 Exhibit L, # 12 Exhibit M, # 13 Exhibit N, # 14 Exhibit O, # 15 Exhibit P, # 16 Exhibit Q, # 17 Exhibit R, # 18 Exhibit S, # 19 Exhibit T, # 20 Exhibit U, # 21 Exhibit V, # 22 Exhibit W, # 23 Exhibit X, # 24 Exhibit Z, # 25 Exhibit AA, # 26 Exhibit BB, # 27 Exhibit CC, # 28 Exhibit DD, # 29 Exhibit EE, # 30 Exhibit FF, # 31 Exhibit GG, # 32 Exhibit HH, # 33 Exhibit II, # 34 Exhibit JJ, # 35 Exhibit KK, # 36 Exhibit LL, # 37 Exhibit MM, # 38 Exhibit NN, # 39 Exhibit OO, # 40 Exhibit PP, # 41 Exhibit QQ, # 42 Exhibit RR, # 43 Exhibit SS, # 44 Exhibit TT, # 45 Exhibit UU, # 46 Exhibit VV)(Related document(s) 217 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 217 MOTION to Certify Class -- Plaintiffs' Notice of Motion and Motion for Class Certification and Brief in Support Thereof filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 4/24/2008 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A to Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 216 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley -- Notice Of Manual Filing Of Plaintiffs' Motion For Class Certification And Brief In Support Thereof And Exhibits G, I, K-V, X, Z, Aa, And Cc-Tt To The Declaration Of Jill Adler Naylor Filed In Support Thereof (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 14, 2008 Filing 215 MOTION to Seal Document -- Miscellaneous Administrative Request To File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert, # 2 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/14/2008)
March 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 214 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXCEED PAGE LIMITATIONS FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 12, 2008. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2008)
March 11, 2008 Filing 213 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Exceed Page Limitations for Class Certification Motion by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/11/2008)
February 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 212 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 210 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Samuel F. Baxter. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 211 Proposed Order re 210 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 14, 2008 Filing 210 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Samuel F. Baxter, Esq., filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2008)
February 12, 2008 Filing 209 Proposed Order re 208 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611015706.) by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 12, 2008 Filing 208 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Samuel F. Baxter, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611015706.) filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2008)
February 6, 2008 Filing 207 Minute Entry: A Settlement Conference was held on 2/6/08. The case did not settle.(Date Filed: 2/6/2008). (Court Reporter n/a.) (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 2/6/2008)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 206 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 203 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of L. Peter Parcher. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 1, 2008 Filing 205 MOTION to Appear by Telephone filed by Herbert Anthony Adderley. Settlement conference set for 2/6/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom F, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (wh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
January 31, 2008 Filing 204 Received Order re 203 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2008) (sis, COURT STAFF).
January 31, 2008 Filing 203 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Peter Parcher, Esq., filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2008)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' REQUEST RE SETTING DEADLINES by Judge Alsup denying 196 Motion (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 200 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Roy Taub. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
December 4, 2007 Filing 199 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd Laurence Padnos as Additional Counsel for Defendants National Football League Players Association and National Football League Players Incorporated d/b/a Players Inc. (Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 12/4/2007)
December 4, 2007 Filing 198 Memorandum in Opposition 196 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request to set a February 7, 2008 Class Certification Motion Deadline filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of Opposition, # 2 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Re-setting Deadlines)(Padnos, Todd) (Filed on 12/4/2007) Modified on 12/5/2007 (sis, COURT STAFF).
December 3, 2007 Received Order re 200 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611013061.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611013061.) by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
December 3, 2007 Filing 200 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Roy Taub, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611013061.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
December 3, 2007 Filing 197 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 196 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Reset Dates and Deadlines filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 196 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
December 3, 2007 Filing 196 MOTION Miscellaneous Administrative Request to Reset Dates and Deadlines filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 12/3/2007)
November 30, 2007 Filing 195 Defendants' Answer to the 192 Third Amended Complaint ANSWER to Amended Complaint byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 11/30/2007) Modified on 12/4/2007 (sis, COURT STAFF).
