Oracle Corporation et al v. SAP AG et al Featured Case

Oracle sued SAP for stealing its intellectual property. A jury awarded Oracle a verdict of $1.3 billion in damages against SAP over the theft of the company's intellectual property. Among the claims made against SAP are violations of the Federal Computer Fraud and Abuse Act and California Computer Data Access and Fraud Act, unfair competition, intentional and negligent interference with prospective economic advantage and civil conspiracy. Analysis and commentary on the initial complaint by Santa Clara Law Professor Eric Goldman. Also includes links to other resources, news and commentary on the case.

Plaintiff: Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc. and Oracle Corporation
Defendant: SAP America Inc, SAP AG and Tomorrownow Inc
Case Number: 3:2007cv01658
Filed: March 22, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: Oakland Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Edward M. Chen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331 Fed. Question
Jury Demanded By: Both

Docket Report

We have record of the following docket entries for this case:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 9, 2012 1224 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF DAVID NIMMER AND JOSEPH M. LIPNER AS COUNSEL FOR SAP AG, SAP AMERICA, INC., AND TOMORROWNOW, INC. re 1222 Notice (Other) filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/9/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2012)
October 5, 2012 1223 Proposed Order re 1222 Notice (Other) GRANTING WITHDRAWAL OF DAVID NIMMER AND JOSEPH M. LIPNER by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lipner, Joseph) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
October 5, 2012 1222 NOTICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc OF WITHDRAWAL OF DAVID NIMMER AND JOSEPH M. LIPNER (Lipner, Joseph) (Filed on 10/5/2012)
September 17, 2012 1221 USCA Case Number 12-17053 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 1220 Notice of Appeal filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2012)
September 14, 2012 1220 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7125148 paid.) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/14/2012)
September 4, 2012 1219 USCA Case Number 12-16944 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 1218 Notice of Appeal, filed by Oracle Systems Corporation, J.D. Edwards Europe Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2012)
August 31, 2012 1218 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA J.D. Edwards Europe Limited, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc..(Appeal fee of $455 receipt number 0971-7092080 paid.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/31/2012)
August 10, 2012 1217 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1215 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibit A-0059 by Oracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-6329-1, # 2 Exhibit A-5995, # 3 Exhibit A-5058, # 4 Exhibit B to the Motamed Declaration)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1216 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1214 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits 20, 23, and 27 to the Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier iso Parties' Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections [E-FILED UNDER SEAL PURSUANT TO ECF NO. 1214] by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 20, # 2 Exhibit 23, # 3 Exhibit 27)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1215 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 10, 2012 1214 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2012)
August 3, 2012 1213 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/3/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1212 STIPULATION AND FORM OF JUDGMENT AND ORDER by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1209 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2012)
August 3, 2012 1211 Proposed Amended Judgment by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Siebel Systems, Inc., Tomorrownow Inc. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/3/2012) Modified on 8/6/2012 (cp, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2012 1210 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle International Corporation re 1206 Declaration in Support,,,,, (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1209 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation and Proposed Form of Judgment and Order filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Siebel Systems, Inc., Tomorrownow Inc. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1208 RESPONSE (re 1204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File under Seal Materials Offered by Defendants in Support of the Parties' Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Seal, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of Defendants' Motion to Seal)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1207 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Exhibits to the Motamed Declaration in Support of Joint Statement Regarding Evidentiary Issues filed by Oracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of Motion to Seal, # 3 Stipulation)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1206 Declaration of Nargues Motamed in Support of 1202 Statement Joint Statement in Support of Evidentiary Issues filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-0059, # 2 Exhibit A-6329-1, # 3 Exhibit A-0367, # 4 Exhibit A-5042, # 5 Exhibit A-5997, # 6 Exhibit A-6042-1, # 7 Exhibit A-6205-1, # 8 Exhibit A-5193, # 9 Exhibit A-5995, # 10 Exhibit A-5058, # 11 Exhibit A-5002-1, # 12 Exhibit A, # 13 Exhibit B, # 14 Exhibit C, # 15 Exhibit D, # 16 Exhibit E, # 17 Exhibit F, # 18 Exhibit G, # 19 Exhibit H, # 20 Exhibit I, # 21 Exhibit J, # 22 Exhibit K, # 23 Exhibit L, # 24 Exhibit M, # 25 Exhibit N, # 26 Exhibit PTX 0008, # 27 Exhibit PTX 0014, # 28 Exhibit PTX 0161, # 29 Exhibit O, # 30 Exhibit P, # 31 Exhibit Q, # 32 Exhibit R, # 33 Exhibit PTX 4809, # 34 Exhibit PTX 4819, # 35 Exhibit PTX 0012, # 36 Exhibit PTX 0024, # 37 Exhibit PTX 0960, # 38 Exhibit PTX 7028, # 39 Exhibit S, # 40 Exhibit T, # 41 Exhibit U, # 42 Exhibit V, # 43 Exhibit W, # 44 Exhibit PTX 8040, # 45 Exhibit PTX 2582, # 46 Exhibit X, # 47 Exhibit Y, # 48 Exhibit PTX 8112, # 49 Exhibit PTX 8111, # 50 Exhibit PTX 8108)(Related document(s) 1202 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1205 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1204 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File under Seal Materials Offered by Defendants in Support of the Parties' Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Stipulation)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1203 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1196 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections [FILED UNDER SEAL] by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1202 Statement re 1196 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1201 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1182 Statement Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier iso Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59)(Related document(s) 1182 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1200 Declaration of Kevin M. Papay in Support of 1199 Brief Offer Of Proof Regarding Oracle's Hypothetical License Damages filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT, # 47 Exhibit UU, # 48 Exhibit VV, # 49 Exhibit WW, # 50 Exhibit XX, # 51 Exhibit YY, # 52 Exhibit ZZ, # 53 Exhibit AAA, # 54 Exhibit BBB, # 55 Exhibit CCC, # 56 Exhibit DDD, # 57 Exhibit EEE, # 58 Exhibit FFF, # 59 Exhibit GGG, # 60 Exhibit HHH, # 61 Exhibit III, # 62 Exhibit JJJ, # 63 Exhibit KKK, # 64 Exhibit LLL)(Related document(s) 1199 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 2, 2012 1199 Brief Offer of Proof Regarding Oracle's Hypothetical License Damages filed byOracle International Corporation. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/2/2012)
August 1, 2012 1198 Exhibit List Defendants' Revised Trial Exhibit List for New Trial by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
August 1, 2012 1197 Witness List by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc Defendants' Second Revised Witness List for New Trial. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/1/2012)
July 31, 2012 1196 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton re 1182 Joint Motion Regarding Exhibit Objections; Order granting in part and denying in part 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2012)
July 19, 2012 1195 Mail sent to Terry Myers returned as undeliverable re 1193 USCA Mandate, 1194 Clerks Letter Spreading Mandate. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/19/2012)
July 6, 2012 1194 CLERKS Letter Spreading Mandate to Counsel (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service)(kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 1193 MANDATE of USCA as to 1111 Notice of Appeal filed by Terry M. Myers (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
July 6, 2012 1192 CLERKS NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the courts trial calendar has cleared and the August trial date is now firm. Jury Selection set for 8/27/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Trial set for 8/27/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE)(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2012)
June 12, 2012 1191 REPLY (re 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Oracles Information in Support of the Parties Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Oracles Information in Support of the Parties Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
June 8, 2012 1190 Minute Entry: Further Pretrial Conference Held before the Honorable Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 6/8/2012). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/8/2012)
June 7, 2012 1189 Amended Joint Jury Instructions - Blind Copy by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc . (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 6/7/2012) Modified on 6/8/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 7, 2012 1188 Amended Joint Jury Instructions and Proposed Special Verdict Form by Oracle International Corporation, SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/7/2012) Modified on 6/8/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2012 1187 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle International Corporation (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 6, 2012 1186 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 6, 2012 1184 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal re 1182 Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Stipulation)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 6/6/2012) Modified on 6/7/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 6, 2012 1183 Proposed Order re 1182 Statement [Defendants' Proposed] Order Regarding Exhibit Admissibility by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 6/6/2012)
June 5, 2012 1185 Proposed Order re 1182 [Plaintiff's Proposed] Order Regarding Admission of Exhibits by Oracle International Corporation. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/7/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2012 1182 Joint Statement Regarding Exhibit Objections by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/7/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2012 1181 Second Amended Trial Exhibit List by Oracle International Corporation.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/5/2012) Modified on 6/6/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 5, 2012 1180 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1179 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for John Laurens Wilkes.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/5/2012)
June 1, 2012 1179 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice re John Laurens Wilkes ( Filing fee $ 305, receipt number 0971-6863798.) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 6/1/2012) Modified on 6/4/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 1, 2012 1178 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Jane Louise Froyd (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 6/1/2012)
June 1, 2012 1177 Featured Case ORDER re 1176 Response filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, 1173 Statement, filed by Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle Corporation. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/1/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/1/2012) Modified on 6/4/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2012 1176 Defendants' Response to 1173 Oracle's Statement Regarding Trial Schedule by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2012 1175 Oracle's Deposition Excerpts and Discovery Responses by Oracle International Corporation. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2012 1174 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Geoffrey M. Howard (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/31/2012)
May 31, 2012 1173 ORACLES STATEMENT REGARDING TRIAL SCHEDULE by Oracle Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 31, 2012 1172 Defendants' Deposition Designations for New Trial by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/31/2012) Modified on 6/1/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2012 1171 Featured Case FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/29/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/29/2012)
May 25, 2012 1170 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/25/2012)
May 24, 2012 1169 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held before the Honorable Phyllis J. Hamilton on May 24, 2012 (Date Filed: 5/24/2012). Further Pretrial Conference set for 6/8/2012 09:00 AM. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/24/2012)
May 24, 2012 1168 Exhibit List Oracle's Amended Trial Exhibit List by Oracle International Corporation.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/24/2012)
May 23, 2012 1167 Witness List by Oracle International Corporation Oracle's Amended Trial Witness List. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 1166 Witness List by Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, SAP AG Defendants' Revised Witness List for New Trial. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 23, 2012 1165 CLERKS NOTICE. YOU ARE HEREBY NOTIFIED that the Pretrial Conference is advanced to 1:30 p.m. on May 24, 2012, in this matter. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2012 01:30 PM. (THIS IS A TEXT ONLY DOCKET ENTRY, THERE IS NO DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS NOTICE) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/23/2012)
May 18, 2012 1164 Featured Case ORDER re pretrial filings. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/18/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2012) Modified on 5/21/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
May 17, 2012 1163 RESPONSE (re 1158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Oppositions to Oracle's Motions in Limine ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Oppositions to Oracle's Motions in Limine, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Oppositions to Oracle's Motions in Limine)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/17/2012)
May 15, 2012 1162 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 1120 Motion for Clarification; denying 1122 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration; denying 1124 Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2012)
May 11, 2012 1161 DOCUMENT E-FILED UNDER SEAL re 1160 Order on Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Trial Brief by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 11, 2012 1160 Order by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2012)
May 10, 2012 1159 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1158 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Oppositions to Oracle's Motions in Limine filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Stipulation)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1157 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1156 Opposition/Response to Motion Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of Defendants' Oppositions to Oracle's Motions in Limine filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23)(Related document(s) 1156 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1156 RESPONSE (re 1145 MOTION in Limine ) Defendants' Oppositions to Oracle's Motions in Limine filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1155 Declaration of Thai Le in Support of 1154 Opposition/Response to Motion In Limine filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z)(Related document(s) 1154 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 10, 2012 1154 RESPONSE (re 1142 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/10/2012)
May 9, 2012 1153 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 1111 Notice of Appeal filed by Terry M. Myers re: fees and OSC (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
May 3, 2012 1152 RESPONSE (re 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Trial Brief ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of Plaintiff's Response in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Trial Brief, # 2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Trial Brief)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 5/3/2012)
May 1, 2012 1151 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1150 Opposition/Response to Motion,, 1149 Opposition/Response to Motion, Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of Defendants' Oppositions to Oracle's Motions for Leave to File Motions for Reconsideration Regarding (1) Saved Development Costs and (2) Up-Sell and Cross-Sell Projections, and Motion for Clarification filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 1150 , 1149 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1150 RESPONSE (re 1122 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Saved Development Costs, 1124 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Up-Sell and Cross-Sell Projections ) Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Motions for Leave to File Motions for Reconsideration Regarding (1) Saved Development Costs and (2) Up-Sell and Cross-Sell Projections filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
May 1, 2012 1149 RESPONSE (re 1120 MOTION for Clarification ) Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Motion for Clarification filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/1/2012)
April 27, 2012 1148 STIPULATION re 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Trial Brief filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/27/2012)
April 26, 2012 1147 Exhibit List Revised by Oracle International Corporation.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1146 Declaration of Nitin Jindal in Support of 1145 MOTION in Limine filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1145 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1145 MOTION in Limine filed by Oracle International Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 5/10/2012. Replies due by 5/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motions In Limine)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1144 TRIAL BRIEF by Oracle International Corporation. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1143 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1142 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 1142 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1142 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/24/2012 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 5/10/2012. Replies due by 5/17/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1141 Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by Oracle International Corporation, SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012) Modified on 4/27/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2012 1140 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1139 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Trial Brief [PUBLIC REDACTED VERSION] by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1138 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File under Seal Oracle's Information in Support of Defendants' Trial Brief filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1137 Statement Defendants' List of Other Discovery Responses for Use at New Trial by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1136 Exhibit List Defendants' Trial Exhibit List for New Trial by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1135 Witness List by Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, SAP AG Defendants' Witness List for New Trial. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1134 Proposed Joint Jury Instructions by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc, Oracle International Corporation . (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/26/2012) Modified on 4/27/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2012 1133 Exhibit List by Oracle International Corporation.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1132 Witness List by Oracle International Corporation . (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1131 Proposed Jury Instructions by Oracle International Corporation, SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc Joint Jury Instructions and Proposed Special Verdict Form. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 26, 2012 1130 Proposed Voir Dire by Oracle International Corporation, SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc Joint Proposed Juror Questionnaire. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/26/2012)
April 25, 2012 1129 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLY WITH PORTIONS OF PRETRIAL ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS AND COUNTER DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1128 Stipulation.(nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/25/2012)
April 20, 2012 1128 STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLY WITH PORTIONS OF PRETRIAL ORDER REGARDING SUBMISSION OF TRIAL EXHIBITS AND DEPOSITION DESIGNATIONS filed by Oracle International Corporation. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/20/2012)
April 19, 2012 1127 Featured Case ERRATA TO 1126 ORDER signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/19/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/19/2012) Modified on 4/19/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2012 1126 Featured Case ORDER re 1122 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Saved Development Costs filed by Oracle International Corporation, 1120 MOTION for Clarification filed by Oracle International Corporation, 1124 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Up-Sell and Cross-Sell Projections filed by Oracle International Corporation. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 4/18/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2012)
April 17, 2012 1125 Declaration of Kyle Zipes in Support of 1124 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Up-Sell and Cross-Sell Projections filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1124 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 1124 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Up-Sell and Cross-Sell Projections filed by Oracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Oracle's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Up-Sell and Cross-Sell Projections)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 1123 Declaration of Kyle Zipes in Support of 1122 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Saved Development Costs filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1122 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 1122 MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Saved Development Costs filed by Oracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Oracle's Motion for Leave to File Motion for Reconsideration Regarding Saved Development Costs)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 1121 Declaration of Nitin Jindal in Support of 1120 MOTION for Clarification filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 1120 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 17, 2012 1120 MOTION for Clarification filed by Oracle International Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 5/23/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 5/1/2012. Replies due by 5/8/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Oracle's Motion for Clarification)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/17/2012)
April 4, 2012 1119 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman re: Further Update. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 4/4/2012)
March 28, 2012 1118 Featured Case ORDER of USCA as to 1111 Notice of Appeal filed by Terry M. Myers (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/28/2012)
March 23, 2012 1117 Letter from Steven C. Holtzman re: Further Scheduling Update. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/23/2012) Modified on 3/27/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2012 1116 Mail sent to Terry M. Meyers returned as undeliverable re 1112 Appeal Fee Payment Request. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2012)
March 7, 2012 1115 USCA Case Number 12-15482 Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals for 1111 Notice of Appeal filed by Terry M. Myers. (kk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/7/2012)
March 5, 2012 1114 Statement Defendants' Statement Regarding Oracle's March 4, 2012 Letter to the Court by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/5/2012)
March 4, 2012 1113 Letter from Steven Holtzman to Judge Hamilton re trial schedule . (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 3/4/2012)
March 2, 2012 1112 Mailed request for payment of docket fee to appellant (cc to USCA) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2012)
March 1, 2012 1111 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th CCA Terry M. Myers. Appeal of Order, 1104 , Order on Motion to Intervene 1065 , Order on Motion to Intervene 1101 (Appeal fee FEE NOT PAID.) (Attachments: # 1 Envelope)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2012)
February 28, 2012 1110 Featured Case PRETRIAL ORDER RE RETRIAL re 1109 Statement, filed by SAP AG, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, Siebel Systems, Inc. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/24/2012 02:30 PM. Jury Selection set for 6/18/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Jury Trial set for 6/18/2012 08:30 AM before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/28/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
February 24, 2012 1109 Joint Statement Regarding Trial Date by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc., Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc. Siebel Systems, Inc.(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 2/24/2012) Modified on 2/27/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/27/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 16, 2012 1108 Featured Case SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/16/12. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/16/2012)
February 6, 2012 1107 RESPONSE to re 1095 Order, Plaintiffs' Rejection of Remittitur and Request for Retrial by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/6/2012)
January 27, 2012 1106 Mail sent to Terry M. Meyers returned as undeliverable re 1104 Order. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2012)
January 24, 2012 1105 Mail sent to Terry M. Meyers returned as undeliverable re 1104 Order. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
January 12, 2012 1104 Featured Case ORDER re Terry M. Meyers. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/12/2012. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2012) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/12/2012: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF). Modified on 1/13/2012 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 6, 2012 1103 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 1089 Motion for section 1292(b) certification. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/6/2012)
December 27, 2011 1102 Mail sent to Terry M. Myers returned as undeliverable re 1101 Order on Motion to Intervene. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/27/2011)
