Mazur v. Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan et al

Plaintiff: Paul Mazur
Defendant: Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan and AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1
Case Number: 3:2007cv01904
Filed: April 4, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.: Employee Benefits
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 28, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 149 Stipulation For Dismissal. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 1/28/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
May 8, 2009 142 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE 139 Stipulation and Clarifying Order Denying Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 7, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
May 7, 2009 141 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Stipulation and Proposed Order Continuing Settlement Conference. Settlement Conference set for 6/16/2009 09:30 AM has been continued to 6/25/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/7/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
April 22, 2009 138 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER - Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 6/16/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 4/22/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 20, 2009 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 72 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 108 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 128 Motion to File Sur-reply (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
March 23, 2009 134 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 19, 2009 132 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO DEFENDANTS TO SHOW CAUSE WHY DOCUMENTS SHOULD NOT BE FILED IN THE PUBLIC RECORD. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/19/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
February 26, 2009 119 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 116 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
January 29, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 103 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/29/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
November 24, 2008 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 98 Stipulation Continuing Hearing on Parties' Cross-Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/24/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 12, 2008 97 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 96 Stipulation removing from the docket Plaintiff's filings which contain confidential information.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/12/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008)
October 22, 2008 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 87 Stipulation and Protective Order Regarding Confidentiality of Certain Documents. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/22/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
September 22, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CONFLICT OF INTEREST DISCOVERY re 65 Letter filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan, 68 Letter filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan, 69 Letter filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan, 67 Letter filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Bene fits Plan, 66 Letter filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan, 70 Letter filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan, 64 Letter filed by AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1, Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/22/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mazur v. Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Telesis Group Comprehensive Disability Benefits Plan
Represented By: Michele Ballard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AT&T Umbrella Benefit Plan No. 1
Represented By: Michele Ballard Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Mazur
Represented By: Steven Orin Teal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?