November 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 194 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS' CAUSE OF ACTION ARISING UNDER CAL BUS & PROF CODE. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 29, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 28, 2007 Filing 193 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Cause of Action Arising Under California Bus. & Prof. Code 17200 by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 11/28/2007)
November 27, 2007 Filing 192 AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted) -- Third Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, an Accounting and Violation of California Business and Professions Code Section 17200 against National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. A# 2 Exh. B# 3 Exh. C# 4 Exh. D, under seal cover sheet only# 5 Exh. E# 6 Exh. F, under seal cover sheet only# 7 Exh. G, under seal cover sheet only# 8 Exh. H# 9 Exh. I, under seal cover sheet only# 10 Exh. J, under seal cover sheet only# 11 Exh. K# 12 Exh. L# 13 Exh. M# 14 Exh. N# 15 Exh. O, under seal cover sheet only# 16 Exh. P# 17 Exh. Q# 18 Exh. R)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
November 27, 2007 Filing 191 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 190 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 190 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
November 27, 2007 Filing 190 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Complaint - Redacted# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exh. D, under seal cover sheet only# 6 Exh. E# 7 Exh. F, under seal cover sheet only# 8 Exh. G, under seal cover sheet only# 9 Exh. H# 10 Exh. I, under seal cover sheet only# 11 Exh. J, under seal cover sheet only# 12 Exh. K# 13 Exh. L# 14 Exh. M# 15 Exh. N# 16 Exh. O, under seal cover sheet only# 17 Exh. P# 18 Exh. Q# 19 Exh. R)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 11/27/2007)
November 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 184 Motion to Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
November 21, 2007 Filing 187 Declaration of Gene Upshaw in Support of 184 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Materials Filed by Plaintiffs filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 184 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Filing 186 Declaration of Joel Linzner in Support of 184 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Materials Filed by Plaintiffs filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 184 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Filing 185 Declaration of David G. Feher in Support of 184 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Materials Filed by Plaintiffs filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 184 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 21, 2007 Filing 184 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Materials Filed by Plaintiffs filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Miscellaneous Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Certain Confidential Infomation Filed by Plaintiffs)(Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 11/21/2007)
November 20, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER. Signed by Judge Alsup on November 20, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2007)
November 19, 2007 Filing 182 Letter from Jeffrey L. Kessler to The Honorable William Alsup. (Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER by Judge Alsup denying 177 Motion to Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 189 FILED UNDER SEAL - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 180 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 192 . *** AMENDED COMPLAINT (Redacted) -- Third Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, an Accounting and Violation of California Business & Professions Code Section 17200 against National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exh. A# 2 Exh. B# 3 Exh. C# 4 Exh. D, under seal cover sheet only# 5 Exh. E# 6 Exh. F, under seal cover sheet only# 7 Exh. G, under seal cover sheet only.pdf# 8 Exh. H# 9 Exh. I, under seal cover sheet only# 10 Exh. J, under seal cover sheet only.pdf# 11 Exh. K# 12 Exh. L# 13 Exh. M# 14 Exh. N# 15 Exh. O, under seal cover sheet only# 16 Exh. P# 17 Exh. Q# 18 Exh. R)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 11/15/2007) Modified on 11/27/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/28/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2007 Filing 179 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley re 178 Notice (Other) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 178 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley -- Notice of Manual Filing of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint and Exhibits D, F, G, I, J, And O in Support Thereof (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 177 MOTION to Seal -- Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert# 2 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 139 Motion for Leave to File; granting in part and denying in part 145 Motion for Leave to File (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2007)
October 22, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 167 Motion to Seal Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2007)
October 19, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Settlement Conference set for 2/6/2008 02:00 PM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 19, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 172 NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/19/07. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 19, 2007 Filing 171 Letter from Jeffrey L. Kessler To Honorable William Alsup re Oral Argument. (Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 10/19/2007)
October 18, 2007 Filing 175 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 139 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint, 145 MOTION for Leave to File filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 139 , 145 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 18, 2007 Filing 174 FILED UNDER SEAL- Reply Brief in Support of re 139 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint, 145 MOTION for Leave to File filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 18, 2007 Filing 170 Declaration of Lewis T. LeClair in Support of 139 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 139 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 18, 2007 Filing 169 Reply Memorandum re 139 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint -- Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 18, 2007 Filing 168 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley Notice of Manual Filing of Plaintiffs' Reply Brief in Support of Their Motion for Leave to File the Third Amended Complaint and Exhibit A to the Declaration of Lewis T. Leclair (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 18, 2007 Filing 167 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request to File Certain Confidential Materials under Seal filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Sealing Confidential Documents# 2 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 10/18/2007)