December 12, 2011 1101 Featured Case ORDER DENYING AMENDED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO INTERVENE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 1099 Motion to Intervene (Attachments: # 1 Certificate/Proof of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2011)
December 8, 2011 1098 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/8/2011)
December 7, 2011 1097 Declaration of Jane L. Froyd in Support of 1096 Statement Declaration of Jane L. Froyd in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Amended Motion for Leave to Intervene filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1096 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/7/2011)
December 7, 2011 1096 Defendants' Opposition to 1099 Amended Motion for Leave to Intervene by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/7/2011) Modified on 12/9/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 5, 2011 1100 NOTICE of Filing by Terry M. Myers re 1099 MOTION to Intervene (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
December 5, 2011 1099 AMENDED MOTION to Intervene filed by Terry M. Myers. Responses due by 12/19/2011. Replies due by 12/27/2011. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2011)
November 8, 2011 1095 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEADLINE TO ACCEPT OR REJECT REMITTITUR re 1094 Stipulation filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/8/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/8/2011)
October 31, 2011 1094 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Deadline To Accept Or Reject Remittitur by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/31/2011)
October 14, 2011 1093 REPLY (re 1089 MOTION for 1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Review MOTION for 1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Review ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/14/2011)
October 7, 2011 1092 RESPONSE (re 1089 MOTION for 1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Review MOTION for 1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Review ) Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Motion for 1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Review filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Appendix Appendix of Unpublished Authorities)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 7, 2011 1091 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT DEFENDANT MAY RELEASE THE SUPERSEDEAS BOND re 1090 Stipulation filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/7/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2011)
October 5, 2011 1090 Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order That Defendants May Release the Supersedeas Bond by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/5/2011) Modified on 10/6/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2011 1089 MOTION for 1292(b) Certification for Interlocutory Review filed by Oracle International Corporation. Responses due by 10/7/2011. Replies due by 10/14/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/23/2011) Modified on 9/26/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2011 ***1/11/12 hearing terminated re 1085 MOTION 1292(b) Certification For Interlocutory Review (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 16, 2011 1088 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 1086 Motion to Stay; extending deadline for Oracle to accept or reject remittitur; vacating hearing dates; and setting briefing schedule. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2011)
September 13, 2011 1087 STIPULATION re 1086 MOTION to Stay for Order Shortening Time by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 13, 2011 1086 MOTION to Stay filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/27/2011. Replies due by 10/4/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/13/2011)
September 12, 2011 1085 MOTION 1292(b) Certification For Interlocutory Review re 1081 Order on Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law, Order on Motion for New Trial, filed by Oracle International Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 1/11/2012 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. Responses due by 9/26/2011. Replies due by 10/3/2011. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 12, 2011 1084 Featured Case ORDER RELATING CASE. C-07-1658 PJH AND CR-11-0642 SBA ARE RELATED. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/12/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
September 9, 2011 1083 Response and Non-Opposition re 1082 Notice of Related Case in a Criminal Action by Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2011 1082 Notice of Related Case In A Criminal Action by United States Dept. of Justice. (Knight, Susan) (Filed on 9/9/2011) Modified on 9/12/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2011 1081 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 1044 Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law; granting 1044 Motion for New Trial; denying 1046 Motion for New Trial (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 ***Deadlines terminated. 1080 Telephonic Status Conference held on 8/1/11. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2011)
August 1, 2011 1080 Minute Entry: Telephonic Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Spero on 8/1/11. (Recording #Not Recorded.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/1/2011)
July 20, 2011 1079 CLERKS NOTICE: Telephonic Status Conference set for 8/1/2011 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2011)
July 13, 2011 1078 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 7/13/2011 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 7/13/2011) re 1044 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and MOTION for New Trial filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, 1046 MOTION for New Trial CONDITIONAL Motion for New Trial filed by Oracle International Corporation. (Court Reporter Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 7/13/2011)
June 22, 2011 1077 Featured Case ORDER APPROVING SUPERSEDEAS BOND PURSUANT TO RULE 62 OF THE FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE re 1076 Proposed Order, filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/22/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2011)
June 20, 2011 1076 Proposed Order re 1075 Order Request For Approval of Signed Supersedeas Bond Pursuant to Rule 62 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
June 9, 2011 1075 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SECURITY re 1074 Stipulation, filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/9/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2011)
June 8, 2011 1074 STIPULATION re 1070 MOTION Approval of Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 Defendants' Motion For Approval of Security Pursuant to Rule 62 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Defendants' Motion for Approval of Security by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 6/8/2011)
May 20, 2011 1073 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 1072 Opposition/Response to Motion, For Approval of Security Pursuant to Rule 62 filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 1072 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 1072 RESPONSE (re 1070 MOTION Approval of Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 Defendants' Motion For Approval of Security Pursuant to Rule 62 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 1071 Declaration of Jane L. Froyd in Support of 1070 MOTION Approval of Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 Defendants' Motion For Approval of Security Pursuant to Rule 62 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3)(Related document(s) 1070 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
May 20, 2011 1070 MOTION Approval of Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 Defendants' Motion For Approval of Security Pursuant to Rule 62 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 5/20/2011)
April 29, 2011 1069 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT THROUGH APPEAL AND APPROVAL OF PROPOSED SECURITY PURSUANT TO FRCP 62 by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 1051 Motion to Stay (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2011)
April 27, 2011 1068 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1067 Reply to Opposition/Response Reply Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of Defendants' Renewed Motion for Judgment as a Matter of Law and New Trial Motion filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 1067 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 27, 2011 1067 REPLY (re 1044 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and MOTION for New Trial ) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 27, 2011 1066 REPLY (re 1046 MOTION for New Trial CONDITIONAL Motion for New Trial ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/27/2011)
April 26, 2011 1065 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 1064 Motion to Intervene (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/27/2011: # 1 Certificate of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
April 26, 2011 1064 MOTION to Intervene filed by Terry M. Meyers. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2011)
April 20, 2011 1063 Declaration of Marcin Plonka in Support of 1062 Reply to Opposition/Response, Declaration of Marcin Plonka in Support of Defendants' Reply in Support of Motion to Stay Execution of Judgment through Appeal and Approval of Proposed Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 1062 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 20, 2011 1062 REPLY (re 1051 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion For Stay of Execution of Judgment Through Appeal and Approval of Proposed Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 ) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/20/2011)
April 14, 2011 1061 EXHIBITS re 1045 Declaration in Support,,,, Corrected Exhibit 38 to the Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier iso Defendants' Renewed Motion For Judgment as a Matter of Law and New Trial Motion [CORRECTION OF DOCKET #[1045-38]] filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 1045 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2011)
April 13, 2011 1060 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 1059 Opposition/Response to Motion, For Stay of Judgment and Approval of Proposed Security filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 1059 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 13, 2011 1059 RESPONSE (re 1051 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion For Stay of Execution of Judgment Through Appeal and Approval of Proposed Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/13/2011)
April 8, 2011 1058 Declaration of Lisa Chin in Support of 1057 Opposition/Response to Motion for JMOL or New Trial filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A part 1, # 2 Exhibit A part 2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X, # 26 Exhibit Y, # 27 Exhibit Z, # 28 Exhibit AA, # 29 Exhibit BB, # 30 Exhibit CC, # 31 Exhibit DD, # 32 Exhibit EE, # 33 Exhibit FF, # 34 Exhibit GG, # 35 Exhibit HH, # 36 Exhibit II, # 37 Exhibit JJ, # 38 Exhibit KK, # 39 Exhibit LL, # 40 Exhibit MM, # 41 Exhibit NN, # 42 Exhibit OO, # 43 Exhibit PP, # 44 Exhibit QQ, # 45 Exhibit RR, # 46 Exhibit SS, # 47 Exhibit TT, # 48 Exhibit UU, # 49 Exhibit VV)(Related document(s) 1057 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 1057 RESPONSE (re 1044 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and MOTION for New Trial ) filed byOracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 1056 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1055 Opposition/Response to Motion, Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Conditional Motion for New Trial filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 1055 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
April 8, 2011 1055 RESPONSE (re 1046 MOTION for New Trial CONDITIONAL Motion for New Trial ) Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Conditional Motion for New Trial filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Conditional Motion for New Trial)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 4/8/2011)
March 24, 2011 1054 Declaration of Michael Junge in Support of 1051 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion For Stay of Execution of Judgment Through Appeal and Approval of Proposed Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 1051 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 1053 Declaration of Marcin Plonka in Support of 1051 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion For Stay of Execution of Judgment Through Appeal and Approval of Proposed Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 1051 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 1052 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1051 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion For Stay of Execution of Judgment Through Appeal and Approval of Proposed Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 1051 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 24, 2011 1051 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Motion For Stay of Execution of Judgment Through Appeal and Approval of Proposed Security Pursuant to FRCP 62 filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/4/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/24/2011)
March 10, 2011 1050 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TEMPORARY STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT AND REQUEST TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 1048 Stipulation filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 3/10/111. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2011)
March 9, 2011 1049 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 1048 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Briefing Schedule filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 1048 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
March 9, 2011 1048 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Temporary Stay of Execution of Judgment and Extend Briefing Schedule by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/9/2011)
February 23, 2011 1047 Declaration of Bree Hann in Support of 1046 CONDITIONAL MOTION for New Trial filed by Oracle International Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 1046 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 2/23/2011) Modified on 2/24/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2011 1046 CONDITIONAL MOTION for New Trial filed by Oracle International Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/23/2011) Modified on 2/24/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 23, 2011 1045 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1044 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and MOTION for New Trial filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42)(Related document(s) 1044 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 1044 MOTION for Judgment as a Matter of Law and, MOTION for New Trial filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 7/13/2011 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland before Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 23, 2011 1043 Featured Case ORDER re 1041 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 2/23/2011. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2011)
February 18, 2011 1042 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1041 Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order to Extend Briefing Schedule and Expand Page Limits for Post-Judgment Briefs filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 2/18/2011) Modified on 2/22/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 18, 2011 1041 Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order to Extend Briefing Schedule and Expand Page Limits for Post-Judgment Briefs by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 2/18/2011) Modified on 2/22/2011 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 14, 2011 1040 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TEMPORARY STAY OF EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT re 1039 Stipulation filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/14/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/14/2011)
February 11, 2011 1039 STIPULATION Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Temporary Stay of Execution of Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
February 3, 2011 1038 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO TEMPORARILY STAY EXECUTION OF JUDGMENT re 1035 Stipulation filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 1037 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING INFRINGING MATERIALS IN DEFENDANTS' POSSESSION re 1034 Stipulation, filed by SAP AG, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 1036 JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 2/3/11. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2011)
February 3, 2011 1035 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Temporarily Stay Execution of Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 2/3/2011) Modified on 2/4/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 1034 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Infringing Materials in Defendants' Possession by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tomorrownow Inc. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/2/2011) Modified on 2/3/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2011 1033 Joint Proposed Form of Judgment by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tomorrownow Inc. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/2/2011) Modified on 2/3/2011 (kc, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2011 1032 NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph Mark Lipner, filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tomorrownow Inc. (Lipner, Joseph) (Filed on 1/27/2011) Modified on 1/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
January 27, 2011 1031 NOTICE of Appearance of David Nimmer, filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tomorrownow Inc. (Nimmer, David) (Filed on 1/27/2011) Modified on 1/28/2011 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2010 1030 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton DENYING 1029 Motion for Leave to File Reply. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton, on 12/28/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010) Modified on 12/29/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 28, 2010 1029 MOTION for Leave to File Reply filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 28, 2010 1028 CLERKS NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY RE 1027 (jlm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/28/2010)
December 27, 2010 1027 ***ERRONEOUS ENTRY, PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 1029 *** Statement regarding Oracle's Request for Leave to File Reply by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/27/2010) Modified on 12/29/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 1026 Declaration of William R. Thomas in Support of 1021 Response filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 1021 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 1025 Declaration of M. Gary Funck in Support of 1021 Response filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 1021 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 1024 Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of 1021 Response filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 1021 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 1023 Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 1021 Response filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 1021 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 1022 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 1021 Response filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21)(Related document(s) 1021 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 23, 2010 1021 RESPONSE to 1014 Proposed Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Judgment)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/23/2010) Modified on 12/27/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 20, 2010 1020 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Charles Gratz (Gratz, Joseph) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 1019 NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua H. Lerner (Lerner, Joshua) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 1018 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Henry Page (Page, Michael) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 1017 NOTICE of Appearance by Mark Alan Lemley (Lemley, Mark) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 20, 2010 1016 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING UNSEALING OF DOCKET ITEM 961 re 1015 Stipulation filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/20/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2010)
December 16, 2010 1015 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding the Unsealing of Docket Item 961 by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/16/2010) Modified on 12/17/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2010 1014 Oracle's Revised [Proposed] Judgment by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 12/16/2010) Modified on 12/17/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2010 1013 Oracle's RESPONSE to 1012 Order Dated December 14, 2010 by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 12/16/2010) Modified on 12/17/2010 (cjl, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2010 1012 Featured Case ORDER re: proposed judgment. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 12/14/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2010) Modified on 12/15/2010 (kk, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2010 1011 RESPONSE to 1010 Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Form of Judgment by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 12/13/2010) Modified on 12/14/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 13, 2010 1010 Defendants' Statement Regarding Plaintiffs' Proposed Form of Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 12/13/2010) Modified on 12/14/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
December 10, 2010 1009 Proposed Order [Oracle's Proposed Form of Judgment with Memorandum and Declaration in Support] by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 12/10/2010)
November 23, 2010 1008 NOTICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc of Lodging Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of 994 Defendants' Offer of Proof Regarding The At-Risk Report And Impact on Damages Analysis (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/23/2010) Modified on 11/24/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/24/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 23, 2010 1007 Exhibit and Witness List. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 1006 Minute Entry: Jury Trial completed on 11/23/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/23/2010). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 1005 FINAL Jury Instructions. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 23, 2010 1004 JURY VERDICT. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/23/2010)
November 22, 2010 1003 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (closing arguments/jury deliberations) held on 11/22/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/22/2010). Continued Jury Deliberations set for 11/23/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 1002 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 997 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/22/2010)
November 22, 2010 1001 Proposed Order re 997 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Offer of Proof Regarding The At-Risk Report and Impact on Damages Analysis Corrected by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/22/2010) Modified on 11/23/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2010 1000 JOINT Proposed Final Jury Instructions by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tomorrownow Inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/21/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2010 999 Updated Proposed Form of Verdict by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/21/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 21, 2010 998 Revised Proposed Special Form of Verdict by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/21/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 997 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Offer of Proof Regarding The At-Risk Report and Impact on Damages Analysis filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Declaration, # 3 Stipulation)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 996 DISREGARD, DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY 997 STIPULATION re 995 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Offer of Proof Regarding The At-Risk Report and Impact on Damages Anal by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 995 DISREGARD, DUPLICATE OF DOCKET ENTRY 997 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Offer of Proof Regarding The At-Risk Report and Impact on Damages Analysis filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 994 Offer of Proof Regarding The At-Risk Report and Impact on Damages Analysis by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/19/2010) Modified on 11/22/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 993 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 10) held on 11/19/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/19/2010). Jury Trial (closing arguments) set for 11/22/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/19/2010)
November 18, 2010 992 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (Day 9) held on 11/18/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/18/2010). Jury Trial (day 10) set for 11/19/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/18/2010)
November 16, 2010 991 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 8) held on 11/16/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/16/2010). Jury Trial (day 9) set for 11/18/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/16/2010)
November 16, 2010 990 Memorandum in Opposition re 986 MOTION Regarding Admissibility of Plaintiffs' At-Risk Report filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/16/2010) Modified on 11/17/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 989 Offer of Proof Regarding Damages Evidence by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 988 UPDATED OBJECTIONS AND DEFENDANTS RESPONSES RE CUSTOMER TESTIMONY AND RELATED EXHIBITS re 943 Objections by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 15, 2010 987 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 7) held on 11/15/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/15/2010). Jury Trial (day 8) set for 11/16/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/15/2010)
November 15, 2010 986 MOTION Regarding Admissibility of Plaintiffs' At-Risk Report filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/15/2010) Modified on 11/16/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
November 12, 2010 985 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 6) held on 11/12/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/12/2010). Jury Trial (day 7) set for 11/15/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/12/2010)
November 12, 2010 984 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING THE UNSEALING OF TRIAL TRANSCRIPTS FOR USE BY THE PARTIES re 983 Stipulation filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/12/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2010)
November 10, 2010 983 STIPULATION and Proposed Order re Unsealing of Courtroom Transcripts, filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tomorrownow Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/10/2010) Modified on 11/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2010 982 Proposed Jury Instructions: Proposed Joint Instruction Regarding Redacted Materials, filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tomorrownow Inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/10/2010) Modified on 11/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2010 981 Proposed Jury Instructions: Proposed Joint Curative Instructions Regarding Testimony Related to Contributory Infringement, filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tomorrownow Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/10/2010) Modified on 11/12/2010 (jlm, COURT STAFF).
