Cruz et al v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.

Plaintiff: John D. Hansen and Miguel A. Cruz
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
3rd Party Plaintiff: Robert Runnings
Case Number: 3:2007cv02050
Filed: April 11, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 9, 2011 328 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER DISMISSING CASE (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/9/2011)
September 27, 2011 325 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Dismissing Plaintiffs' FLSA Allegations Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 9/27/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
July 8, 2011 320 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti decertifying class in case 3:07-cv-02050-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2011)
March 31, 2011 294 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting (287) Motion for Leave to File in case 3:07-cv-02050-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2011)
March 8, 2011 282 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part (259) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:07-cv-02050-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/8/2011)
January 18, 2011 271 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Status Conference set for 6/10/11 is continued to 6/24/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 1, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Samuel Conti.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 1/18/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/18/2011) Modified on 1/18/2011 (tdm, COURT STAFF).
November 19, 2010 254 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Motion for Summary Judgment; denying Motion to Dismiss; denying Motion to Dismiss (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010) (Entered: 11/19/2010). Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/19/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2010)
October 28, 2010 253 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Limited Extension of Discovery Deadline. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/28/2010. (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2010)
September 9, 2010 232 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting in part and denying in part (188) Motion to Decertify in case 3:07-cv-02050-SC; granting in part and denying in part (246) Motion to Decertify in case 3:07-cv-04012-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
June 9, 2010 184 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART MOTION TO COMPEL (JOINT LETTER BRIEF) re (178 in 3:07-cv-02050-SC) Letter filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc., and (238 in 3:07-cv-04012-SC) Letter filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 06/09/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/9/2010)
April 22, 2010 172 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING UNOPPOSED REQUEST TO CONTINUE HEARING ON DISCOVERY CONFERENCE RE; MOLLY KUEHN RE: MESSER DEPOSITION NOTE. Discovery Hearing re-set for 4/30/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/21/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2010)
March 25, 2010 150 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER after Case Management Conference (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/25/2010)
March 17, 2010 148 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Requiring JOINT Proposed Order; Vacating Hearing (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2010)
November 10, 2009 135 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: attorney communication. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/10/2009. (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
July 2, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re: Notice to the Class (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2009)
June 11, 2009 108 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Extending Time for Submission of Notice to the Class to 6/25/09. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/11/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2009)
May 26, 2009 107 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti in case 3:07-cv-02050-SC; granting (124) Motion to Certify Class in case 3:07-cv-04012-SC (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
April 1, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying request for amended administrative motion to be filed under seal (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/1/2009)
March 30, 2009 99 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER permitting documents to be filed under seal (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 9, 2009 93 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying administrative motion to file under seal materials in connection with Plaintiffs' motion for class certification (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 2, 2009 91 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF PARTIES REGARDING DISCOVERY HEARING. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 03/02/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2009)
January 7, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting Substitution of Counsel for Defendant Dollar Tree Stores (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
December 5, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting Ex Parte Application (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2008) (Entered: 11/12/2008) (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/5/2008)
October 15, 2008 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REAFFIRMING CLERK'S NOTICE OF JULY 30, 2008 re (80 in 3:07-cv-04012-SC) Joint Letter. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/15/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
October 10, 2008 76 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO PLAINTIFFS' SPECIAL INTERROGATORY NO. 1;re 74 Order Set Hearings. Signed by Hon. Joseph C. Spero on 10/10/2008. (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/10/2008)
September 16, 2008 74 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Reference and ORDER Re Discovery Procedures Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2008 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/16/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/16/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz et al v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John D. Hansen
Represented By: Donald S. Edgar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel A. Cruz
Represented By: Rex Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Maureen E. McClain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: Robert Runnings
Represented By: Scott Edward Cole
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?