October 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 157 Motion to File Documents Under Seal (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 166 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Joel Linzner filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 165 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Warren Friss filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 164 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 160 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 160 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 163 FILED UNDER SEAL - AFFIDAVIT OF ANDREW FEFFER by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 162 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Andrew Feffer in Support of 160 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 160 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 161 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Doug Allen in Support of 160 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Related document(s) 160 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 160 FILED UNDER SEAL - Memorandum in Opposition re 139 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 158 Declaration of Joseph R. Wetzel in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Stip. P.O.))(Related document(s) 148 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 157 MOTION to Seal filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (P.O. to Seal Documents))(Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 156 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association re 148 Memorandum in Opposition, (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 155 Declaration of Richard Berthelsen in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 148 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 154 Declaration of Warren Friss in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, Public Version filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through D (Under Seal))(Related document(s) 148 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 153 Declaration of Joel Linzner in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, Public Version filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through F (Under Seal))(Related document(s) 148 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 152 Declaration of Doug Allen in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, Public Version filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through I (Under Seal)# 2 Exhibit J (Public Version))(Related document(s) 148 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 151 Declaration of Andrew Feffer in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, Affidavit of Andrew Feffer (Public Version) filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through K (Under Seal))(Related document(s) 148 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 150 Declaration of Andrew Feffer in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, Public Version filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D through F (Under Seal))(Related document(s) 148 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 149 Declaration of David Greenspan in Support of 148 Memorandum in Opposition, Public Version filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A through K, M through W (Under Seal)# 2 Exhibit L (Public Version))(Related document(s) 148 ) (Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 11, 2007 Filing 148 Memorandum in Opposition re 139 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint Public Version filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 10/11/2007)
October 3, 2007 Filing 146 FILED UNDER SEAL- Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 145 MOTION for Leave to File filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 145 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
October 3, 2007 Filing 145 FILED UNDER SEAL- MOTION for Leave to File Third Amended Complaint filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
October 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 136 Motion to Seal Document (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2007)
October 1, 2007 Filing 143 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association Notice of Change of Law Firm Name (O'Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 10/1/2007)
September 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 142 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE IGNORE. *** ORDER RE REQUEST TO DISMISS ACTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 28, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2007) Modified on 9/28/2007 (whalc1, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2007 Filing 147 FILED UNDER SEAL - THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2007)
September 27, 2007 Filing 141 Proposed Order re 139 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/27/2007)
September 27, 2007 Filing 140 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 191 . *** Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 139 MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 139 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/27/2007) Modified on 11/27/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/28/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2007 Filing 139 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 190 . *** MOTION for Leave to File a Third Amended Complaint filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Third Amended Complaint - redacted# 2 Exhibit A# 3 Exhibit B# 4 Exhibit C# 5 Exhibit D# 6 Exhibit E# 7 Exhibit F# 8 Exhibit G# 9 Exhibit H# 10 Exhibit I# 11 Exhibit J# 12 Exhibit K# 13 Exhibit L# 14 Exhibit M# 15 Exhibit N# 16 Exhibit O# 17 Exhibit P# 18 Exhibit Q# 19 Exhibit R)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/27/2007) Modified on 11/27/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/28/2007 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2007 Filing 138 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE 139 140 141 by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 9/27/2007) Modified on 9/28/2007 (sis, COURT STAFF).
