Exonhit Therapeutics SA et al v. Jivan Biologics Inc

Plaintiff: Exonhit Therapeutics Inc and Exonhit Therapeutics SA
Defendant: Jivan Biologics Inc
Counter-claimant: Jivan Biologics Inc
Counter-defendant: Exonhit Therapeutics SA and Exonhit Therapeutics Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv01427
Filed: March 12, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Outside US
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271 Patent Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 1, 2010 189 Opinion or Order of the Court ENTRY OF CONSENT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION in favor of Exonhit Therapeutics Inc, Exonhit Therapeutics SA against Jivan Biologics Inc. Signed by Judge Alsup on March 1, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
February 24, 2010 185 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REJECTING STIPULATION AND CONSENT TO ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CURRENT FORM. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 24, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 1, 2010 177 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PROPOSED EXTENSION TO DEPOSITION AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE, AND SCHEDULING CMC. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 10, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2010)
January 19, 2010 173 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 19, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2010)
January 14, 2010 171 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE, DEPOSITIONS, AND HEARING REGARDING AMENDED CLAIMS. Signed by Judge Alsup on January 14, 2010. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
December 10, 2009 160 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 12/17/2009.. Signed by Judge Alsup on December 10, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/10/2009)
December 1, 2009 158 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO LIFT STAY, SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE, AND VACATING HEARING by Judge Alsup granting 155 Motion Lifting Stay (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2009) (Additional attachment(s) added on 12/2/2009: # 1 order) (sis, COURT STAFF).
October 28, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL (re 153 Notice of Substitution of Counsel). Signed by Judge Alsup on October 28, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
February 26, 2009 150 Opinion or Order of the Court REQUEST TO USPTO RE PENDING REEXAMINATION. Signed by Judge Alsup on February 26, 2009. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 6, 2008 80 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 6, 2008. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Exonhit Therapeutics SA et al v. Jivan Biologics Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exonhit Therapeutics Inc
Represented By: Wei-Ning Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Exonhit Therapeutics SA
Represented By: Clive Miles McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jivan Biologics Inc
Represented By: Michael John Sacksteder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-claimant: Jivan Biologics Inc
Represented By: Michael John Sacksteder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Exonhit Therapeutics SA
Represented By: Clive Miles McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Counter-defendant: Exonhit Therapeutics Inc
Represented By: Clive Miles McClintock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?