Marks v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al

Plaintiff: Leslie Barnes Marks
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and DB Structured Products, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02133
Filed: April 17, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Susan Illston
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 15:1601 Truth in Lending
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 10, 2009 113 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: Defendants' motion for judgment on the pleadings is granted. The action is dismissed with prejudice. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/10/2009)
September 29, 2008 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting substitution of counsel re 88 . Signed by Judge Illston on 9/29/08. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2008)
September 19, 2008 87 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/19/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/19/2008)
September 12, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE OVERDUE PAPERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/12/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2008)
February 6, 2008 69 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING IN PART 59 DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS. Plaintiff must file her Amended Complaint, is she wishes, due 2/29/08. Signed by Judge Susan Illston. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
May 4, 2007 17 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting application to approve recoding of Lis Pendens. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/4/07. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/4/2007)
May 2, 2007 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting request to Withdraw documents #9, #10 from file. Signed by Judge Illston on 5/2/07. (ts, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/2/2007) Modified on 5/3/2007 (ys, COURT STAFF).
April 18, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF REFERRAL. Signed by Judge Alsup on April 18, 2007. (whalc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/18/2007)
April 17, 2007 5 Opinion or Order of the Court SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER TO ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE re 4 ADR Scheduling Order (Attachments: # 1 Standing Order)(sis, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/17/2007)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marks v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Barnes Marks
Represented By: Leslie Patrice Marks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Jeffrey S. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DB Structured Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?