September 27, 2007 Filing 137 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley Notice of Manual Filing of Third Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, an Accounting and Violation of California Business & Professions Code § 17200 and Exhibits D, F, G, I, J, and O Attached Thereto (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 9/27/2007)
September 27, 2007 Filing 136 MOTION to Seal Document Miscellaneous Administrative Request To File Certain Confidential Materials Under Seal In Support Of Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint; Declaration Of Ryan S. Hilbert In Support Thereof filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of Plaintiffs' Miscellaneous Administrative Request# 2 Proposed Order Sealing Confidential Documents)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 9/27/2007)
September 12, 2007 Filing 135 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 08/30/07 before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter: Sahar McVickar. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
September 7, 2007 Received Order re 134 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611010231.) by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 7, 2007 Filing 134 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Peter Parcher, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611010231.) filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 6, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER by Judge Alsup granting 86 Motion to Dismiss; granting 87 Motion to Dismiss (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 132 Declaration of Herbert Anthony Adderley re Plaintiffs' Payment of NFLPA Dues filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 131 Declaration of Bernard Paul Parrish re Plaintiffs' Payment of NFLPA Dues filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 130 Letter from Ronald S. Katz Regarding Plaintiffs' Payment of NFLPA Dues. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
September 4, 2007 Filing 129 Letter from Jeffrey L. Kessler. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Andre Collins Re: Plaintiffs' Payment of NFLPA Retired Players Association Dues)(Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 9/4/2007)
August 30, 2007 Filing 128 Letter from Ronald S. Katz Regarding Herb Adderley's GLAs. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 127 ORDER RE GLA SIGNED BY ADDERLEY AND DUES PAID BY PLAINTIFFS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 30, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 30, 2007 Filing 126 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 8/30/2007 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/30/2007) re 87 86 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/30/2007)
August 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 120 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Elizabeth Haley (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 29, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ADOPTING IN PART PROPOSED ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' DISCOVERY MOTION. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 29, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 29, 2007 Filing 123 Proposed Order Regarding Plaintiffs' Discovery Motion by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 29, 2007 Filing 122 Letter from Ronald S. Katz to Judge Alsup re proposed order. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/29/2007)
August 22, 2007 Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 06/14/07 before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter: Katherine Wyatt. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/22/2007)
August 21, 2007 Received Order re 120 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611009653.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611009653.) by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007)
August 21, 2007 Filing 120 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Elizabeth A. Haley, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611009653.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2007)
August 20, 2007 Filing 119 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 08/17/07 before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter: Lydia Zinn. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2007)
August 17, 2007 Filing 118 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 8/17/2007 before William Alsup (Date Filed: 8/17/2007). Court ruled on the discovery dispute re production of documents. (Court Reporter Lydia Zinn.) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/17/2007)
August 16, 2007 Set/Reset Hearings: Discovery Hearing set for 8/17/2007 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 16, 2007 Filing 117 Declaration of Eamon O'Kelly in Support of 116 Reply to Opposition, filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 116 ) (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 16, 2007 Filing 116 Reply to Opposition re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 86 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint Defendants' Reply Memorandum of Law In Support of Motions to Dismiss filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 16, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDER RE-SETTING HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE to 1:30 p.m. on Friday, August 17, 2007. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/16/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/16/2007)
August 15, 2007 Filing 114 Letter from Eamon O'Kelly incl. Players Inc Brief. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Wetzel, Joseph) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 13, 2007 Set Hearing 113 : Discovery Dispute Hearing set for 8/17/2007 02:30 PM. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON DISCOVERY DISPUTE AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE [re 112 Letter Brief filed by Walter Roberts, III, Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 8/13/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
August 10, 2007 Filing 112 Letter Brief filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 8/10/2007)
August 9, 2007 Set/Reset Hearing 109 : Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 111 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 110 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4)(Related document(s) 110 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 110 Memorandum in Opposition re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 86 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint - Consolidated Opposition to Players Inc's and National Football League Players Association's Motions to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 8/9/2007)
August 9, 2007 Filing 109 CLERK'S NOTICE Rescheduling Motion Hearing. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/30/2007 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/9/2007) Modified on 8/10/2007 (dt, COURT STAFF).
