LeGrande v. Yates

Petitioner: Reyes LeGrande, Jr.
Respondent: James A. Yates
Case Number: 3:2007cv01793
Filed: March 29, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Fresno
Presiding Judge: William H. Alsup
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2010 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING PETITIONERS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 25, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2010)
September 21, 2010 55 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Alsup on September 21, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/21/2010)
August 11, 2010 53 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 11, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 10, 2010 52 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AND CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY. Signed by Judge Alsup on August 10, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/10/2010) Modified on 8/11/2010 (wsn, COURT STAFF).
April 28, 2010 47 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REQUESTING ADDITIONAL BRIEFING. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 28, 2010. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2010)
January 14, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE TRAVERSE by Judge Alsup granting in part and denying in part 44 Ex Parte Application (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2010)
October 5, 2009 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 39 RESPONDENT'S EX PARTE APPLICATION FOR FIRST ENLARGEMENT OF TIME TO FILE AN ANSWER. Signed by Judge Alsup on October 5, 2009. (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2009) Modified on 10/6/2009 (sis, COURT STAFF).
July 7, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (whalc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LeGrande v. Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reyes LeGrande, Jr.
Represented By: James Kenneth Roberts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James A. Yates
Represented By: Mark S. Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?