Goodwin v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al

Plaintiff: Christine Goodwin
Defendant: San Quentin State Prison, Robert L. Ayers, Jr., Eddie Ylst, Donald Ducanny, John Curzon, California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation, Marshall D. Thompson, Brian T. Haub, Shelia Petrakis, Doe Emergency Medical Response, R. Mullen, Robert Fox, Susan Cherry, Karen Saylor, Tam Bui, Michael Scott and Nathan T. Gaughan
Case Number: 3:2007cv01924
Filed: April 5, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
January 31, 2012 130 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Additional Petition to Compromise Claims of Minor re 125 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 1/31/2012. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of service)(lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2012)
January 30, 2012 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: 125 Additional Petition to Compromise Claims. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on January 30, 2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/30/2012)
January 24, 2012 124 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 114 Petition to Compromise Claims. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on January 24, 2012. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/24/2012)
December 19, 2011 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING Defendants Tam Bui and Karen Saylor re 112 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 12/19/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/19/2011)
November 30, 2011 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Motion to Continue 108 . Case Management Conference set for 3/21/2012 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 11/30/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2011)
November 9, 2011 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 106 Stipulation. Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 11/09/2011. (nclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/9/2011)
September 19, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Joint Motion to Continue 94 . Case Management Conference reset for 12/7/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 9/19/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2011)
June 20, 2011 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING CONTINUANCE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/20/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
March 21, 2011 82 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT re 50 MOTION for Summary Judgment Notice of and Motion for Summary Judgment; Memo. P&As filed by California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/21/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/21/2011)
January 12, 2011 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO OBTAIN TRANSCRIPTS AT GOVERNMENT EXPENSE re 66 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/12/11. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service)(jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2011)
March 11, 2010 45 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER AND NOTICE OF FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/11/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2010)
October 28, 2009 39 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/28/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
September 14, 2009 36 Opinion or Order of the Court FURTHER ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PORJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/14/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
September 8, 2009 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/14/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2009)
February 17, 2009 34 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING LITIGANT TO FEDERAL PRO BONO PROJECT AND STAYING PROCEEDINGS PENDING APPOINTMENT OF COUNSEL re 28 Proposed Order filed by Christine Goodwin. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/17/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2009)
January 13, 2009 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING re 27 MOTION to Withdraw As Attorneys of Record; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; Declaration of Clayton W. Kent in Support Thereof filed by Christine Goodwin. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/13/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goodwin v. California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Quentin State Prison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert L. Ayers, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie Ylst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donald Ducanny
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Curzon
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Department of Corrections & Rehabilitation
Represented By: Tom Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marshall D. Thompson
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian T. Haub
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelia Petrakis
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Emergency Medical Response
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Fox
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Cherry
Represented By: Thomas A. Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Saylor
Represented By: Tom Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tam Bui
Represented By: Tom Blake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nathan T. Gaughan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Goodwin
Represented By: Clayton William Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?