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 100 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Christopher Hurd. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/8/2007)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 107 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 101 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of David Greenspan. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 97 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Molly Donovan. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 99 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Marc Edelman. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 98 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Eric Laufgraben. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 3, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 103 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO FILE CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION AND CONSOLIDATED REPLY TO DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 3, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2007)
August 2, 2007 Filing 102 STIPULATION re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 86 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint -- Joint Stipulation to File Consolidated Opposition and Consolidated Reply in Connection with Defendants' Motions to Dismiss by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 101 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, David Greenspan, Esq., filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 100 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Christopher Hurd, Esq., filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 99 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Marc Edelman, Esq., filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 98 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Eric Laufgraben, Esq., filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 97 AMENDED MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Molly Donovan, Esq., filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
July 30, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER SUBJECT TO STATED CONDITIONS. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 30, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 26, 2007 Filing 95 STIPULATION for Protective Order by National Football League Players Incorporated, Bernard Paul Parrish, National Football League Players Association, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 7/26/2007)
July 23, 2007 Received Order re 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611008662.) by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Filing 94 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Marc Edelman, Esq., ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611008662.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 87 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, 86 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint. Motion Hearing set for 8/30/2007 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 23, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS. Signed by Judge Alsup on July 23, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/23/2007)
July 17, 2007 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Eric Laufgraben, Esq., and Proposed Order ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611008481.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Molly Donovan, Esq., and Proposed Order ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611008484.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Christopher Hurd, Esq., and Proposed Order ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611008485.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 17, 2007 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, David Greenspan, Esq., and Proposed Order( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611008486.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2007) .
July 17, 2007 Filing 92 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation Continuing Hearing Date for Defendants' Motions to Dismiss and Proposed Order by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 7/17/2007)
July 16, 2007 Filing 91 TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 05/31/07 before Judge William Alsup. Court Reporter: Katherine Powell. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2007)
July 6, 2007 Filing 90 NOTICE by National Football League Players Association of Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1 (Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 6, 2007 Filing 89 Certificate of Interested Entities by Claire Elise Goldstein for NFL Players Association (Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 6, 2007 Filing 88 Declaration of Claire E. Goldstein in Support of 87 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 87 ) (Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 6, 2007 Filing 87 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2007 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Players Inc's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint)(Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
July 6, 2007 Filing 86 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by National Football League Players Incorporated, National Football League Players Association. Motion Hearing set for 8/16/2007 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting NFLPA's Motion to Dismiss)(Goldstein, Claire) (Filed on 7/6/2007)
June 25, 2007 Summons Issued as to National Football League Players Association. 2nd Amended Complaint (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2007)
June 21, 2007 Filing 85 AMENDED COMPLAINT -- Second Amended Complaint for Breach of Contract, Unjust Enrichment, Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Violation of California Business & Professions Code § 17200, and an Accounting against National Football League Players Incorporated. Filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G# 8 Exhibit H# 9 Exhibit I)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 6/21/2007)
June 15, 2007 Filing 84 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (O'Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 6/15/2007)
June 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 83 CASE MANAGEMENT SCHEDULING ORDER: ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge James Larson for Mediation/Settlement. Discovery due by 5/9/2008. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2008 07:30 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Motions due by 6/26/2008. Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 6/14/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2007)
