Ewing v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Robert Ewing
Defendant: United States of America and U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco
Mediator: Herbert A. Schwartz
Case Number: 3:2007cv01229
Filed: March 1, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Humboldt
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1346 Tort Claim
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 2, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 94 Stipulation filed by U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco, United States of America. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 15, 2009 90 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
September 30, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE SUBMISSION OF PROPOSED FINDINGS OF FACT AND CONCLUSIONS OF LAW. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/30/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
September 19, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 9/18/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 5, 2008 68 Opinion or Order of the Court SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/5/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ewing v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Jonathan Unruh Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Postal Service, San Francisco
Represented By: Jonathan Unruh Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Ewing
Represented By: Michael Joseph Crowley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Mediator: Herbert A. Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?