Stickrath et al v. Globalstar, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sharan Stickrath and Kenneth Stickrath
Defendant: Globalstar, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv01941
Filed: April 5, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Thelton E. Henderson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1391 Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 229 ORDER Re 217 Objection filed by Attorney General for Texas. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
March 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 222 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Granting re 217 Texas Attorney General's Request to Appear by Telephone Conference Call. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/26/2010)
March 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 215 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson Setting Hearing on re 189 MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/16/2010)
November 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 204 STIPULATION AND MEDIATION CONFERENCE ORDER re: Settlement with Mag. Judge Laporte. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/17/2009. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/17/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER extending time to respond to motion for preliminary approval of settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/10/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 27, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 197 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending time to respond to the motion for preliminary approval of settlement. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/27/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 186 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the Case Management Conference to 9/14/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 08/31/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
July 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 184 STIPULATION AND ORDER taking the Motion for Class Certification off calendar and continuing the Case Management Conference to 8/31/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 07/31/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2009)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson vacating 95 Motion to Certify Class; granting 114 Motion for Summary Judgment.(tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
October 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER VACATING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/22/08. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2008)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 42 Defendant's motion to dismiss second amended complaint. Case management conference set for 03/24/08 at 1:30 PM. Joint case management statement due on or before 03/17/08. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stickrath et al v. Globalstar, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharan Stickrath
Represented By: Donna F Solen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Stickrath
Represented By: Gary E. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globalstar, Inc.
Represented By: Elizabeth I. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?