November 9, 2010 980 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 5) held on 11/9/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/9/2010). Jury Trial (day 6) set for 11/12/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/9/2010)
November 8, 2010 979 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 4) held on 11/8/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/8/2010) re 975 MOTION Enforce Orders Defendants' Motion to Enforce Orders Excluding Evidence and Argument of Lost Cross-Sell and Up-Sell Opportunities and Goodwill filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, 974 MOTION Exclude Evidence Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence Related Solely to Contributory Infringement filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Jury Trial (day 5) set for 11/9/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/8/2010)
November 5, 2010 978 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 3) held on 11/5/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/5/2010). Jury Trial (day 4) set for 11/8/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 977 Memorandum in Opposition re 975 MOTION Enforce Orders Defendants' Motion to Enforce Orders Excluding Evidence and Argument of Lost Cross-Sell and Up-Sell Opportunities and Goodwill filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 976 Memorandum in Opposition re 974 MOTION Exclude Evidence Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence Related Solely to Contributory Infringement filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 975 MOTION Enforce Orders Defendants' Motion to Enforce Orders Excluding Evidence and Argument of Lost Cross-Sell and Up-Sell Opportunities and Goodwill filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 5, 2010 974 MOTION Exclude Evidence Defendants' Motion to Exclude Evidence Related Solely to Contributory Infringement filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit A, # 3 Exhibit B)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
November 4, 2010 973 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 2) held on 11/4/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/4/2010). Jury Trial (day 3) set for 11/5/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 972 Proposed Form of Verdict by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 971 Proposed Jury Instructions by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. - [Proposed] Joint Final Jury Instructions. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 4, 2010 970 Proposed Form of Verdict by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc Defendants' Revised Special Verdict Form. (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 11/4/2010)
November 3, 2010 969 Sealed document (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2010)
November 2, 2010 968 PRELIMINARY JURY INSTRUCTIONS. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 967 Minute Entry: Jury Trial (day 1) held on 11/2/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/2/2010). Jury Trial (day 2) set for 11/4/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado and Diane Skillman.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 966 Featured Case TRIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING CONTRIBUTORY INFRINGEMENT LIABILITY re 963 Stipulation filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/2/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 965 Featured Case AMENDED TRIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER NO. 1 REGARDING LIABILITY, DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS, PRESERVATION OF DEFENSES, AND OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AT TRIAL re 962 Stipulation, filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/2/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 964 Proposed Jury Instructions by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Revised Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 2, 2010 963 STIPULATION Trial Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Contributory Infringement Liability by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 11/2/2010)
November 1, 2010 962 STIPULATION Amended Trial Stipulation and [Proposed] Order No. 1 Regarding Liability, Dismissal of Claims, Preservation of Defenses, and Objections to Evidence at Trial by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 961 FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED.STIPULATION Additional Trial Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Claims For Damages and Attorneys Fees by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/2/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2010 960 CIVIL MINUTE ORDER (pjhlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 959 Minute Entry: Jury Selection held on 11/1/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 11/1/2010). Jury Trial (day 1) set for 11/2/2010 08:30 AM. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/1/2010)
November 1, 2010 958 OBJECTIONS to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations Related To Contributory Copyright Infringement by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/1/2010) Modified on 11/2/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 1, 2010 957 Exhibit List by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc... (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 11/1/2010)
October 31, 2010 956 Exhibit List Defendants' Amended Trial Exhibit List by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/31/2010)
October 31, 2010 955 Proposed Jury Instructions by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Joint Preliminary Instructions [Corrected]. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/31/2010)
October 29, 2010 954 Proposed Jury Instructions by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Joint Preliminary Jury Instructions. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 29, 2010 953 Letter from Parties to Judge Hamilton. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/29/2010)
October 28, 2010 952 Minute Entry: Status Conference held on 10/28/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 10/28/2010) re 939 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion For An Order Regarding Counsels' Extrajudicial Communications filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, 950 MOTION to Continue filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 951 Letter Brief re 950 MOTION to Continue Defendants' Opposition to Motion to Continue filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 950 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 28, 2010 950 MOTION to Continue filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
October 27, 2010 949 RESPONSE to re 943 Objection to Defendants' Deposition Designations by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/27/2010) Modified on 10/28/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 948 MOTION Defendants' Request for Leave to Supplement Defendants' Administrative Motion for an Order Re: Counsels' Extrajudicial Communications filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Attachment A)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 947 RESPONSE to re 942 Objection to Oracle's Deposition Designations by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 26, 2010 946 Declaration of Lucia Macdonald in Support of 945 Response to Defendants' Administrative Motion for an Order Regarding Counsels' Extrajudicial Communications by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 945 Response to 939 Defendants' Administrative Motion for an Order Regarding Counsels' Extrajudicial Communications filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/26/2010) Modified on 10/27/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2010 944 Featured Case ORDER AUTHORIZING EQUIPMENT TO BE BROUGHT INTO COURT FOR TRIAL by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 941 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2010)
October 25, 2010 943 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Deposition Designations by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 942 OBJECTIONS to Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Deposition Designations by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 25, 2010 941 Joint MOTION Request and [Proposed] Order Authorizing Equipment To Be Brought Into Court for Trial filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
October 22, 2010 940 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 939 MOTION Defendants' Administrative Motion For An Order Regarding Counsels' Extrajudicial Communications Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion For An Order Regarding Counsels' Extrajudicial Communications filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 939 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
October 22, 2010 939 Administrative Motion For An Order Regarding Counsels' Extrajudicial Communications filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/22/2010) Modified on 10/25/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 22, 2010 938 Minute Entry: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 10/21/10.(Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/22/2010)
October 21, 2010 937 Proposed Voir Dire by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Joint Revised Juror Questionnaire. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/21/2010)
October 18, 2010 936 Minute Entry: Telephonic Settlement Conference held on 10/18/2010 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 10/21/2010 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #Not recorded.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/18/2010)
October 18, 2010 935 Joint Letter Brief re Oracle's Objection to SAP Proposed Witnesses Carey, Kobliska, McCloskey, Shander, and Subramanian and SAP's Objection to Oracle Proposed Expert Witness Dr. Levy filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(House, Holly) (Filed on 10/18/2010) Modified on 10/19/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 15, 2010 Set/Reset Hearings: Telephonic Settlement Conference set for 10/18/2010 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2010)
October 6, 2010 934 NOTICE of Change In Counsel by Geoffrey M. Howard re Tanya Dumas (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 10/6/2010)
October 4, 2010 933 Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 851 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen K. Clarke [Filed Pursuant to D.I. 915 ] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 915 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 932 Memorandum in Opposition to 781 Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen K. Clarke [Filed Pursuant to D.I. 915 ] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 931 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 930 Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer [Filed Pursuant to D.I. 915 ] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) 915 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 930 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer [Filed Pursuant to D.I. 915] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/4/2010)
October 4, 2010 929 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 928 Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine [Filed Pursuant to D.I. 915 ] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32)(Related document(s) 915 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 928 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine [Filed Pursuant to D.I. 915 ] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 927 Declaration of Daniel S. Levy, Ph.D. in Support of 888 Plaintiffs' Reply in Support of Motion No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 926 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 887 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 925 Declaration of Nitin Jindal in Support of 846 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit E)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 924 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 840 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 923 Declaration of Chad Russell in Support of 790 Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motions in Limine, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D, # 2 Exhibit N, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R, # 6 Exhibit T)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 922 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 784 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions, Oppositions to Defendants' Motions in Limine and 17 U.S.C. 410(c) Motion, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 921 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 784 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Daubert Motions, Oppositions to Defendants' Motions in Limine and 17 U.S.C. 410(c) Motion, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 920 Declaration of Daniel S. Levy, Ph.D. in Support of 781 Motion No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 919 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 781 Motion No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 918 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 739 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs Motions in Limine, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 917 Declaration of Thomas S. Hixson in Support of 916 Plaintiffs Motions in Limine, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit X)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2010 916 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine, Filed Pursuant to Dkt. No. 915 filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/4/2010) Modified on 10/5/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2010 915 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 730 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 739 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 796 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 840 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying 887 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 914 Featured Case FINAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/30/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010)
September 30, 2010 913 Minute Entry: Pretrial Conference held before the Honorable Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/30/10 (Date Filed: 9/30/2010). (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2010)
September 29, 2010 912 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING DATA PRODUCED BY DEFENDANTS ON MARCH 15, 2010 re 908 Stipulation filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 911 Featured Case TRIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER NO. 3 REGARDING CERTAIN FACTS re 907 Stipulation filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 910 Featured Case TRIAL STIPULATION AND ORDER NO. 2 REGARDING CERTAIN FACTS re 906 Stipulation filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 29, 2010 909 TRIAL RULES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/29/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2010)
September 28, 2010 908 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Data Produced by Defendants on March 15, 2010 by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/28/2010) Modified on 9/29/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2010 907 Trial Stipulation and [Proposed] Order No. 3 Regarding Certain Facts by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/28/2010) Modified on 9/29/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2010 906 Trial Stipulation and [Proposed] Order No. 2 Regarding Certain Facts by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/28/2010) Modified on 9/29/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 28, 2010 905 Letter from both Parties re follow up to letter of September 22, 2010. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 27, 2010 904 Minute Entry: Settlement/Scheduling Conference held on 9/27/10 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further discussions re: stipulations held. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/27/2010) Modified on 9/28/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2010 903 Amended Proposed Joint Jury Instructions by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2010 902 Witness List by Oracle USA Inc., Oracle International Corporation, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 901 Proposed Form of Verdict by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/23/2010)
September 23, 2010 900 Defendants' Revised Special Verdict Form by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc . (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2010 899 Defendants' Revised Trial Witness List by Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, SAP AG . (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/23/2010) Modified on 9/24/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 22, 2010 898 Letter from both Parties re follow up to letter of September 14, 2010. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 Set/Reset Deadlines as to 774 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul C. Pinto, 798 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer, 764 MOTION No. 2: to exclude testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer, 776 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Professor Douglas G. Lichtman, 781 MOTION No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke, 769 MOTION No. 4: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Donald Reifer, 737 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine, 767 MOTION No. 3: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David Garmus, 728 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:30 AM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 22, 2010 897 CLERKS NOTICE ADVANCING TIME OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2010 09:30 AM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2010)
September 20, 2010 896 Featured Case ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO EXTEND THE TRIAL DATE by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton denying 893 Motion (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 895 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 9/20/2010)
September 20, 2010 894 Declaration of Steven C. Holtzman in Support of 893 Administrative Motion to Extend Trial Date filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 893 ) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 9/20/2010) Modified on 9/21/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 20, 2010 893 Administrative Motion to Extend Trial Date filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Stipulation to Permit Plaintiffs to File Administrative Motion to Extend Trial Date)(Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 9/20/2010) Modified on 9/21/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 892 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 882 Objections to Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Motion No.1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Clarke, 888 Reply , 891 Reply, 890 Objections to the Declaration of Brian Sommer In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Motion No. 2 to Exclude Testimony of Brian S. Sommer filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 882 , 888 , 891 , 890 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 891 Reply In Support re 764 MOTION No. 2: to exclude testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 890 Objections to 849 Declaration of Brian Sommer In Support of Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Motion No. 2 to Exclude Testimony of Brian S. Sommer filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 889 Declaration of Dr. Daniel Levy in Support of 888 Reply in Support of Oracle's Motion No. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen K. Clarke filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6)(Related document(s) 888 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 888 Reply In Support re 781 MOTION No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 887 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Information Supporting Reply in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Stipulation, # 3 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 886 Declaration in Support of 885 Reply re Motion No. 4 to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Donald Reifer filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F)(Related document(s) 885 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 885 Reply In Support re 769 MOTION No. 4: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Donald Reifer filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 884 Declaration in Support of 883 Reply re Motion No. 3 to Exclude Testimony of Defendant's Expert David Garmus filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 883 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 883 Reply in Support re 767 MOTION No. 3: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David Garmus filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 882 Objections to re 854 Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Oracle's Motion No.1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Clarke filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 881 Opposition to re 838 Objection TO DECLARATION OF DANIEL LEVY by Oracle International Corp., Oracle USA Inc., and Siebel Systems Inc. (Norton, William) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 9/17/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 880 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 879 Reply in Support of Defendants Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Related document(s) 879 ) (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 879 Reply in Support re 798 MOTION to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 878 Minute Entry: Telephonic Scheduling Conference conference held on 9/16/10 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Scheduling Conference set for 9/27/2010 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Recording #Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 877 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 876 Reply in Support filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) 876 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 876 Reply in Support of 774 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul C. Pinto filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 875 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 874 Reply to Opposition filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7)(Related document(s) 874 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 874 Reply in Support of 776 Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Professor Douglas G. Lichtman filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 16, 2010 873 Declaration of Michael Junge in Support of 872 Response in Support, Declaration of Michael Junge in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Defendants' Documents Under Seal filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 872 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/16/2010)
September 16, 2010 872 Defendants' Response to 840 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Defendants' Documents Under Seal filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/16/2010) Modified on 9/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 15, 2010 871 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 870 Response in Support, Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Opposition to Motion No. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen K. Clarke filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 870 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 15, 2010 870 RESPONSE in Support re 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimon y of Stephen Clarke filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/15/2010)
September 14, 2010 869 CLERKS NOTICE SETTLING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 9/16/2010 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 14, 2010 868 Letter from both Parties re September 13, 2010 Order (Dkt. 867). (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/14/2010)
September 13, 2010 867 Featured Case ORDER re Joint Letter. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 9/13/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010) Modified on 9/14/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 13, 2010 866 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER NO. 1 REGARDING LIABILITY, DISMISSAL OF CLAIMS, PRESERVATION OF DEFENSES, AND OBJECTIONS TO EVIDENCE AT TRIAL re 837 Stipulation, filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/13/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/13/2010)
September 10, 2010 865 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 851 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen K. Clarke [AMENDED] filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36)(Related document(s) 851 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 864 NOTICE of Appearance by William Fred Norton, Jr (Norton, William) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 863 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 10, 2010 862 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/10/2010)
