People of the State of California ex rel. et al v. Environmental Protection Agency et al

Plaintiff: People of the State of California ex rel., Edmund G. Brown, Jr. and Attorney General of the State of California
Defendant: National Highway Traffic Safety Administration, Environmental Protection Agency, Department of Transportation and Office of the Management and Budget
Case Number: 3:2007cv02055
Filed: April 11, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552 Freedom of Information Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 12, 2009 73 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 72 Stipulation VACATING Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 12, 2009. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/12/2009)
February 4, 2009 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White ADOPTING Report and Recommendations re 59 and granting in part and denying in part 25 Motion for Summary Judgment. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
December 22, 2008 68 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL REPORT & RECOMMENDATION. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/22/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: People of the State of California ex rel. et al v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Highway Traffic Safety Administration
Represented By: Isaac Randolph Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Represented By: Isaac Randolph Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Transportation
Represented By: Isaac Randolph Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Office of the Management and Budget
Represented By: Isaac Randolph Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: People of the State of California ex rel.
Represented By: Laura Julie Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edmund G. Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Laura Julie Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Attorney General of the State of California
Represented By: Laura Julie Zuckerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?