Norbert v. Felker

Petitioner: Lyle E. Norbert
Respondent: T Felker
Case Number: 3:2007cv02074
Filed: April 12, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Ptn for Writ of H/C - Stay of Execution
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 30, 2008 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR CERTIFICATE OF APPEALABILITY; GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS ON APPEAL. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on December 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/30/2008)
November 25, 2008 18 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: The petition for a writ of habeas corpus is hereby DENIED., ***Civil Case Terminated. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/25/2008)
November 18, 2008 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on November 18, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Norbert v. Felker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lyle E. Norbert
Represented By: Richard Samuel Horn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: T Felker
Represented By: Joan Killeen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?