Moody v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al

Plaintiff: Michael Moody
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 3:2007cv01017
Filed: February 16, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 19, 2009 100 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 97 , 98 , 99 Disputes regarding amount of judgment: The parties shall jointly file, within ten (10) days of entry of this order, a proposed judgment, consistent with this order, specifying the exact amount to by paid; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 5/18/2009. (awb, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
January 26, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel: the court finds that defendant abused its discretion in denying plaintiff benefits during the own occupation term of the policy. Plaintiff's motion for judgment is GRANTED, and defendant's motion for judgment is DENIED. Defendant SHALL pay plaintiff benefits owed for the entire period of coverage under the own occupation provisions of the policy, minus any applicable offsets from Social Security benefits, state disability benefits, or other sources provided in the policy, including the $19,951.27 plaintiff owes from prior overpayments. The parties shall jointly file, within thirty days, a proposed judgment specifying the exact amount to by paid. Having decided that plainti ff was not disabled under the own occupation provision of the policy, defendant has not made a determination whether plaintiff is or was disabled under the any occupation policy provision at any time during the applicable time frame. The court REMAN DS the question of plaintiff's disability under the any occupation standard to defendant for determination according to its fiduciary duties and in a manner consistent with this memorandum and order. Defendant SHALL take into account in its initial determination any relevant evidence submitted by or on behalf of plaintiff within the next sixty days. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
November 25, 2008 93 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER RESETTING CROSS MOTIONS 70 66 for 12/22/2008 02:00 PM in Courtroom 15, 18th Floor, San Francisco; Signed by Judge Marilyn Hall Patel on 11/25/2008. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moody v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Moody
Represented By: David M. Lilienstein, Esq.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?