Gallo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration

Plaintiff: Denise Gallo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Case Number: 3:2007cv01561
Filed: March 19, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405 Review of HHS Decision (DIWW)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
February 12, 2010 35 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT; ORDER CLOSING FILE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/12/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
October 1, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING OSC re 31 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/1/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
September 24, 2009 31 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 10/1/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/24/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
August 25, 2009 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPY re 28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment and/or Remand filed by Commissioner of Social Security Administration. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/25/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 20, 2009 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING OSC re 26 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/20/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2009)
August 17, 2009 26 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re 24 Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/17/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 4, 2009 24 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Response due by 8/11/2009.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 8/4/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallo v. Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Gallo
Represented By: James Hunt Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?