Goodman Ball, Inc. v. Clear Water USA, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Goodman Ball, Inc.
Defendant: Clear Water USA, Inc., Denouement Strategies, Inc., Mach II Aviation, Inc., Escape Velocity of Tampa Bay, Inc. and Solardiesel Corp.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01148
Filed: February 26, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Patent Office
County: San Mateo
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Plaintiff
Cause of Action: Federal Question
Jury Demanded By: 35:271 Patent Infringement

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 4, 2009 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL re 117 MOTION to Enforce Judgment filed by Goodman Ball, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/4/2009. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2009)
October 8, 2009 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman denying 123 Motion to Appear by Telephone (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/8/2009)
September 9, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court THIRD BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/9/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
August 17, 2009 116 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman finding as moot 111 Motion to Strike (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 5, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 96 Motion (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
May 4, 2009 97 Opinion or Order of the Court BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 5/4/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2009)
March 9, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting 88 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Michael Casey Addison terminated (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
January 30, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE LETTER FROM MICHAEL C. ADDISON, ESQ. DATED 1/30/2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/30/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
January 21, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Scheduling Hearing on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel for Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/21/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/21/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodman Ball, Inc. v. Clear Water USA, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Goodman Ball, Inc.
Represented By: Dariush Ghaffar Adli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clear Water USA, Inc.
Represented By: Caryl E. Delano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denouement Strategies, Inc.
Represented By: Caryl E. Delano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mach II Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Escape Velocity of Tampa Bay, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solardiesel Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?