June 14, 2007 Filing 82 Minute Entry: Initial Case Management Conference held on 6/14/2007 before Judge William Alsup. Trial date and schedule set. CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Larson for Settlement Conference. (Court Reporter: Kathy Wyatt) (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/14/2007)
June 7, 2007 Filing 81 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
June 7, 2007 Filing 80 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
June 7, 2007 Filing 79 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Mediation by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Selecting ADR Process (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 6/7/2007)
June 4, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER by Judge Alsup denying 29 Motion for Sanctions; denying 32 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying 34 Motion to Change Venue; denying 2 Motion to Appoint Counsel (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2007)
May 31, 2007 Filing 77 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/31/2007 before Judge William H. Alsup (Date Filed: 5/31/2007) re 29 MOTION for Sanctions 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings 34 MOTION to Change Venue (Court Reporter Katherine Powell.) (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/31/2007)
May 30, 2007 Filing 76 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/30/2007)
May 18, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF JEANNINE SANO. Signed by Judge Alsup on May 18, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2007)
May 17, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S LETTER REQUEST. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 5/17/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 73 Proposed Order re 72 Notice (Other) Granting Withdrawal of Jeannine Sano by National Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 72 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated of Withdrawal of Counsel (Jeannine Sano) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 71 Declaration of Howard Skall in Support of 69 Reply to Opposition,, 35 Declaration in Support,, 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 70 Declaration in Support,, 36 Declaration in Support, in Support of Players Inc's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 69 , 35 , 34 , 70 , 36 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 70 Declaration of Mary Moran in Support of 69 Reply to Opposition,, 35 Declaration in Support,, 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 36 Declaration in Support, of Players Inc's Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion to Transfer Venue filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 69 , 35 , 34 , 36 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 69 Reply to Opposition re 35 Declaration in Support,, 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 36 Declaration in Support, to Motion to Transfer Venue filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 68 Reply Memorandum re 33 Declaration in Support,, 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities in Support of Its Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(c) filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 67 Declaration of Gene Upshaw in Support of 30 Declaration in Support,, 31 Declaration in Support,, 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 65 Reply Memorandum,, 66 Declaration in Support,, Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Sanctions filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 30 , 31 , 29 , 65 , 66 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 66 Declaration of Eamon O'Kelly in Support of 30 Declaration in Support,, 31 Declaration in Support,, 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 65 Reply Memorandum, Supplemental - in Further Support of Defendant's Motion for Sanctions filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 30 , 31 , 29 , 65 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 65 Reply Memorandum re 30 Declaration in Support,, 31 Declaration in Support,, 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities in Support of Its Motion for Sanctions filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 64 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 63 Reply to Opposition Supplemental Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion to Appoint Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 63 ) (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 17, 2007 Filing 63 Reply to Opposition re 43 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion to Appoint Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP as Interim Class Counsel filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 5/17/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 62 Declaration of Paul Parrish in Support of 60 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 61 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 60 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendant's Motion for Sanctions filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2)(Related document(s) 60 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 60 Memorandum in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 59 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 57 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 57 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 58 Declaration of Walter Roberts III in Support of 57 Memorandum in Opposition, in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Transfer Venue filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 57 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 57 Memorandum in Opposition re 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion To Transfer Venue)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 56 Declaration of Ryan S. Hilbert in Support of 55 Memorandum in Opposition,, to Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings, or, in the Alternative, Request to File Second Amended Complaint filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 55 ) (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 55 Memorandum in Opposition re 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities , or, in the Alternative, Request to File Second Amended Complaint filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings or, in the Alternative, Allowing Plaintiffs to File Second Amended Complaint)(Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 5/10/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 50 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Kenneth L. Steinthal. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 26, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER by Judge William Alsup granting 49 Motion for Pro Hac Vice of Bruce S. Meyer. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2007)