September 9, 2010 860 Declaration of Chad Russell in Support of 859 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Partially Exclude Testimony of Kevin Mandia and Daniel Levy filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V)(Related document(s) 859 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 859 Memorandum in Opposition re 780 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Partially Exclude Testimony of Kevin Mandia and Daniel Levy filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 858 STIPULATION to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen Clarke by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 857 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen Clarke filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 856 Declaration of John Baugh in Support of 851 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of John Baugh In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Stephen K. Clarke filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 851 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 855 Declaration of William R. Thomas in Support of 851 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration Of William R. Thomas In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Stephen K. Clarke filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 851 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 854 Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 851 Memorandum in Opposition, To Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Stephen K. Clarke [REDACTED] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20)(Related document(s) 851 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 853 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 851 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Elaine Wallace In Support Of Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Stephen K. Clarke filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36)(Related document(s) 851 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 852 Proposed Order re 851 Memorandum in Opposition, [Proposed] Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Stephen K. Clarke by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 851 Memorandum in Opposition re 781 MOTION No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke Defendants' Opposition To Plaintiffs' Motion No. 1 To Exclude Expert Testimony Of Stephen K. Clarke [REDACTED] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 850 Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 848 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion No. 2 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brian S. Sommer filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14)(Related document(s) 848 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 849 Declaration of Brian S. Sommer in Support of 848 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Brian S. Sommer in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion No. 2 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Brian S. Sommer filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 848 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 848 Memorandum in Opposition re 764 MOTION No. 2: to exclude testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion No. 2 to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 847 Declaration of Nitin Jindal in Support of 846 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 846 ) (Pickett, Donn) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 846 Memorandum in Opposition re 798 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Pickett, Donn) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 845 Declaration of Paul Pinto in Support of 843 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Paul Pinto filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 843 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 844 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 843 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Testimony of Paul Pinto filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O)(Related document(s) 843 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 843 Memorandum in Opposition re 774 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul C. Pinto filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 842 Declaration of Lisa J. Chin in Support of 841 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Professor Douglas G. Lichtman filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 841 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 841 Memorandum in Opposition re 776 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Professor Douglas G. Lichtman filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 840 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Stipulation, # 3 Declaration)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 839 Declaration of Scott W. Cowan in Support of 838 Objection filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 838 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 838 Objections to 773 , 778 Declarations of Daniel Levy Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motions to Exclude by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 837 Trial Stipulation and [Proposed] Order No. 1 Regarding Liability, Dismissal of Claims, Preservation of Defenses, and Objections to Evidence at Trial by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 836 Declaration of Scott W. Cowan in Support of 835 Memorandum in Opposition, filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 835 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 835 Memorandum in Opposition to 773 Plaintiff's Motion No. 6 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Bruce Spencer filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 834 Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of 833 Memorandum in Opposition, filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T)(Related document(s) 833 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 833 Memorandum in Opposition to 771 Plaintiffs' Motion No. 5 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Stephen Gray filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 832 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 831 Memorandum in Opposition, filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13)(Related document(s) 831 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 831 Memorandum in Opposition to 769 Plaintiffs' Motion No. 4 to Exclude Expert Testimony of Donald Reifer filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 830 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 829 Memorandum in Opposition, filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 829 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 829 Memorandum in Opposition to 767 Plaintiffs' Motion No. 3 to Exclude Expert Testimony of David Garmus filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 828 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 827 Memorandum in Opposition, filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17)(Related document(s) 827 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 9, 2010 827 Memorandum in Opposition to 785 Plaintiffs' Motion Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply to Six Copyright Registrations filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 9, 2010 826 Further Joint Statement Regarding the Parties' Proposed Respective Sanctions Motions re 824 by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/9/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 861 AMENDED Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 9/7/10 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. Parties to email status report by close of business on Monday, 9/13/10. (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/7/2010) Modified on 9/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 7, 2010 825 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. Two trial stipulations and proposed orders agreed too. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/7/2010)
September 1, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated. 759 Scheduling Conference. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
September 1, 2010 824 Joint Statement re 807 Order Regarding The Timeliness Of The Parties' Respective Sanctions Motion by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 9/1/2010) Modified on 9/2/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 1, 2010 823 CLERKS NOTICE SETTLING TELEPHONIC SCHEDULING AND STATUS CONFERENCE. Scheduling Conference and Status Conference set for 9/2/2010 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2010)
August 27, 2010 822 Exhibit 3 [UNREDACTED] to 679 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 677 Memorandum in Opposition (filed pursuant to Order on Motion to Seal, Dkt. No. 810) filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 679 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 821 EXHIBITS re 657 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support Main Document is Exhibit 17 [UNREDACTED] to Declaration in Support of 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (filed pursuant to Order on Motion to Seal, Dkt. No. 810) filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 18 [UNREDACTED], # 2 Exhibit 115, # 3 Exhibit 116, # 4 Exhibit 117)(Related document(s) 657 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 820 Exhibit D to 655 Declaration of Thom O'Neill in Support of MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment (filed pursuant to Order on Motion to Seal, Dkt. No. 810) filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 655 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 819 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 818 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (FILED PURSUANT TO D.I. 810) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Related document(s) 810 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 818 Reply in Support of 640 Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (FILED PURSUANT TO D.I. 810) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 817 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 816 Defendants' Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (FILED PURSUANT TO D.I. 810) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53)(Related document(s) 810 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 816 Defendants' Notice of Cross Motion, Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment, and Opposition to 649 Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (FILED PURSUANT TO D.I. 810) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 815 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of Defendants' Fed. R. Evid. 1006 Summary of Evidence (FILED PURSUANT TO D.I. 810) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 810 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/27/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 814 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 813 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (FILED PURSUANT TO D.I. 810) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 810 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/27/2010) Modified on 8/27/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 27, 2010 813 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (FILED PURSUANT TO D.I. 810) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/27/2010)
August 26, 2010 812 Declaration of Michael Junge in Support of 811 Response in Support, filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 811 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 811 RESPONSE in Support re 784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Defendants' Documents Under Seal filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 810 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 643 Motion to Seal; granting in part and denying in part 658 Motion to Seal; denying 673 Motion to Seal; denying 680 Motion to Seal; denying 695 Motion to Seal; granting 699 Motion to Seal Document (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 809 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 808 Response in Support, Defendants' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 808 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 26, 2010 808 RESPONSE in Support re 796 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine< filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/26/2010)
August 24, 2010 807 Featured Case ORDER re 806 Letter filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 24, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/24/2010)
August 23, 2010 806 Letter from the Parties re Request for Hearing Date. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/23/2010)
August 20, 2010 *** Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM. re: 785 MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations, 767 MOTION No. 3: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David Garmus filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc., 773 MOTION No. 6: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Bruce Spencer filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc., 771 MOTION No. 5: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Gray filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc., 781 MOTION No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc., 764 MOTION No. 2: to exclude testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc., 769 MOTION No. 4: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Donald Reifer filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc., 784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 805 Exhibit List Defendants' Trial Exhibit List (Amended) by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 804 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 803 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER CHANGING TIME FOR HEARING re 763 Joint MOTION for Hearing of Oracle's Motion Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. Sec. 410(c)Joint MOTION for Hearing of Oracle's Motion Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. Sec. 410(c) filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/20/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 20, 2010 802 Re-Notice of Hearings to 2:30 p.m. on September 30, 2010 by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. re 785 MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations, 767 MOTION No. 3: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David Garmus, 773 MOTION No. 6: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Bruce Spencer, 771 MOTION No. 5: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Gray, 781 MOTION No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke, 764 MOTION No. 2: to exclude testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer, 769 MOTION No. 4: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Donald Reifer, 784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/20/2010) Modified on 8/23/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 20, 2010 801 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
August 19, 2010 800 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 798 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30)(Related document(s) 798 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 799 STIPULATION re 796 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine< Stipulation to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 798 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul K. Meyer filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 797 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 796 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine< Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier ISO Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 796 ) (Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 796 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents in Support of Defendants' Daubert Motions and Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Lee, Jacqueline) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 795 Appendix of Authorities Cited in re 791 Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26)(Related document(s) 791 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2010 794 Declaration of Scott W. Cowan in Support of 791 Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 791 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2010 793 Declaration of Chad Russell in Support of 790 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motions in Limine filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS, # 46 Exhibit TT)(Related document(s) 790 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 792 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 791 Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32)(Related document(s) 791 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2010 791 Defendants' Oppositions to Plaintiffs' Motions in Limine filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010) Modified on 8/20/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 19, 2010 790 Memorandum in Opposition re 728 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 789 Declaration of John A. Polito in Support of 785 MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S)(Related document(s) 785 ) (Polito, John) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 788 Declaration of Todd E. Adler in Support of 785 MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 785 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 787 Declaration of Daniel A. Vardell in Support of 785 MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 785 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 786 Declaration of Buffy B. Ransom in Support of 785 MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 785 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 785 MOTION Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. § 410(c) That Evidentiary Presumption Apply To Six Copyright Registrations filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/29/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 784 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation to Permit Filing Under Seal, # 2 Affidavit of Jennifer Gloss in Support, # 3 Affidavit of Zachary J. Alinder in Support, # 4 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 783 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 781 MOTION No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R)(Related document(s) 781 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 782 Declaration of Scott W. Cowan in Support of 780 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Partially Exclude Testimony of Kevin Mandia and Daniel Levy filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 780 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 781 MOTION No. 1: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Clarke filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 780 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Partially Exclude Testimony of Kevin Mandia and Daniel Levy filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 779 Declaration of Daniel S. Levy in Support of 773 MOTION No. 6: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Bruce Spencer filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 773 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 778 Declaration of Joy C. Sherrod in Support of 773 MOTION No. 6: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Bruce Spencer filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L)(Related document(s) 773 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 777 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 776 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Professor Douglas G. Lichtman filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18)(Related document(s) 776 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 776 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Professor Douglas G. Lichtman filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 775 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 774 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul C. Pinto filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25)(Related document(s) 774 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 774 MOTION Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion to Exclude Expert Testimony of Paul C. Pinto filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 773 MOTION No. 6: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Bruce Spencer filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 772 Declaration of John A. Polito in Support of 771 MOTION No. 5: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Gray filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H)(Related document(s) 771 ) (Polito, John) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 771 MOTION No. 5: To Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Stephen Gray filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 770 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 769 MOTION No. 4: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Donald Reifer filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 769 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 769 MOTION No. 4: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert Donald Reifer filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 768 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 767 MOTION No. 3: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David Garmus filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Related document(s) 767 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 767 MOTION No. 3: to Exclude Testimony of Defendants' Expert David Garmus filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 766 Proposed Order re 764 MOTION No. 2: to exclude testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 765 Declaration of Lucia MaDonald in Support of 764 MOTION No. 2: to exclude testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Ex. A, # 2 Exhibit Ex. B, # 3 Exhibit Ex. C, # 4 Exhibit Ex. D, # 5 Exhibit Ex. E)(Related document(s) 764 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 19, 2010 764 MOTION No. 2: to exclude testimony of Defendants' Expert Brian Sommer filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (House, Holly) (Filed on 8/19/2010)
August 18, 2010 763 Joint MOTION for Hearing of Oracle's Motion Pursuant to 17 U.S.C. Sec. 410(c); Proposed Order filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration of Geoffrey M. Howard)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/18/2010) Modified on 8/19/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 17, 2010 762 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting in part and denying in part 640 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; granting in part and denying in part 649 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 670 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2010)
August 16, 2010 761 Plaintiffs' Amended List of Trial Exhibits by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Amendment to 746 Exhibit List . (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/16/2010) Modified on 8/17/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 13, 2010 760 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Partial Withdrawal of Pending Motions to Seal Plaintiffs' Information by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 12, 2010 759 Minute Entry: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 8/12/2010 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/24/2010 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Court to initiate the phone contact.(Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/12/2010)
August 12, 2010 758 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 730 Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Document in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 730 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/12/2010) Modified on 8/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 12, 2010 757 RESPONSE in Support re 730 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Document in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/12/2010)
August 11, 2010 ***Deadlines terminated: 629 Transcript, 557 Transcript. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero for Settlement - trial management. (sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 756 CLERKS NOTICE. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2010 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Court to initiate the phone contact. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 11, 2010 755 Featured Case ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/11/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 10, 2010 754 Joint Statement Per August 6, 2010 Order by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc., Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Systems Corporationm, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle Corporation, Oracle USA Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/10/2010) Modified on 8/11/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 10, 2010 753 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLY WITH PORTIONS OF PRETRIAL ORDER REGARDING EXCHANGE OF EXHIBITS re 752 Stipulation filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/10/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010)
August 9, 2010 752 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Comply With Portions of Pre-Trial Order Regarding Exchange of Exhibits by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/9/2010) Modified on 8/10/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 6, 2010 751 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 750 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/6/2010)
August 6, 2010 749 Featured Case ORDER re Pretrial Submissions. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 8/6/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2010) Modified on 8/9/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 748 TRIAL BRIEF by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 747 Joint Proposed Jury Instructions by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America, Inc., Tomorrownow Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/5/2010) Modified on 8/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 746 Exhibit List Plaintiffs' List of Trial Exhibits by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc... (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 745 Joint Pretrial Conference Statement by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America, Inc., Tomorrownow Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2010) Modified on 8/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 744 Plaintiffs' List of Deposition Designations For Use at Trial by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc... (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/5/2010) Modified on 8/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 743 Proposed Findings of Fact by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc Defendants' Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 742 Witness List by Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 741 Witness List by Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc, SAP AG Defendants' Trial Witness List. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 740 Defendants' List of Deposition Designations For Use at Trial by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010) Modified on 8/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 739 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Plaintiffs Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs Motions in Limine filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation, # 2 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal, # 3 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 738 Declaration of Thomas S. Hixson in Support of 737 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit Exhibit KK)(Related document(s) 737 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 737 MOTION in Limine Plaintiffs' Motions In Limine [REDACTED VERSION] filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2010) Modified on 8/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 736 Defendants' List of Other Discovery Responses For Use at Trial by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010) Modified on 8/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 735 Proposed Form of Verdict by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 734 Proposed Findings of Fact by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 733 Exhibit List Defendants' Trial Exhibit List by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 732 Joint Proposed Supplemental Questions for Juror Questionnaire, Joint Proposed Voir Dire Questions, and Defendants' Separate Submission of Additional Voir Dire Questions by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc., Tommorrownow Inc. . (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/5/2010) Modified on 8/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
