Sims v. Cellco Partnership

Plaintiff: Michelle Sims
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Case Number: 3:2007cv01510
Filed: March 15, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2009 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING CONTINUED HEARING ON FINAL APPROVAL OF THE SETTLEMENT. The parties shall provide relevant authority by September 29, 2009. The continued hearing regarding final approval is reset to October 2, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 11, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2009)
September 2, 2009 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADVANCING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT AND FOR AWARD OF ATTORNEYS' FEES, EXPENSES AND INCENTIVE AWARD. The hearing is advanced from October 2, 2009 to September 18, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 2, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2009)
January 14, 2009 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE PENDING SETTLEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER. The January 16, 2009 Case Management Conference is vacated. Plaintiff shall file a motion for preliminary approval by January 23, 2009, and shall notice the motion for hearing on February 6, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine Chesney on January 14, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 16, 2008 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY MICHAEL J. ASCHENBRENER PRO HAC VICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 16, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2008)
November 25, 2008 63 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from December 5, 2008 to January 16, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 25, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
September 4, 2008 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from September 12, 2008 to December 5, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 4, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sims v. Cellco Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle Sims
Represented By: Myles P. McGuire
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cellco Partnership
Represented By: Penelope Athene Preovolos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?