Smith v. Cardinal Logistics Management Corporation

Plaintiff: Gerald Smith
Defendant: Cardinal Logistics Management Corporation
Case Number: 3:2007cv02104
Filed: April 16, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 1, 2011 150 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re: Filing Date for Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 6/30/11. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2011)
April 11, 2011 144 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 136 Motion for Preliminary Approval (sclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/11/2011)
October 5, 2010 132 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER The Court, having reviewed the Stipulation and Joint Request of the Parties, and good cause appearing therefor, HEREBY ORDERS that the date for disclosure of experts and production of expert reports is continued to January 10, 2 011; the discovery deadline, including depositions of experts, is continued to February 7, 2011; and the hearing date for any motions is continued to March 18, 2011. The Court VACATES the pretrial conference and trial dates. The Court HEREBY ORDERS the parties to appear for a Trial Setting Conference on April 8, 2011, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 1, on the 17th floor, U.S. Courthouse, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, CA 94102. No further extensions will be granted.. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 10/5/10. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/5/2010)
August 19, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti denying 91 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
May 8, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER Re Expert Report. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 5/8/09. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2009)
November 3, 2008 90 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER re Class Notice. Signed by Judge Samuel Conti on 11/3/08. (tdm, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2008)
September 5, 2008 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Samuel Conti granting 67 Motion to Certify Class (sclc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Cardinal Logistics Management Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Logistics Management Corporation
Represented By: R. Jay Taylor, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Smith
Represented By: Jennifer Kelly Whipple
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?