April 25, 2007 Received Order re 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100557.) by National Football League Players Incorporated. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 25, 2007 Received Order re 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100557.) by National Football League Players Incorporated. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2007)
April 23, 2007 Filing 52 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League Players Incorporated re Received Order, 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100557.), 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 3461100557.), Received Order, 51 Notice of Appearance (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Filing 51 NOTICE of Appearance of Bruce S. Meyer filed by National Football League Players Incorporated (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Received Order re 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611005573.) by National Football League Players Incorporated. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Filing 50 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Kenneth Steinthal ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611005573.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Received Order re 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611005574.) by National Football League Players Incorporated. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 23, 2007 Filing 49 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Bruce S. Meyer ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 34611005574.) filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/23/2007)
April 13, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 6/7/2007. Case Management Conference set for 6/14/2007 11:00 AM. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities., Set Deadlines/Hearings: Motion Hearing set for 5/31/2007 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER re 46 Stipulation filed by National Football League Players Incorporated]. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 4/13/2007. (whasec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 Filing 47 Proposed Order re 46 Stipulation,, 45 Letter Granting Continuance of (1) Case Management Conference, (2) Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Manatt as Interim Counsel; (3) Defendant's Motions for (a) Motion to Transfer Venue; (b) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and (c) Motion for Sanctions by National Football League Players Incorporated. (O'Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 Filing 46 STIPULATION re 45 Letter for Continuance of (1) Case Management Conference, (2) Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Manatt as Interim Counsel; (3) Defendant's Motions for (a) Motion to Transfer Venue; (b) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; and (c) Motion for Sanctions by National Football League Players Incorporated. (O'Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 13, 2007 Filing 45 Letter from Eamon O'Kelly to the Honorable William H. Alsup. (O'Kelly, Eamon) (Filed on 4/13/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 44 Proposed Order re 43 Memorandum in Opposition Denying Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Manatt Phelps & Phillips LLP as Interim Class Counsel by National Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 43 Memorandum in Opposition re 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel (CORRECTED) Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Interim Class Counsel filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 42 Proposed Order re 35 Declaration in Support,, 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 41 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 36 Declaration in Support, by National Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 41 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated re 35 Declaration in Support,, 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 36 Declaration in Support, (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 40 Proposed Order re 33 Declaration in Support,, 39 Notice (Other), Notice (Other), 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities by National Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 39 NOTICE by National Football League Players Incorporated re 33 Declaration in Support,, 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 38 Proposed Order re 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities, 30 Declaration in Support,, 31 Declaration in Support, by National Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 37 Memorandum in Opposition 2 To Plaintiffs' Motion To Appoint Interim Class Counsel With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007) Modified on 4/9/2007 (sis, COURT STAFF).
April 4, 2007 Filing 36 Declaration of Gene Upshaw in Support of 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 35 Declaration of Joe Nahra in Support of 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 34 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 34 MOTION to Change Venue Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2007 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 33 Declaration of Eamon O'Kelly in Support of 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 32 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 32 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Pursuant To FRCP 12(c) With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2007 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 31 Declaration of Eamon O'Kelly in Support of 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 30 Declaration of Gene Upshaw in Support of 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed byNational Football League Players Incorporated. (Related document(s) 29 ) (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 4, 2007 Filing 29 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant To Rule 11, 28 U.S.C. 1927, And The Court's Inherent Powers With Accompanying Memorandum Of Points And Authorities filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2007 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/4/2007)
April 2, 2007 Filing 28 Players Inc's ANSWER to 6 Amended Complaint by National Football League Players Incorporated. (Kessler, Jeffrey) (Filed on 4/2/2007) Modified on 4/3/2007 (sis, COURT STAFF).
