Microsoft Corporation v. EEE Business Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Defendant: EEE Business Inc., Ming Ni Shang, Alice Wang and Nancy Linker
Case Number: 3:2007cv01839
Filed: April 2, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 29, 2009 154 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING SUMMARY JUDGMENT AGAINST DEFENDANT LIFENG WANG (RE: DAMAGES, ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS). Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/29/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2009)
August 21, 2009 149 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 147 MOTION to Strike 142 Jury Demand. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on August 21, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/21/2009)
April 6, 2009 131 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING Without Prejudice 109 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
March 23, 2009 127 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 121 Substitution of Counsel. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
February 13, 2009 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING AND BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THIRD MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE DAMAGES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
January 23, 2009 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON THIRD MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RE DAMAGES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/23/2009)
November 24, 2008 98 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 95 MOTION to Change Time Pursuant to Civil L. R. 6-3. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 19, 2008 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER for Supplemental Submissions re Application for Default Judgment. Signed by Magistrate Judge Wayne D. Brazil on 11/19/08. (wdblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2008)
September 23, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White DENYING 67 Motion for Summary Judgment AND DENYING as moot 76 Motion to Strike. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
April 5, 2007 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF RECUSAL; Signed by Judge Phyllis J Hamilton on 4/5/2007. (awb, COURT-STAFF) (Filed on 4/5/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Microsoft Corporation v. EEE Business Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Microsoft Corporation
Represented By: Paul J. Andre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EEE Business Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ming Ni Shang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alice Wang
Represented By: Charles Michael Standard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy Linker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?