Finkelstein v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al

Plaintiff: David E. Finkelstein
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America, Richard Sullivan and Colt Employee Benefits Insurance Agency, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01130
Filed: February 23, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 28, 2009 168 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE (sixty days conditional dismissal). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/28/09. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
March 30, 2009 161 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Settlement Conference set for 4/27/2009 at 09:30 AM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/30/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 27, 2009 159 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: declaration and settlement conference (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/27/2009)
September 11, 2008 128 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 127 Stipulation filed by Richard Sullivan Jury Trial set for 10/27/2008 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2008 02:30 PM in Courtroom 8, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/09/08. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Finkelstein v. Guardian Life Insurance Company of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guardian Life Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Michael F. Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Sullivan
Represented By: Duane Clark Musfelt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colt Employee Benefits Insurance Agency, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David E. Finkelstein
Represented By: Arnold Ross Levinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?