August 5, 2010 731 Proposed Form of Verdict by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc Defendants' Special Verdict Form. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 730 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Document in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration, # 2 Stipulation, # 3 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 729 Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 728 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of Defendants' Motions in Limine filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC)(Related document(s) 728 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 728 MOTION in Limine Defendants' Motions in Limine filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 9/30/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
August 5, 2010 727 TRIAL BRIEF Defendants' Trial Brief by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 8/5/2010)
July 21, 2010 726 Featured Case ORDER re potential trial exhibits. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/21/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/22/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2010 725 Featured Case FILED IN ERROR. SEE DOCUMENT 726 FOR CORRECT ATTACHMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/21/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010) Modified on 7/21/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
July 21, 2010 724 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME TO COMPLY WITH PORTIONS OF PRETRIAL ORDER REGARDING UNDER SEAL REQUESTS AND PRE-MARKED EXHIBITS re 723 Stipulation, filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/21/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2010)
July 19, 2010 723 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Extend Time to Comply With Portions of Pre-Trial Order Regarding Under Seal Requests and Pre-Marked Exhibits by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 7/19/2010) Modified on 7/20/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
June 25, 2010 722 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER Withdrawing Defendants' Objections to the Declaration of Brady Mickelsen re 721 Stipulation signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/25/2010.(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 24, 2010 721 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Withdrawing Defendants' Objections to the Declaration of Brady Mickelsen by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 6/24/2010)
June 17, 2010 720 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY re 717 Stipulation filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 6/17/10. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 17, 2010 719 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 716 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for David Boies. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 16, 2010 718 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle USA Inc. re 716 MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005297.) MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005297.) (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 16, 2010 717 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 6/16/2010)
June 15, 2010 716 MOTION of David Boies for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611005297.) filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
May 28, 2010 715 NOTICE of Appearance by Steven Christopher Holtzman and David Boies (Holtzman, Steven) (Filed on 5/28/2010)
May 19, 2010 714 CLERKS NOTICE RESCHEDULING FURTHER SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. The Further Settlement Conference set for 6/22/10 at 9:30 AM has been rescheduled for 9/7/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2010)
May 5, 2010 713 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 5/5/2010 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 5/5/2010) re 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., 670 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/5/2010)
April 29, 2010 712 Amended Responses to re 693 Defendants' Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 4/29/2010) Modified on 4/30/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 711 Filed in Error. Please see document 712 AMENDED DOCUMENT by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Amendment to 708 Response ( Non Motion ), Response ( Non Motion ) Amended Signature Page re Oracle's Responses to Defendants' Objections to Evidence. (House, Holly) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 710 OBJECTIONS to re 700 Reply to Opposition, 705 Reply to Opposition Evidence Filed in Support of Defendants' Reply to Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and to Defendants' Untimely Reply in Support of "Cross Motion" for Summary Judgment by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 28, 2010 709 Declaration of Joy C. Sherrod in Support of 708 Response to Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 708 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 4/28/2010) Modified on 4/29/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 708 RESPONSE to re 693 Objection, to Evidence Filed in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
April 21, 2010 707 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 706 Response in Support, Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Reply filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 706 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 21, 2010 706 RESPONSE in Support re 695 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/21/2010)
April 21, 2010 705 Reply in Support of re 670 Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/21/2010) Modified on 4/22/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 704 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle USA Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 703 Response to re 672 Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 702 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Filed in Support of Cross Motion and Opposition to MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 701 Declaration of Chad Russell in Support of 700 Reply filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27)(Related document(s) 700 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 700 Reply in Support of re 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to re 670 Defendants' Cross Motion filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 699 Administrative Motion to Seal Exhibit 12 to the Russell Declaration in Support of Oracle's Reply filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, # 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jennifer Gloss)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 698 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2010)
April 14, 2010 697 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 696 Stipulation, 695 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 696 , 695 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 696 STIPULATION re 695 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 695 Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 694 RESPONSE to re 682 Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 693 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 692 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 691 Reply in Support of Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34)(Related document(s) 691 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 14, 2010 691 Reply in Support of 640 Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/14/2010) Modified on 4/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2010 690 Proposed Order re 673 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Sum by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 7, 2010 689 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 688 Response to MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Sum filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 673 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/7/2010) Modified on 4/8/2010 (kc, COURT STAFF).
April 7, 2010 688 RESPONSE in Support re 673 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Sum filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/7/2010)
April 5, 2010 687 Amended Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 673 [CORRECTION TO DOCKET # 675] Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 675 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/5/2010) Modified on 4/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2010 686 STIPULATION re 674 Stipulation, [CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 674] Stipulation to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
April 5, 2010 685 Proposed Order re 673 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Sum [CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 673-1] by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 4/5/2010) Modified on 4/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
April 5, 2010 684 Featured Case ORDER re 669 Brief, filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc., 661 Brief, filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc., 667 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on April 2, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2010)
March 31, 2010 683 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle USA Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 682 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Filed In Support Of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 681 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 680 MOTION to Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 680 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 680 MOTION to Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 679 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 677 Memorandum in Opposition, filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54, # 55 Exhibit 55, # 56 Exhibit 56, # 57 Exhibit 57, # 58 Exhibit 58, # 59 Exhibit 59, # 60 Exhibit 60, # 61 Exhibit 61, # 62 Exhibit 62, # 63 Exhibit 63, # 64 Exhibit 64, # 65 Exhibit 65, # 66 Exhibit 66, # 67 Exhibit 67, # 68 Exhibit 68, # 69 Exhibit 69, # 70 Exhibit 70, # 71 Exhibit 71, # 72 Exhibit 72, # 73 Exhibit 73, # 74 Exhibit 74, # 75 Exhibit 75, # 76 Exhibit 76, # 77 Exhibit 77, # 78 Exhibit 78, # 79 Exhibit 79, # 80 Exhibit 80, # 81 Exhibit 81, # 82 Exhibit 82, # 83 Exhibit 83, # 84 Exhibit 84, # 85 Exhibit 85, # 86 Exhibit 86, # 87 Exhibit 87, # 88 Exhibit 88, # 89 Exhibit 89, # 90 Exhibit 90, # 91 Exhibit 91, # 92 Exhibit 92, # 93 Exhibit 93, # 94 Exhibit 94, # 95 Exhibit 95, # 96 Exhibit 96, # 97 Exhibit 97, # 98 Exhibit 98, # 99 Exhibit 99, # 100 Exhibit 100, # 101 Exhibit 101, # 102 Exhibit 102, # 103 Exhibit 103, # 104 Exhibit 104, # 105 Exhibit 105, # 106 Exhibit 106, # 107 Exhibit 107, # 108 Exhibit 108, # 109 Exhibit 109, # 110 Exhibit 110, # 111 Exhibit 111, # 112 Exhibit 147, # 113 Exhibit 159, # 114 Exhibit 208, # 115 Exhibit 210, # 116 Exhibit 212, # 117 Exhibit 219, # 118 Exhibit 225, # 119 Exhibit 390, # 120 Exhibit 392, # 121 Exhibit 395, # 122 Exhibit 414, # 123 Exhibit 436, # 124 Exhibit 455, # 125 Exhibit 473, # 126 Exhibit 513, # 127 Exhibit 594, # 128 Exhibit 596, # 129 Exhibit 608, # 130 Exhibit 707, # 131 Exhibit 738, # 132 Exhibit 748, # 133 Exhibit 934, # 134 Exhibit 1008, # 135 Exhibit 1634, # 136 Exhibit 1637, # 137 Exhibit 1684)(Related document(s) 677 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 678 Proposed Order re 677 Memorandum in Opposition, by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 677 Memorandum in Opposition re 640 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 676 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 31, 2010 675 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 687 . *** Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 673 Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 673 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/31/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/6/2010 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2010 674 *** FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 686 . *** STIPULATION re 673 Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/31/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/5/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2010 673 *** ATTACHED PROPOSED ORDER FILED IN ERROR. REFER TO DOCUMENT 685 . *** Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/31/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 4/5/2010 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2010 672 OBJECTIONS to Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/31/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2010 671 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 670 Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment and Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53)(Related document(s) 670 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/31/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 31, 2010 670 Notice of Cross Motion, Cross Motion For Partial Summary Judgment, and Opposition to re 649 Plaintiffs' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/31/2010) Modified on 4/1/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 17, 2010 669 Reply in Support of 661 Oracle's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admissions filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 661 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/17/2010) Modified on 3/18/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2010 668 Declaration of Scott W. Cowan in Support of 667 Memorandum in Opposition to Oracle's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F)(Related document(s) 667 ) (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 3/12/2010) Modified on 3/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 12, 2010 667 Memorandum in Opposition to re 661 Oracle's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 3/12/2010) Modified on 3/15/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 10, 2010 666 Proposed Order re 664 Response in Support, Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal by Oracle USA Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 665 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 664 Response in Support, Defendants' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 664 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 10, 2010 664 RESPONSE in Support re 643 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 3/10/2010)
March 8, 2010 663 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle USA Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2010)
March 5, 2010 662 Declaration of Thomas S. Hixson in Support of 661 Oracle's Supplemental Brief in Support of Its Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 661 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/5/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 5, 2010 661 Supplemental Brief in Support of Its re 570 Motion to Compel Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 638 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/5/2010) Modified on 3/8/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 4, 2010 660 Letter Brief re 648 Letter Brief, WITHDRAWAL of Defendants Objections Under the Stipulated Protected Order to Plaintiffs Disclosure of Highly Confidential and Confidential Information to Plaintiffs Proposed Experts Christian Hicks and Elysium Digital, LLC filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 648 ) (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 3/4/2010)
March 3, 2010 659 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 658 MOTION to Seal Admin Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 658 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 658 Administrative Motion to Permit to File Under Seal Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2010 657 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5, # 6 Exhibit 6, # 7 Exhibit 7, # 8 Exhibit 8, # 9 Exhibit 9, # 10 Exhibit 10, # 11 Exhibit 11, # 12 Exhibit 12, # 13 Exhibit 13, # 14 Exhibit 14, # 15 Exhibit 15, # 16 Exhibit 16, # 17 Exhibit 17, # 18 Exhibit 18, # 19 Exhibit 19, # 20 Exhibit 20, # 21 Exhibit 21, # 22 Exhibit 22, # 23 Exhibit 23, # 24 Exhibit 24, # 25 Exhibit 25, # 26 Exhibit 26, # 27 Exhibit 27, # 28 Exhibit 28, # 29 Exhibit 29, # 30 Exhibit 30, # 31 Exhibit 31, # 32 Exhibit 32, # 33 Exhibit 33, # 34 Exhibit 34, # 35 Exhibit 35, # 36 Exhibit 36, # 37 Exhibit 37, # 38 Exhibit 38, # 39 Exhibit 39, # 40 Exhibit 40, # 41 Exhibit 41, # 42 Exhibit 42, # 43 Exhibit 43, # 44 Exhibit 44, # 45 Exhibit 45, # 46 Exhibit 46, # 47 Exhibit 47, # 48 Exhibit 48, # 49 Exhibit 49, # 50 Exhibit 50, # 51 Exhibit 51, # 52 Exhibit 52, # 53 Exhibit 53, # 54 Exhibit 54 - 1, # 55 Exhibit 54 - 2, # 56 Exhibit 55, # 57 Exhibit 56, # 58 Exhibit 57, # 59 Exhibit 58, # 60 Exhibit 59, # 61 Exhibit 60, # 62 Exhibit 61, # 63 Exhibit 62, # 64 Exhibit 63, # 65 Exhibit 64, # 66 Exhibit 65, # 67 Exhibit 66, # 68 Exhibit 67, # 69 Exhibit 68, # 70 Exhibit 69, # 71 Exhibit 70, # 72 Exhibit 71, # 73 Exhibit 72, # 74 Exhibit 73, # 75 Exhibit 74, # 76 Exhibit 75, # 77 Exhibit 76, # 78 Exhibit 77, # 79 Exhibit 78, # 80 Exhibit 79, # 81 Exhibit 80, # 82 Exhibit 81, # 83 Exhibit 82, # 84 Exhibit 83, # 85 Exhibit 84, # 86 Exhibit 85, # 87 Exhibit 86, # 88 Exhibit 87, # 89 Exhibit 88, # 90 Exhibit 89, # 91 Exhibit 90, # 92 Exhibit 91, # 93 Exhibit 92, # 94 Exhibit 93, # 95 Exhibit 94, # 96 Exhibit 95, # 97 Exhibit 96, # 98 Exhibit 97, # 99 Exhibit 98, # 100 Exhibit 99, # 101 Exhibit 100, # 102 Exhibit 101, # 103 Exhibit 102, # 104 Exhibit 103, # 105 Exhibit 104, # 106 Exhibit 105, # 107 Exhibit 106, # 108 Exhibit 107, # 109 Exhibit 108, # 110 Exhibit 109, # 111 Exhibit 110, # 112 Exhibit 111, # 113 Exhibit 112, # 114 Exhibit 113, # 115 Exhibit 114, # 116 Exhibit 115, # 117 Exhibit 116, # 118 Exhibit 117)(Related document(s) 649 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 656 Declaration of John Polito in Support of 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 649 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 655 Declaration of Thom O'Neill in Support of 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(Related document(s) 649 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 654 EXHIBIT A re 653 Declaration of Brady Micklesen filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 653 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2010 653 Declaration of Brady Mickelsen in Support of 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 649 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 652 Declaration of Uwe Koehler in Support of 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 649 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 651 Declaration of Mark Fallon in Support of 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 649 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 650 Declaration of Norm Ackermann in Support of 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 649 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 649 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 648 Letter Brief Defendants Objections Under the Stipulated Protected Order to Plaintiffs Disclosure of Highly Confidential and Confidential Information to Plaintiffs Proposed Experts Christian Hicks and Elysium Digital, LLC filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 647 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 646 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 635 Motion for Pro Hac Vice for Jeffrey M. Butler. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 645 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 643 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 643 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 644 STIPULATION re 643 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 643 Administrative MOTION to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/3/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2010 642 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 640 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Related document(s) 640 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 641 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 640 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit B, # 4 Exhibit C, # 5 Exhibit D, # 6 Exhibit E, # 7 Exhibit F, # 8 Exhibit G, # 9 Exhibit H, # 10 Exhibit I, # 11 Exhibit J, # 12 Exhibit K, # 13 Exhibit L, # 14 Exhibit M, # 15 Exhibit N, # 16 Exhibit O, # 17 Exhibit P, # 18 Exhibit Q, # 19 Exhibit R, # 20 Exhibit S, # 21 Exhibit T, # 22 Exhibit U, # 23 Exhibit V, # 24 Exhibit W, # 25 Exhibit X)(Related document(s) 640 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 640 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment [REDACTED] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 3rd Floor, Oakland. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 3/3/2010) Modified on 3/4/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
March 3, 2010 639 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (kc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 3, 2010 638 Featured Case ORDER re 637 Letter filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc.. Signed by Judge Laporte on 3/3/10. (edllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2010)
March 2, 2010 637 Letter from Plaintiffs and Defendants re Joint Request for Leave to Submit Expedited Briefing re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 3/2/2010)
February 23, 2010 636 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART ORACLE'S MOTION TO MODIFY THE PROTECTIVE ORDER re 570 MOTION to Compel Modification to Protective Order, Testimony, Documents, and Discovery Responses filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on February 23, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 23, 2010 635 MOTION of Jeffrey M. Butler for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 210, receipt number 44611004839.) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/23/2010)
February 19, 2010 634 Letter Brief re 633 Order on Motion to Compel, Joint Letter Brief re Court's Order on Plaintiffs' Motion to Modify the Protective Order filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Plaintiffs' Proposed Order, # 2 Proposed Order Defendants' Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 633 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
February 12, 2010 633 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 566 Motion to Compel; granting in part and denying in part 570 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2010)
February 8, 2010 632 Featured Case ORDER TO SUBMIT SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE STATEMENTS IN.PDF FORMAT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 2/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 5, 2010 631 Joint STATUS REPORT re January 26, 2010 Hearing re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel and to Modify Protective Order by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., SAP AG, SAP America, Inc., Tomorrownow Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 2/5/2010) Modified on 2/8/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 2/8/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
February 2, 2010 630 Joint STATUS REPORT required by January 4, 2010 Order by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc., Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 2/2/2010) Modified on 2/2/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 28, 2010 629 Transcript of Proceedings held on 1/26/10, before Judge Elizabeth D. LaPorte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Kelly Bryce, E-mail courtreporter232@aol.com Telephone number (510)828-9404. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/28/2010. (Bryce, Kelly) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 28, 2010 628 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton denying 447 543 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment ; finding as moot 444 451 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 27, 2010 622 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 595 Motion to Seal (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 621 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 563 Motion to Seal Document (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 27, 2010 620 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 575 Motion to Seal Document (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2010)
January 26, 2010 619 Featured Case ORDER re 617 Request filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 26, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2010) Modified on 1/27/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 25, 2010 618 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Defendants' Motion to Compel and Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Further Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to 01:00 PM on 1/26/2010 in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/25/2010)
