Westernoff v. C-Risk, Inc

Plaintiff: W. Gary Westernoff
Defendant: C-Risk, Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv01230
Filed: March 1, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2011 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 9, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
September 27, 2011 48 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 27, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
August 2, 2011 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 42 Letter filed by C-Risk, Inc, David Grenier to start the settlement conference at 10:00 AM. Settlement Conference set for 9/26/2011 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 08/02/11. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2011)
May 25, 2011 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE DEFAULT JUDGMENT; SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The judgment entered August 28, 2007 is vacated, and entry of default is set aside, A Case Management Conference is scheduled for July 8, 2011; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than July 1, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 25, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2011)
April 11, 2011 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION CONTINUING HEARING DATE. Plaintiff's opposition to the motion to vacate the judgment is due April 20, 2011, defendants' reply is due May 13, 2011, and the hearing on the motion is rescheduled from April 22, 2011 to May 27, 2011. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 11, 2011. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
September 30, 2009 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPROVING NOTICE OF SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Westernoff v. C-Risk, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: W. Gary Westernoff
Represented By: Jill Eileen Latchaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C-Risk, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?