Dilley v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Marianne Dilley
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company and Bank of America Long Term Disability Benefits Plan
Case Number: 3:2007cv01831
Filed: April 2, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Retirement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 106 STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 11/6/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/6/2009)
October 15, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO CONTINUE DATE TO COMPLETE SETTLEMENT re 103 Stipulation filed by Marianne Dilley. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 10/15/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2009)
July 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Granting 98 Stipulation continuing Trial and Briefing Schedule filed by Bank of America Long Term Disability Benefits Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Hon. Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/17/09. (sv, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/17/2009)
July 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 STIPULATION AND ORDER CLARIFYING THE TRIAL BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 92 Stipulation filed by Bank of America Long Term Disability Benefits Plan, Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 7/8/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton granting 86 Motion for Protective Order (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
January 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER WITHDRAWING REFERENCE. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 1/30/09. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO CONTINUE THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 76 Stipulation filed by Marianne Dilley. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 12/12/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 75 DISCOVERY ORDER re 68 Letter filed by Marianne Dilley, 74 Discovery Hearing,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/4/08. (mejlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 19, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER re 68 Letter filed by Marianne Dilley Discovery Hearing set for 12/4/2008 10:00 AM in Courtroom B, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 11/19/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
September 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 70 STIPULATION AND ORDER CONTINUING THE FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 69 Stipulation filed by Marianne Dilley. Signed by Judge Phyllis J. Hamilton on 9/24/08. (nah, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/24/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dilley v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Michael Neil Westheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America Long Term Disability Benefits Plan
Represented By: Michael Neil Westheimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marianne Dilley
Represented By: Frank N. Darras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?