January 25, 2010 617 Request and [Proposed] Order Authorizing Projector to be Brought Into Court for use at Hearing by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 1/25/2010) Modified on 1/26/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 20, 2010 616 NOTICE AND Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 6/22/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/20/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
January 15, 2010 615 Minute Entry: TelephonicStatus Conference held on 1/15/10 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Settlement Conference date of 3/18/10 at 9:30 AM is vacated and re-set for 6/22/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 1/15/2010) Modified on 1/20/2010 (cp, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 614 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Howard in Support of 613 Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests for Admissions filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 613 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 1/12/2010) Modified on 1/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 613 Reply Memorandum in Support re 570 MOTION to Compel Modification to Protective Order, Testimony, Documents, and Discovery Responses filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 1/12/2010) Modified on 1/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 612 Reply Declaration of Scott W. Cowan in Support of 566 Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A and B)(Related document(s) 609 ) (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 1/12/2010) Modified on 1/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 611 Declaration of Mark Kreutz in Support of 609 Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 609 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/12/2010) Modified on 1/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 610 Declaration of Keith Shankle in Support of 609 Reply to Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 609 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/12/2010) Modified on 1/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 12, 2010 609 Reply in Support of 566 Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/12/2010) Modified on 1/13/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2010 608 Declaration of Mark White in Support of 607 Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs' to File Under Seal Information Supporting Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 607 ) (Delahunty, Patrick) (Filed on 1/11/2010) Modified on 1/12/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 11, 2010 607 RESPONSE in Support of 595 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs' to File Under Seal Information Supporting Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Delahunty, Patrick) (Filed on 1/11/2010) Modified on 1/12/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 7, 2010 606 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER re 605 Stipulation filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on January 7, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2010)
January 6, 2010 605 STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order to Amend the Stipulated Protective Order by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit D-E)(Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 1/6/2010)
January 5, 2010 627 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 589 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 589 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 626 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Jason Rice in Support of 589 Memorandum in Opposition, filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 589 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 625 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Buffy Ransom in Support of 589 Memorandum in Opposition filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 589 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 604 Declaration of Joshua Fuchs in Support of 599 Memorandum in Opposition, to Oracle's Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) 599 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 603 Declaration of Mia Lee in Support of 599 Memorandum in Opposition, to Oracle's Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 599 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 602 Declaration of Catherine Hyde in Support of 599 Memorandum in Opposition, to Oracle's Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 599 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 601 Declaration of Scott Trainor in Support of 599 Memorandum in Opposition, to Oracle's Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 599 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 600 Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 599 Memorandum in Opposition, to Oracle's Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 599 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 599 Memorandum in Opposition to 570 Oracle's Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests for Admission filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 598 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. re 595 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs To File Under Seal Information Supporting Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 597 Declaration in Support of 595 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs To File Under Seal Information Supporting Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Declaration of Bree Hann in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Seal filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 595 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 596 STIPULATION re 595 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs To File Under Seal Information Supporting Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 595 Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs To File Under Seal Information Supporting Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 594 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 589 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Compel [Redacted Version] filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y, # 26 Exhibit Z, # 27 Exhibit AA, # 28 Exhibit BB, # 29 Exhibit CC, # 30 Exhibit DD, # 31 Exhibit EE, # 32 Exhibit FF, # 33 Exhibit GG, # 34 Exhibit HH, # 35 Exhibit II, # 36 Exhibit JJ, # 37 Exhibit KK, # 38 Exhibit LL, # 39 Exhibit MM, # 40 Exhibit NN, # 41 Exhibit OO, # 42 Exhibit PP, # 43 Exhibit QQ, # 44 Exhibit RR, # 45 Exhibit SS)(Related document(s) 589 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 593 Declaration of Lucia MacDonald in Support of 589 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 589 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 592 Declaration of Martha Jeong in Support of 589 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 589 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 591 Declaration of Buffy Ransom in Support of 589 Memorandum in Opposition, to Defendants' Motion to Compel [Redacted Version] filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 589 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 5, 2010 590 Declaration of Jason Rice in Support of 589 Memorandum in Opposition, [Redacted Version] filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 589 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
January 5, 2010 589 Memorandum in Opposition to 566 Defendants' Motion to Compel filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 1/5/2010) Modified on 1/6/2010 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2010 588 Featured Case ORDER re 587 Received Document. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 1/4/2010. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/5/2010: # 1 Certificate of Service) (nah, COURT STAFF).
January 4, 2010 587 Received Letter from Michael Pulk dated 12/29/2009 re: emergency server maintenance at the Tomorrow Now servers facility (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
December 22, 2009 586 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXPERT DISCOVERY re 584 Stipulation filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/22/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2009)
December 21, 2009 585 Declaration of Scott W. Cowan In Support Of 584 Stipulation And [Proposed] Order To Extend Time For Expert Discovery filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 12/21/2009) Modified on 12/22/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 21, 2009 584 STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order To Extend Time For Expert Discovery by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 12/21/2009) Modified on 12/22/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 18, 2009 583 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 582 Response in Support, Plaintiffs' Response in Support of Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 582 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 18, 2009 582 RESPONSE in Support re 563 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 12/18/2009)
December 16, 2009 581 Declaration of John Youri in Support of 580 Response to Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Permit Plaintiffs To File Under Seal Defendants Information Supporting Plaintiffs Motion To Modify The Protective Order And To Compel Deposition Testimony And Further Responses To Requests For Admissions filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Signature Page (Declarations/Stipulations))(Related document(s) 580 ) (Delahunty, Patrick) (Filed on 12/16/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 16, 2009 580 Response To 575 Plaintiffs Administrative Motion To Permit Plaintiffs To File Under Seal Defendants Information Supporting Plaintiffs Motion To Modify The Protective Order And To Compel Deposition Testimony And Further Responses To Requests For Admissions filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Delahunty, Patrick) (Filed on 12/16/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 12/16/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 14, 2009 579 NOTICE AND Order Setting Further Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Further Settlement Conference set for 3/18/2009 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/11/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/14/2009)
December 11, 2009 624 FILED UNDER SEALEXHIBITS A, C, F, G, H, K and Appendix 5 to re 564 Declaration of Scott W. Cowan in Support of Motion to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 564 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 623 FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 578 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. re 575 MOTION to Seal Document 573 Exhibits, (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2009 577 STIPULATION re 575 MOTION to Seal Document 573 Exhibits, Administrative Motion to Seal MOTION to Seal Document 573 Exhibits, by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2009 576 Declaration of Bree Hann in Support of 575 Administrative Motion to Seal filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/14/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2009 575 MOTION to Permit to File Under Seal 573 Exhibits, Information Supporting Plaintiff's Motion to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2009 574 EXHIBITS re 571 Declaration in Support, of Chad Russell filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit V, # 2 Exhibit W, # 3 Exhibit X, # 4 Exhibit Y, # 5 Exhibit Z, # 6 Exhibit AA)(Related document(s) 571 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 573 EXHIBITS re 571 Declaration in Support, of Chad Russell filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit N, # 2 Exhibit O, # 3 Exhibit P, # 4 Exhibit Q, # 5 Exhibit R, # 6 Exhibit S, # 7 Exhibit T, # 8 Exhibit U)(Related document(s) 571 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 572 EXHIBITS re 571 Declaration in Support, of Chad Russell filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit F, # 2 Exhibit G, # 3 Exhibit H, # 4 Exhibit I, # 5 Exhibit J, # 6 Exhibit K, # 7 Exhibit L, # 8 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 571 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 571 Declaration of Chad Russell in Support of 570 MOTION to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests For Admissions filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 570 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2009 570 MOTION to Modify the Protective Order and to Compel Deposition Testimony and Further Responses to Requests For Admissions filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2010 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Russell, Chad) (Filed on 12/11/2009) Modified on 12/16/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
December 11, 2009 569 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 568 Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 566 MOTION to Compel Redacted Defendants' Motion to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-F, # 3 Exhibit G, # 4 Exhibit H-M)(Related document(s) 566 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 567 Declaration of Scott Cowan in Support of 566 MOTION to Compel Redacted Defendants' Motion to Compel Redacted Declaration of Scott Cowan in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel (with Appendices) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-I, # 2 Exhibit J-O, # 3 Exhibit P-R)(Related document(s) 566 ) (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 566 MOTION to Compel Redacted Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 1/26/2010 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 565 STIPULATION re 563 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 564 Declaration of Scott Cowan in Support of 563 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 563 ) (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 11, 2009 563 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
December 2, 2009 560 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting in part and denying in part 512 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 30, 2009 559 Minute Entry: Further Settlement Conference held on 11/30/2009 before Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Case did not settle. (Court Reporter Not reported.) (klh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/30/2009)
November 25, 2009 557 Transcript of Proceedings held on November 24, 2009, before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. Court Reporter/Transcriber Joan Marie Columbini, Telephone number 415-255-6842. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/22/2010. (Columbini, Joan) (Filed on 11/25/2009)
November 24, 2009 558 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 11/24/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Production of Damages-Related Documents and Information 512 . (Court Reporter Joan Columbini) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/24/2009)
November 20, 2009 556 Featured Case PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 19, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 18, 2009 554 Response to 549 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Portions of the Joint Discovery Conference Statement Under Seal bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 11/18/2009) Modified on 11/19/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 18, 2009 553 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on November 18, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 18, 2009 552 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO AMEND THE STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Addendum)(Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 11/18/2009)
November 17, 2009 555 Minute Entry: Further Discovery Hearing held on 11/17/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. (FTR 2:09pm - 3:52pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 11/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 551 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 550 STIPULATION re 549 MOTION to Seal Document 547 Status Report by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 549 MOTION to Seal Document 547 Status Report filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 12, 2009 548 AMENDED re 547 Joint Discovery Conference Statement [Revised Exh. H & Exh. N] by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Joint Discovery Conference Statement)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 11/12/2009) Modified on 11/13/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF). Modified on 11/13/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2009 547 Joint Discovery Conference Statement by Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits to Joint Discovery Conference Statement)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 11/10/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 10, 2009 546 Reply to re 542 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Damages Related Documents and Information filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 11/10/2009) Modified on 11/12/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2009 545 Reply to re 483 Opposition TO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' HYPOTHETICAL LICENSE DAMAGES CLAIM [UNREDACTED VERSION OF D.I. 504] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/5/2009) Modified on 11/6/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
November 5, 2009 544 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 543 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim [UNREDACTED VERSION OF D.I. 431] MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim [UNREDACTED VERSION OF D.I. 431] DECLARATION OF THARAN GREGORY LANIER ISO DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PLAINTIFFS' HYPOTHETICAL LICENSE DAMAGES CLAIM [UNREDACTED VERSION OF D.I. 433] filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 543 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 5, 2009 543 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim [UNREDACTED VERSION OF D.I. 431] filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 11/5/2009)
November 3, 2009 542 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re 512 MOTION to Compel Production of Damages-Related Documents and Information Opposition to Oracle's Motion to Compel Production of Damages-Related Documents and Information filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 512 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
November 2, 2009 533 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/2/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 532 Featured Case ORDER re 499 Objections filed by plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 11/2/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 531 Featured Case STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING WITHDRAWAL OF DEFENDANTS' ADMINISTRATIVE MOTIONS TO SEAL re 522 Stipulation, filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems, Inc. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/2/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 530 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 489 Motion to Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 529 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 438 Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
November 2, 2009 528 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 386 Motion to Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2009)
October 29, 2009 527 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 526 Response Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Order for Sanctions filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Related document(s) 526 ) (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 29, 2009 526 Response Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Objections to Order for Sanctions bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 10/29/2009)
October 28, 2009 525 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 515 Motion to Seal (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 28, 2009 524 Minute Entry: Motion Hearing held on 10/28/2009 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 10/28/2009) re 447 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim - Correction of Docket # 431 filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. (Court Reporter Raynee Mercado.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 10/28/2009)
October 26, 2009 523 Declaration of Bernd Mott in Support of 521 Response in Support, of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Defendants' Documents Under Seal filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 521 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 26, 2009 522 Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Regarding Withdrawal of Defendants' Administrative Motions to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment and Reply by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/26/2009) Modified on 10/27/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 26, 2009 521 RESPONSE in Support re 515 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Defendants' Documents Under Seal filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
October 21, 2009 520 RESPONSE to re 509 Defendants' Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Hypothetical License Damages Claim filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 10/21/2009) Modified on 10/22/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2009 562 FILED UNDER SEALDeclaration of Amy Donnelly in Support of 561 Motion to Compel filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 561 FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION to Compel Production of Damages-Related Documents and Information filed by Oracle USA, Inc., Oracle International Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Siebel Systems. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009) Modified on 12/2/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 20, 2009 519 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle USA Inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 518 Proposed Order re 515 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Oracle USA Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 517 Declaration of Zachary Alinder in Support of 515 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 515 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 516 STIPULATION re 515 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by Oracle USA Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 515 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel filed by Oracle USA Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 514 Proposed Order re 512 MOTION to Compel Production of Damages-Related Documents and Information by Oracle USA Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 513 Declaration of Amy Donnelly in Support of 512 MOTION to Compel Production of Damages-Related Documents and Information filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 512 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 512 MOTION to Compel Production of Damages-Related Documents and Information filed by Oracle USA Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 11/24/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (House, Holly) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 20, 2009 511 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 501 Motion (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2009)
October 7, 2009 510 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 509 OBJECTIONS to re 488 Defendants' Objections to Plaintiffs' Evidence Filed in Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical [Fair Market Value] License Damages Claim by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/7/2009) Modified on 10/8/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2009 508 Proposed Order re 505 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Supporting Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judg [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Supporting Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 507 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 505 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Supporting Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judg Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier ISO Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Supporting Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 505 ) (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 506 STIPULATION re 505 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Supporting Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judg Stipulation to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Supporting Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 505 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Supporting Defendants' Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
October 7, 2009 504 Reply to re 483 Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Froyd, Jane) (Filed on 10/7/2009) Modified on 10/8/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
October 6, 2009 503 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on October 5, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
October 1, 2009 502 Declaration of Bree Hann in Support of 501 MOTION Administrative Motion to Extend Period for Review of Oracle's Objections to Order of Discovery Magistrate Pursuant to Local Rule 72-2 filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 501 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
October 1, 2009 501 MOTION Administrative Motion to Extend Period for Review of Oracle's Objections to Order of Discovery Magistrate Pursuant to Local Rule 72-2 filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
October 1, 2009 500 Declaration of Holly House in Support of 499 Objection, Oracle's Objections to Order of Discovery Magistrate Granting Defendants' Motion for Preclusion of Certain Damages Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 37(c) and 16(f) filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q)(Related document(s) 499 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 10/1/2009)
October 1, 2009 499 OBJECTIONS to re 482 Order of Discovery Magistrate Granting Defendants' Motion for Preclusion of Certain Damages Evidence Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 37(c) and 16(f) by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 10/1/2009) Modified on 10/2/2009 (vlk, COURT STAFF).
