Picketfence Inc. v. R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company

Plaintiff: Picketfence Inc.
Defendant: R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv01551
Filed: March 19, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 31, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/31/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
February 10, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 108 Stipulation filed by R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company, Picketfence Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/10/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
November 20, 2008 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: EXPERT WITNESS DEADLINES re 106 Stipulation filed by Picketfence Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/20/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
September 29, 2008 101 Opinion or Order of the Court PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/29/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 22, 2008 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AMENDING SECOND COMPLAINT re 90 Stipulation filed by Picketfence Inc. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/22/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
March 23, 2007 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting attorney Jeffrey L. Widman PHV. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/23/07. (ga, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Picketfence Inc. v. R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Picketfence Inc.
Represented By: Christina A. Dondero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R.R. Donnelley & Sons Company
Represented By: Jeffrey L. Widman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?