Ahcom, Ltd. v. Smeding et al

Plaintiff: Ahcom, Ltd.
Defendant: Hendrik Smeding and Lettie Smeding
Case Number: 3:2007cv01139
Filed: February 26, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Napa
Presiding Judge: Samuel Conti
Nature of Suit: Other Contract
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2011 154 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Award of Attorneys' Fees to Defendants in the amount of $256,451.50. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/29/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
May 12, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court Court Trial Preparation Order. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/12/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2011)
May 15, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Regarding Bill of Costs. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/15/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
April 24, 2009 92 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 87 Motion to Dismiss (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
January 14, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 50 Motion for Sanctions (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 8, 2008 51 Opinion or Order of the Court COURT TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 12/8/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/8/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ahcom, Ltd. v. Smeding et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hendrik Smeding
Represented By: John Geelan Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lettie Smeding
Represented By: John Geelan Michael
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ahcom, Ltd.
Represented By: William Henry Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?