September 30, 2009 498 Minute Entry: Further Discovery Conference held on 9/30/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. (FTR 2:08pm-3:11pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 497 Proposed Order re 495 Response in Support, [Proposed] Order Granting Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 496 Declaration of Werner Brandt in Support of 495 Response in Support, Declaration of Werner Brandt in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 495 ) (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 30, 2009 495 RESPONSE in Support re 489 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 24, 2009 494 STIPULATION - Stipulated Request and [Proposed] Order Enlarging Time for Oracle to Object to Discovery Order [Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 6(b), Civil L.R. 6-1, 6-2, 7-1, 7-12] by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Declaration)(House, Holly) (Filed on 9/24/2009)
September 23, 2009 541 FILED UNDER SEAL Memorandum in Opposition re 447 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle Systems Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 540 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Paul K. Meyer in Support of 483 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 483 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 539 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Larry Ellison in Support of 483 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 483 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 493 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Conference Statement by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 492 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 491 Declaration of Zachary Alinder in Support of 489 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 489 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 490 STIPULATION re 489 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 489 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to Permit Plaintiffs to File Under Seal Defendants' Information Supporting Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 488 OBJECTIONS to re 447 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim - Correction of Docket # 431 Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence Filed in Support of Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License [Fair Market Value] Damages Claim by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 487 Declaration of Paul Meyer in Support of 483 Memorandum in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical [Fair Market Value] License Damages Claim filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment A, # 2 Attachment B, # 3 Exhibit 1, # 4 Exhibit 2, # 5 Exhibit 3, # 6 Exhibit 4, # 7 Exhibit 5, # 8 Exhibit 6, # 9 Exhibit 7, # 10 Exhibit 8, # 11 Exhibit 9, # 12 Exhibit 10, # 13 Exhibit 11, # 14 Exhibit 12, # 15 Exhibit 13, # 16 Exhibit 14, # 17 Exhibit 15, # 18 Exhibit 16, # 19 Exhibit 17, # 20 Exhibit 18, # 21 Exhibit 19, # 22 Exhibit 20, # 23 Exhibit 21, # 24 Exhibit 22, # 25 Exhibit 23, # 26 Exhibit 24, # 27 Exhibit 25, # 28 Exhibit 26, # 29 Exhibit 27, # 30 Exhibit 28, # 31 Exhibit 29, # 32 Exhibit 30, # 33 Exhibit 31, # 34 Exhibit 32, # 35 Exhibit 33, # 36 Exhibit 34, # 37 Exhibit 35, # 38 Exhibit 36, # 39 Exhibit 37, # 40 Exhibit 38, # 41 Exhibit 39, # 42 Exhibit 40, # 43 Exhibit 41, # 44 Exhibit 42, # 45 Exhibit 43, # 46 Exhibit 44, # 47 Exhibit 45, # 48 Exhibit 46, # 49 Exhibit 47, # 50 Exhibit 48, # 51 Exhibit 49, # 52 Exhibit 50, # 53 Exhibit 51, # 54 Exhibit 52, # 55 Exhibit 53, # 56 Exhibit 54, # 57 Exhibit 55, # 58 Exhibit 56, # 59 Exhibit 57, # 60 Exhibit 58, # 61 Exhibit 59, # 62 Exhibit 60, # 63 Exhibit 61, # 64 Exhibit 62, # 65 Exhibit 63, # 66 Exhibit 64, # 67 Exhibit 65, # 68 Exhibit 66, # 69 Exhibit 67, # 70 Exhibit 68, # 71 Exhibit 69, # 72 Exhibit 70, # 73 Exhibit 71, # 74 Exhibit 72, # 75 Exhibit 73)(Related document(s) 483 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 486 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 483 Memorandum in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical [Fair Market Value] License Damages Claim filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Related document(s) 483 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 485 Declaration of Safra Catz in Support of 483 Memorandum in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical [Fair Market Value] License Damages Claim filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 483 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 484 Declaration of Lawrence J. Ellison in Support of 483 Memorandum in Opposition, Plaintiffs' Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical [Fair Market Value] License Damages Claim filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 483 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 23, 2009 483 Memorandum in Opposition re 447 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim - Correction of Docket # 431 filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(House, Holly) (Filed on 9/23/2009)
September 17, 2009 482 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PRECLUSION OF CERTAIN DAMAGES EVIDENCE PURSUANT TO FEDERAL RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 37(C)(1) AND 16(F) by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 365 Motion for Sanctions (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2009)
September 8, 2009 463 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information from Plaintiffs 346 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
September 4, 2009 462 CLERKS NOTICE Effective September 14, 2009, Judge Phyllis Hamilton's courtroom and chambers will be located in the Oakland Courthouse, Courtroom #3, 3rd floor, 1301 Clay Street, Oakland, California 94612.On or after September 14, 2009, all filings for matters pending on Judge Hamiltons docket, all court appearances, and all deliveries of chambers' copies of documents must be made at the Oakland Courthouse.The days and times for law and motion calendars and all currently scheduled proceedings remain unchanged.Please note that all of Judge Hamilton's case files will be moved to the Oakland Courthouse, therefore all cases numbers assigned to her will be changed slightly to reflect the correct venue. Previously, all case numbers started with "3:" to indicate the San Francisco office (Example: 3:09-cv-12345-PJH). As of September 14th, 2009, all of Judge Hamilton's case files will begin with "4:" to indicate the Oakland office, but everything else will stay the same (Example: 4:09-cv-12345-PJH). When e-filing, using the short case number format will always avoid problems when searching for the correct case: 09-12345 (YY-NNNNN).For information on the Oakland Courthouse's accessibility, parking, driving directions, public transit, hotels and other helpful links, please visit our website: http://www.cand.uscourts.gov, click on "Court Information" on the right hand side of our main page, then select the Oakland link under "Address and Jurisdiction". The main telephone number for the Oakland Division is 510 637-3530. (ys, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
September 4, 2009 461 Proposed Order re 346 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Information From Plaintiffs JOINTLY FILED PROPOSED ORDER WITH PERMISSION OF ALL PARTIES by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 9/4/2009)
August 31, 2009 460 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property 329 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 459 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 434 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damage filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 434 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 458 RESPONSE in Support re 434 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damage filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 457 Declaration of Dorian Daley in Support of 438 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Related document(s) 438 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 456 RESPONSE in Support re 438 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 455 DECLARATION of Joshua L. Fuchs Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint - Correction of Docket # 382 filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit B-4, # 6 Exhibit B-5, # 7 Exhibit B-6, # 8 Exhibit B-7, # 9 Exhibit C-1, # 10 Exhibit C-2, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Exhibit K-1, # 19 Exhibit K-2, # 20 Exhibit L-1, # 21 Exhibit L-2, # 22 Exhibit L-3, # 23 Exhibit L-4, # 24 Exhibit L-5, # 25 Exhibit L-6, # 26 Exhibit L-7, # 27 Exhibit M, # 28 Exhibit N)(Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 454 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend - Correction of Docket # 380 filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 453 Proposed Order re 451 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 452 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 451 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier ISO Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 451 ) (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 31, 2009 451 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
August 28, 2009 450 Featured Case ORDER Granting 446 Proposed Order, filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Hon. Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 8/28/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2009)
August 27, 2009 449 Proposed Order re 329 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property JOINTLY FILED PROPOSED ORDER WITH PERMISSION OF ALL PARTIES by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 448 ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint - Correction of Docket # 437 bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 447 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim - Correction of Docket # 431 filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 10/28/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 3, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 446 Proposed Order re 444 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents [Proposed] Order Granting Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 445 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 444 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier ISO Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 444 ) (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 27, 2009 444 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document Stipulated Administrative Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Documents filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/27/2009)
August 26, 2009 538 FILED UNDER SEAL Answer to 418 Fourth Amended Complaint bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 443 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 442 Proposed Order re 436 Stipulation,, 435 Declaration in Support, 434 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damage [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 441 Proposed Order re 440 Declaration in Support,, 439 Stipulation,, 438 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 440 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 439 Stipulation,, 438 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier ISO Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 439 , 438 ) (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 439 STIPULATION re 438 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint Stipulation to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 438 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Information Disclosed in Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 437 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE REFER TO DOCUMENT 448 . *** Defendants' ANSWER to Amended Complaint Defendants' Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Fourth Amended Complaint bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009) Modified on 8/27/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 8/27/2009 (feriab, COURT STAFF).
August 26, 2009 436 STIPULATION re 435 Declaration in Support, 434 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damage Stipulation to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 435 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier ISO Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 434 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 433 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 431 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim, 432 Proposed Order, Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier ISO Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K)(Related document(s) 431 , 432 ) (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 432 Proposed Order re 431 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment Defendants' Notice of Motion and Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Motion For Partial Summary Judgment Regarding Plaintiffs' Hypothetical License Damages Claim by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 26, 2009 430 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 421 Motion to Seal Document (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/26/2009)
August 25, 2009 429 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 8/25/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. (FTR 11:44am - 12:29pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 428 Declaration of Scott W. Cowan in Support of 427 Response in Support of Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 427 ) (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 25, 2009 427 RESPONSE in Support Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Draft Stipulation Under Seal filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 19, 2009 426 Transcript of Proceedings held on 08/18/09, before Judge ELIZABETH D. LAPORTE. Court Reporter/Transcriber Margaret "Margo" Gurule, Telephone number 415-504-4204 or margolargo@gmail.com. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2009. (mng, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 19, 2009 425 STATUS REPORT Amended Joint Discovery Conference Statement by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 18, 2009 481 FILED UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT B to Joint Discovery Conference Statement filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc., SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 424 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 8/18/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information from Plaintiffs 324 and Motion for Sanctions 365 . (Court Reporter Margo Gurule) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 422 STIPULATION re 421 MOTION to Seal Document 420 Status Report, 420 Status Report by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 421 MOTION to Seal Document 420 Status Report filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 420 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Conference Statement by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 419 Featured Case ORDER re 417 Proposed Order filed by SAP AG, Tomorrownow Inc, SAP America Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 18, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 18, 2009 418 AMENDED COMPLAINT Fourth Amended Complaint For Damages And Injunctive Relief against SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Filed byOracle USA Inc., Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Siebel Systems, Inc.. (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/18/2009)
August 17, 2009 417 Proposed Order Request And [Proposed] Order Authorizing Oversized Demonstrative To Be Brought Into Court For Use At Hearing by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 416 CLERKS NOTICE Further Discovery Conference set for 8/25/2009 at 2:00 p.m. ADVANCED TO 11:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 17, 2009 415 CLERKS NOTICE Motion Hearing on Defendant's motion for sanctions and motion to compel previously scheduled for 2:00 p.m. on 8/18/2009 has been advanced to 8/18/2009 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/17/2009)
August 14, 2009 414 Featured Case ORDER by Judge Hamilton granting 348 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint; finding as moot 352 Alternative Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/14/2009)
August 13, 2009 413 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 395 Motion to Seal Document (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 412 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 377 Motion to Seal (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 411 Featured Case ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 12, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 13, 2009 410 EXHIBITS re 382 Declaration in Support,,, [CORRECTED] Exhibit L-2 to the Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 382 ) (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 8/13/2009)
August 11, 2009 409 Declaration of Zachary Alinder in Support of 395 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Sanctions and Reply In Support of Motion to Compel filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 395 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 6, 2009 408 Transcript of Proceedings held on 8-4-2009, before Elizabeth D. Laporte, Magistrate Judge. Court Reporter/Transcriber Debra L. Pas, CSR, Telephone number (415) 431-1477. Per General Order No. 59 and Judicial Conference policy, this transcript may be viewed only at the Clerks Office public terminal or may be purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber until the deadline for the Release of Transcript Restriction.After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Any Notice of Intent to Request Redaction, if required, is due no later than 5 business days from date of this filing. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/2/2009. (Pas, Debra) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
August 5, 2009 407 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Howard in Support of 406 Reply Memorandum filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Related document(s) 406 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 5, 2009 406 Reply Memorandum re 348 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 5, 2009 405 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 386 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Related document(s) 386 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
August 4, 2009 480 FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 464 MOTION for Sanctions filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 464 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 479 FILED UNDER SEAL Reply Memorandum re 466 MOTION to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 478 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 466 MOTION to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 466 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 477 FILED UNDER SEAL REPLY Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 466 MOTION to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 466 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 476 FILED UNDER SEAL Reply re 466 MOTION to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 423 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 8/4/2009 before Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte re Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property 329 . (Court Reporter Debra Pas). (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 404 Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 402 Reply Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information of Plaintiffs filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 402 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 403 Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 402 Reply Memorandum In Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information of Plaintiffs filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-9)(Related document(s) 402 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 402 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion to Compel Production of Financial Information From Plaintiffs filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 401 Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 399 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 399 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 400 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 399 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion of Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 399 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 399 Reply Memorandum In Support of Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 398 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc re 396 Declaration in Support, 397 Stipulation, 395 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Sanctions and Reply In Support of Motion to Compel (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 397 STIPULATION re 395 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Sanctions and Reply In Support of Motion to Compel by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 396 Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 395 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Sanctions and Reply In Support of Motion to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 395 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 4, 2009 395 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Reply In Support of Motion for Sanctions and Reply In Support of Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
August 3, 2009 394 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST AUTHORIZING Visual Equipment to be brought into Court for use at hearing 392 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 393 Featured Case ORDER AUTHORIZING Visual Equipment to be brought into Court for use at hearing re 391 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 8/3/09. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 392 MOTION Request and [Proposed] Order Authorizing Visual Equipment to be brought in to Court for use at Hearing Request and [Proposed] Order Authorizing Visual Equipment to be brought in to Court for use at Hearing filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
August 3, 2009 391 Proposed Order Request and [Proposed] Order Authorizing Visual Equipment to be Brough Into Court for Use at Hearing by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Cowan, Scott) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
July 30, 2009 390 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc Proof of Service (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/30/2009)
