Bankston v. Curry

Petitioner: Lewis Dale Bankston
Respondent: Ben Curry
Case Number: 3:2007cv01819
Filed: March 30, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
June 4, 2010 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 54 Motion for Certificate of Appealability (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
March 31, 2010 51 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/31/2010. (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2010)
March 30, 2010 50 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying Habeas Relief. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 3/30/2010. (crblc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2010)
March 30, 2009 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 36 Motion for Leave to File; denying 28 Motion to Dismiss. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
November 18, 2008 29 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 27 Motion for Leave to File. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
April 4, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for summary and to show cause. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 4/4/2007. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bankston v. Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lewis Dale Bankston
Represented By: Steve M. Defilippis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ben Curry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?