March 6, 2007 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. National Football League Players Incorporated served on 2/16/2007, answer due 3/8/2007. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/6/2007)
March 5, 2007 Filing 26 STIPULATION . Joint Stipulation Enlarging Time to Respond to Complaint Pursuant to Civil L.R. 6-1(a) by National Football League Players Incorporated. (Rugg, Jeffrey) (Filed on 3/5/2007)
March 2, 2007 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 2 MOTION to Appoint Counsel. Motion Hearing set for 5/3/2007 08:00 AM in Courtroom 9, 19th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 25 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley Renewed Notice of Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP as Interim Class Counsel (Hilbert, Ryan) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 24 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 23 Clerks Notice. Signed by Judge William Alsup on 2/22/07. (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 2, 2007 Filing 23 CLERK'S NOTICE Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference on Reassignment set for 5/17/2007 11:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 5/10/2007. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order for All Judges) (dt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2007)
March 1, 2007 Filing 22 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley. National Football League Players Incorporated served on 2/15/2007, answer due 3/7/2007. (gba, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007)
March 1, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge William H. Alsup for all further proceedings. Judge Joseph C. Spero no longer assigned to the case. Signed by Executive Committee on 03/01/07. (mab, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2007)
February 28, 2007 Filing 20 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 28, 2007 Filing 19 Declination to Proceed Before a U.S. Magistrate Judge by National Football League Players Incorporated (Request for Reassignment Pursuant to Standing Order of Hon. Joseph C. Spero. (Guthrie, Jane) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 28, 2007 Filing 18 NOTICE by Bernard Paul Parrish, Walter Roberts, III, Herbert Anthony Adderley to Continue Hearing in Plaintiffs' Motion to Appoint Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP as Interim Class Counsel (Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 28, 2007 Filing 17 CLERK'S TO DEFENDANT RE: Notice Regarding Consent to Jurisdiction of United States Magistrate Judge. Parties shall file a consent or declination within seven (7) calendar days . (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 2/27/7, granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Jeffrey Rugg. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 2/27/7,granting 10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David G. Feher. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 2/27/7, granting 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Eamon O'Kelly. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 28, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER, by Judge Joseph C. Spero, signed 2/27/7, granting 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey L. Kessler. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Football League Players Incorporated re 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Proposed Order, 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, Proposed Order, Proposed Order, Proposed Order, 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice, 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Proposed Order re 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by National Football League Players Incorporated. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 11 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Jeffrey Rugg filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. Fee paid.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Proposed Order re 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by National Football League Players Incorporated. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 10 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - David G. Feher filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. Fee paid. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Proposed Order re 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by National Football League Players Incorporated. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 9 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Eamon O'Kelly filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. Fee paid.(gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Proposed Order re 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice by National Football League Players Incorporated. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 8 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice - Jeffrey L. Kessler filed by National Football League Players Incorporated. Fee paid. (gsa, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 26, 2007 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE Hearing on Plas' Motion to Appoint Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP as Interim Class Counsel. Motion Hearing RESET for THE SAME DAY AT 1:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2007)
February 23, 2007 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT First Amended Complaint for Breach of Fiduciary Duty, Unjust Enrichment and an Accounting against National Football League Players Incorporated. Filed byWalter Roberts, III, Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B# 3 Exhibit C# 4 Exhibit D# 5 Exhibit E# 6 Exhibit F# 7 Exhibit G)(Katz, Ronald) (Filed on 2/23/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 11/20/2007 (klh, COURT STAFF).
February 22, 2007 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT TO JURISDICTION OF MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Plaintiff shall electronically file a consent or declination within seven calendar days of this notice. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/22/2007)
February 14, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 14, 2007 Filing 4 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due by 5/18/2007. Case Management Conference set for 5/25/2007 01:30 PM. (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 14, 2007 Received Order re 2 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 14, 2007 Filing 3 Declaration of Ronald S. Katz in Support of 2 MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (Related document(s) 2 ) (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 14, 2007 Filing 2 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Appoint Interim Class Counsel filed by Bernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2007 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 14, 2007 Summons Issued as to National Football League Players Incorporated. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007)
February 14, 2007 Filing 1 CLASS ACTION COMPLAINT FOR BREACH OF FIDUCIARY DUTY, UNJUST ENRICHMENT AND AN ACCOUNTING and DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL against National Football League Players Incorporated ( Filing fee $ 350, receipt number 34611002989.). Filed byBernard Paul Parrish, Herbert Anthony Adderley. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF). Additional attachment(s) added on 2/21/2007 (gba, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parrish et al v. National Football League Players Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bernard Paul Parrish
Represented By: Ronald Stanley Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Herbert Anthony Adderley
Represented By: Ronald Stanley Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Roberts, III
Represented By: Ronald Stanley Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League Players Incorporated
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Football League Players Association
Represented By: Joseph Richard Wetzel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why