July 29, 2009 537 FILED UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT K1 re 535 Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 535 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 536 FILED UNDER SEAL EXHIBIT C1 re 535 Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 535 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 535 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of 534 Memorandum in Opposition filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 534 ) (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 534 FILED UNDER SEALMemorandum in Opposition to re 348 Motion to Amend Complaint filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (vlk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 389 Proposed Order re 386 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 388 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier ISO Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 387 STIPULATION re 386 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Stipulation to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 386 MOTION to Seal Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 385 Statement Defendants' Statement of Non-Opposition to Relief Sought in Plaintiffs' Alternative Motion to File Stipulated Amended Complaint by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 384 Proposed Order re 380 Memorandum in Opposition [Proposed] Order Denying in Part and Granting in Part Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 383 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 384 . *** Proposed Order re 380 Memorandum in Opposition [Proposed] Order Granting Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Plaintiffs' Documents Supporting Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009) Modified on 7/30/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2009 382 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of 380 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B-1, # 3 Exhibit B-2, # 4 Exhibit B-3, # 5 Exhibit B-4, # 6 Exhibit B-5, # 7 Exhibit B-6, # 8 Exhibit B-7, # 9 Exhibit C-1, # 10 Exhibit C-2, # 11 Exhibit D, # 12 Exhibit E, # 13 Exhibit F, # 14 Exhibit G, # 15 Exhibit H, # 16 Exhibit I, # 17 Exhibit J, # 18 Exhibit K-1, # 19 Exhibit K-2, # 20 Exhibit L-1, # 21 Exhibit L-2, # 22 Exhibit L-3, # 23 Exhibit L-4, # 24 Exhibit L-5, # 25 Exhibit L-6, # 26 Exhibit L-7, # 27 Exhibit M, # 28 Exhibit N)(Related document(s) 380 ) (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 29, 2009 381 Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 380 Memorandum in Opposition Declaration of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend Complaint filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Errata E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 380 ) (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009)
July 29, 2009 380 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. DOCUMENT TO BE REFILED LATER. *** Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Amend filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 7/29/2009) Modified on 8/28/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 28, 2009 475 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Alex San Juan in Support of 471 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 471 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 474 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Paul K. Meyer in Support of 471 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 471 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 473 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Holy A. House in Support of 471 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 471 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 472 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Ivgen Guner in Support of 471 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 471 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 471 FILED UNDER SEAL Opposition re 466 MOTION to Compel filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 470 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 469 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 469 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 469 FILED UNDER SEAL Opposition re 464 MOTION for Sanctions filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 464 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 379 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc. re 377 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel; Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 378 STIPULATION re 377 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel; Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 377 MOTION to Seal Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Plaintiffs' Oppositions to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel; Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 376 Declaration of Paul K. Meyer in Support of 374 Memorandum in Opposition, Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 374 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 375 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 374 Memorandum in Opposition, Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J)(Related document(s) 374 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 374 Memorandum in Opposition re 365 MOTION for Sanctions Redacted Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(c) and 16(f) - Correction of Docket # 342 MOTION for Sanctions Redacted Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(c) and 16(f) - Correction of Docket # 342 [Redacted] filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 373 Proposed Order re 368 Memorandum in Opposition by Oracle USA Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 372 Declaration of Alex San Juan in Support of 368 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 368 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 371 Declaration of Paul K. Meyer in Support of 368 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 368 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 370 Declaration of Ivgen Guner in Support of 368 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 368 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 369 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 368 Memorandum in Opposition filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit T, # 21 Exhibit U, # 22 Exhibit V, # 23 Exhibit W, # 24 Exhibit X, # 25 Exhibit Y)(Related document(s) 368 ) (House, Holly) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 368 Memorandum in Opposition re 346 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Information From Plaintiffs filed byOracle USA Inc.. (House, Holly) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 367 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 338 Motion to Seal Document (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 28, 2009 366 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 363 Motion to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/28/2009)
July 22, 2009 365 MOTION for Sanctions Redacted Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 37(c) and 16(f) - Correction of Docket # 342 filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. Motion Hearing set for 8/18/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 7/22/2009)
July 22, 2009 364 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 363 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 363 ) (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 7/22/2009)
July 22, 2009 363 MOTION to Remove Incorrectly Filed Document filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 7/22/2009)
July 21, 2009 362 Declaration of Robert Schwentker in Support of 358 Reply Memorandum, re Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 358 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 21, 2009 361 Declaration of Kevin Mandia in Support of 358 Reply Memorandum, re Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 358 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 21, 2009 360 Declaration of John A. Polito in Support of 358 Reply Memorandum, re Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 358 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 21, 2009 359 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Howard in Support of 358 Reply Memorandum, re Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E)(Related document(s) 358 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 21, 2009 358 Reply Memorandum re 329 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
July 20, 2009 357 Proposed Order re 338 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 20, 2009 356 Declaration of Jennifer Gloss in Support of 338 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 338 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 20, 2009 355 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property 329 to 02:00 PM on 08/04/2009. Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Sanctions 342 and Motion to Compel 346 is set for 02:00 PM on 08/18/2009 before Judge Laporte in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/20/2009)
July 17, 2009 354 Declaration of Chad Russell in Support of 348 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 350 . filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Exhibit Q, # 18 Exhibit Exhibit R, # 19 Exhibit Exhibit S, # 20 Exhibit Exhibit T)(Related document(s) 348 ) (Russell, Chad) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 17, 2009 353 NOTICE. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 7/17/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 15, 2009 352 MOTION for Leave to File Alternative Stipulated Complaint filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Proposed Order)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 15, 2009 351 Proposed Order re 348 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 15, 2009 350 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 354 . *** Declaration of Chad Russell in Support of 348 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A thru T)(Related document(s) 348 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/15/2009) Modified on 7/20/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 15, 2009 349 Declaration of Kevin Mandia in Support of 348 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 348 ) (Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 15, 2009 348 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/19/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Howard, Geoffrey) (Filed on 7/15/2009)
July 14, 2009 468 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 466 MOTION to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc. (Related document(s) 466 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 467 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 464 MOTION for Sanctions filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc. (Related document(s) 464 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 466 FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION to Compel production of financial information from plaintiffs filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009) Modified on 9/14/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2009 465 FILED UNDER SEAL Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 464 MOTION for Sanctions filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc. (Related document(s) 464 ) (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009) Modified on 9/14/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2009 464 FILED UNDER SEAL MOTION for Sanctions filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc. (far, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 347 Declaration of Jason McDonell in Support of 346 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Information From Plaintiffs filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-14, # 2 Exhibit 15-19)(Related document(s) 346 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 346 MOTION to Compel Production of Financial Information From Plaintiffs filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 345 Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 342 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Related document(s) 342 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 344 *** FILED IN ERROR. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 345 . *** Declaration of Stephen K. Clarke in Support of 342 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 342 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009) Modified on 7/22/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2009 343 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 342 MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-F, # 2 Exhibit G-R)(Related document(s) 342 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
November 30, -0001 342
July 14, 2009 342 *** FILED IN ERROR. DOCUMENT LOCKED. PLEASE SEE DOCKET # 365 . *** MOTION for Sanctions Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 37(c) and 16(f) filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009) Modified on 7/22/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF). Modified on 7/23/2009 (ewn, COURT STAFF).
July 14, 2009 341 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc re 339 Declaration in Support, 340 Stipulation, 338 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 340 STIPULATION re 338 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 339 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 338 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 338 ) (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 338 MOTION to Seal Document Defendants' Administrative Motion to Permit Defendants to File Under Seal Documents Supporting Defendants' Motion for Sanctions and Motion to Compel filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 337 Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of 334 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Joshua L. Fuchs in Support of Defendants' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-1, # 2 Exhibit A-2, # 3 Exhibit A-3, # 4 Exhibit A-4, # 5 Exhibit A-5, # 6 Exhibit B, # 7 Exhibit C-1, # 8 Exhibit C-2, # 9 Exhibit C-3, # 10 Exhibit D-1, # 11 Exhibit D-2, # 12 Exhibit D-3, # 13 Exhibit D-4a, # 14 Exhibit D-4b, # 15 Exhibit D-5, # 16 Exhibit D-6, # 17 Exhibit D-7a, # 18 Exhibit D-7b, # 19 Exhibit D-8, # 20 Exhibit D-9, # 21 Exhibit D-10a, # 22 Exhibit D-10b, # 23 Exhibit D-11, # 24 Exhibit D-12, # 25 Exhibit D-13, # 26 Exhibit D-14, # 27 Exhibit E, # 28 Exhibit F, # 29 Exhibit G, # 30 Exhibit H, # 31 Exhibit I, # 32 Exhibit J, # 33 Exhibit K, # 34 Exhibit L, # 35 Exhibit M)(Related document(s) 334 ) (Fuchs, Joshua) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 336 Declaration of Catherine Hyde in Support of 334 Memorandum in Opposition, Declaration of Catherine Hyde filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Related document(s) 334 ) (Fuchs, Joshua) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 335 Proposed Order re 334 Memorandum in Opposition, Proposed Order Denying Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Fuchs, Joshua) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 14, 2009 334 Memorandum in Opposition Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Fuchs, Joshua) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 1, 2009 332 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on July 1, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2009)
June 30, 2009 333 Minute Entry: Further Discovery Hearing held on 6/30/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. (FTR: 2:08pm - 3:04pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 331 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Howard in Support of 329 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibits A-E)(Related document(s) 329 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 330 Declaration of Holly A. House in Support of 329 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed byOracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-H)(Related document(s) 329 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 30, 2009 329 MOTION to Compel Production of Documents Related to Damages Model and Interrogatory Responses Related to Use of Plaintiffs' Intellectual Property filed by Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle International Corporation, Oracle USA Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 8/4/2009 09:00 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Hann, Bree) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
June 26, 2009 328 Featured Case ORDER by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte granting 294 Motion to Compel (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/26/2009)
June 23, 2009 327 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Further Discovery Conference to 6/30/2009 02:00 PM before Judge Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/23/2009)
June 22, 2009 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Fact-Discovery due by 12/4/2009. Designation of Experts due by 10/2/2009. Rebuttal due by 2/26/2010. Expert Discovery due by 4/23/2010. Dispositive Motions to be heard by 5/5/2010. Pretrial Conference set for 9/30/2010 02:30 PM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Jury Trial set for 11/1/2010 08:30 AM in Courtroom 5, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/22/2009) Modified on 6/24/2009 (nah, COURT STAFF).
June 18, 2009 326 Statement Joint Discovery Conference by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 6/18/2009)
June 11, 2009 325 STIPULATED Revised Case Management and Pretrial Order. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 06/11/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
June 4, 2009 324 STIPULATION [Proposed] Stipulated Revised Case Management and Pretrial Order by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 6/4/2009)
May 29, 2009 323 Letter from Oracle to Judge Laporte Objecting To 322 Defendants' Proposed Order. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 5/29/2009) Modified on 6/2/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2009 322 Proposed Order Granting 294 Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Relevant to Plaintiffs' Copyright Claims by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (McDonell, Jason) (Filed on 5/29/2009) Modified on 6/2/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 29, 2009 321 Minute Entry: Further Case Management Conference held on 5/28/2009 before Phyllis J. Hamilton (Date Filed: 5/29/2009). (Court Reporter Not Reported.) (nah, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/29/2009)
May 28, 2009 318 Featured Case ORDER FOLLOWING DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on May 28, 2009. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/28/2009)
May 27, 2009 320 Minute Entry: Hearing held on 5/27/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte re Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Relevant to Plaintiffs' Copyright Claims 294 . (Court Reporter Sahar McVickar) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/27/2009)
May 26, 2009 319 Minute Entry: Discovery Hearing held on 5/26/2009 before Elizabeth D. Laporte. (FTR 2:17pm - 2:44pm) (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 317 Featured Case ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO CLARIFY DISCOVERY LIMITATION. Signed by Judge Hamilton on 5/26/2009. (pjhlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 26, 2009 316 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Relevant to Plaintiffs' Copyright Claims to 9:00 AM on 5/27/2009 before Judge Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 22, 2009 315 Proposed Order re 313 Memorandum in Opposition, 314 Declaration in Support, by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 22, 2009 314 DECLARATION of Tharan Gregory Lanier in Support of 313 Defendants' Opposition to Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Clarification of May 5, 2008 Case Management Order filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Modified on 5/26/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 22, 2009 313 OPPOSITION to 309 Plaintiffs' Administrative Motion For Clarification of May 5, 2008 Case Management Order filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Lanier, Tharan) (Filed on 5/22/2009) Modified on 5/26/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
May 19, 2009 312 STATUS REPORT Joint Discovery Conference Statement by Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 19, 2009 311 Declaration of Geoffrey M. Howard in Support of 309 MOTION Clarification of CMC Order re Deposition Hours Limitation filed byOracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 309 ) (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 19, 2009 310 Proposed Order re 309 MOTION Clarification of CMC Order re Deposition Hours Limitation by Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 19, 2009 309 MOTION Clarification of CMC Order re Deposition Hours Limitation filed by Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 18, 2009 308 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING Defendant's Motion to Compel Discovery Relevant to Plaintiffs Copyright Claims. Hearing reset for 5/27/2009 09:30 AM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 15, 2009 307 CLERKS NOTICE. Case Management Conference set for 5/28/2009 02:30 PM. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2009)
May 12, 2009 306 Proposed Order re 304 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY MAY 5, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER) by Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 305 STIPULATION re 304 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY MAY 5, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER) by Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 12, 2009 304 MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (Joint ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO MODIFY MAY 5, 2008 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER) filed by Oracle USA Inc.. (Hann, Bree) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
May 5, 2009 303 Declaration of Elaine Wallace in Support of 302 Reply Memorandum in Support of Their Motion to Compel Discovery Relevant to Plaintiffs' Copyright Claims filed bySAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D)(Related document(s) 302 ) (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 5/5/2009)
May 5, 2009 302 REPLY in Support of 294 Their Motion to Compel Discovery Relevant to Plaintiffs' Copyright Claims filed by SAP AG, SAP America Inc, Tomorrownow Inc. (Wallace, Elaine) (Filed on 5/5/2009) Modified on 5/6/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
April 29, 2009 301 CLERKS NOTICE CONTINUING the 5/5/2009 Further Discovery Conference to 5/26/2009 02:00 PM. Additionally, a Further Discovery Conference is set for 6/25/2009 at 10:00 AM before Judge Laporte. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 28, 2009 300 Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of 299 Memorandum in Opposition (Declaration of Zachary J. Alinder in Support of Oracle's Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Copyright Information) filed byOracle International Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle USA Inc.. (Related document(s) 299 ) (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/28/2009)
April 28, 2009 299 OPPOSITION to 294 Defendants' Motion to Compel Further Copyright Information filed by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle USA Inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/28/2009) Modified on 4/29/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2009 298 Joint Discovery Conference Statement by Oracle International Corporation, Oracle EMEA Limited, Oracle USA Inc. (Alinder, Zachary) (Filed on 4/28/2009) Modified on 4/29/2009 (far, COURT STAFF).
April 22, 2009 297 CLERKS NOTICE RESETTING Defendants' Motion to Compel Discovery Relevant to Plaintiffs' Copyright Claims 294 . Hearing reset for 02:00 PM on 5/19/2009 02:00 PM in Courtroom E, 15th Floor, San Francisco. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 17, 2009