Lemmons v. United States Postal Service

Plaintiff: Portia Lemmons
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco
Case Number: 3:2007cv01198
Filed: February 28, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2008 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 34 Stipulation filed by U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/9/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2008)
October 6, 2008 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE PURSUANT TO SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT, CLOSING FILE re 32 Proposed Order filed by U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/6/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2008)
September 26, 2008 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING ALL CASE MANAGEMENT DATES re 30 Notice (Other) filed by U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/26/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
September 23, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO COMPLY WITH DISCOVERY STANDING ORDER re 28 Letter Brief filed by U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/23/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lemmons v. United States Postal Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Portia Lemmons
Represented By: Richard P. Duane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco
Represented By: Jennifer S Wang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?