Smith et al v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company

Plaintiff: William A. Smith and Jose E. Lemus
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Case Number: 3:2007cv02126
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal - Employment Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 9, 2009 292 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING HEARING. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/9/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)
August 4, 2009 287 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE REGARDING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO REOPEN. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/4/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2009)
May 27, 2009 273 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 254 Motion to Quash (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/27/2009)
May 26, 2009 264 Opinion or Order of the Court VOIR DIRE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/26/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2009)
May 22, 2009 260 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 258 Plaintiff's Request for Authorization to Bring Equipment into Court During Trial. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/22/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/22/2009)
May 21, 2009 257 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 252 Motion to Shorten Time and setting briefing schedule. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/21/2009)
May 19, 2009 249 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re Objections to Exhibits. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 19, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 7, 2009 243 Opinion or Order of the Court Court's Intended Voir Dire. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on May 7, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/7/2009)
May 1, 2009 242 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White denying 189 Motion to Modify Pretrial Order (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/1/2009)
April 29, 2009 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING re 240 Letter filed by Jose E. Lemus for Tanya Russell, co-Lead Trial Counsel, to appear at the settlement conference on 5/20/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 4/29/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/29/2009)
April 24, 2009 238 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE SPERO FOR SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. Whtie on 4/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 20, 2009 237 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 235 Stipulation to Continue Time of Pretrial Conference to 3:00 p.m.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/20/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/20/2009)
April 8, 2009 229 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER (1) TO SHOW CAUSE AND (2) DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT FURTHER PRETRIAL FILINGS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 10, 2009 198 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 194 Stipulation to Continue Pretrial. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/10/2009)
March 9, 2009 196 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 178 Motion for Leave to File a Motion for Reconsideration (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
January 27, 2009 176 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on January 27, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/27/2009)
December 15, 2008 146 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White striking 125 Motion for Summary Judgment; striking 135 Motion for Summary Judgment (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
October 15, 2008 122 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE RE DISCOVERY DISPUTE(S). Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/15/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/15/2008)
September 22, 2008 118 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting re 117 Stipulation For Protective Order filed by Pacific Gas & Electric Company. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/22/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2008)
September 17, 2008 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part 111 Motion to Compel (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith et al v. Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Smith
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose E. Lemus
Represented By: Daniel Mark Siegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Gas & Electric Company
Represented By: Glen Elliot Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?