Murillo et al v. Cervantes et al

Plaintiff: Amalia Rios, Maria Murillo, Martha Jimenez, Juan Murillo and Maria Munoz
Defendant: Francisco Cervantes, Teresa Diaz, Bobby Ray Lee, First Federal Mortgage Bankers Inc., Harold Blanco, Eagle Literacy Group Inc., New Century Mortgage Corporation, Wells Fargo Bank N.A, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv02199
Filed: April 20, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Contra Costa
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 1, 2011 117 Opinion or Order of the Court CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL, ***Civil Case Terminated.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/1/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/1/2011)
September 6, 2011 115 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY re 114 . Signed by Judge Nathanael M. Cousins on 9/6/11. (nclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/6/2011)
August 11, 2011 112 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING Request of defendants for the claims representatives to appear by telephone at Settlement Conference re 111 . Signed by Judge Nathanael Cousins on 8/10/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2011)
July 15, 2011 104 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Status Report due by 8/4/2011.. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/15/2011. (cdnS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2011)
March 2, 2011 96 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE FOR CLAIMS REPRESENTATIVES re 95 Letter filed by Bobby Ray Lee. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/2/11. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/2/2011)
February 4, 2011 88 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DRAFT PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/4/2011. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2011)
November 10, 2010 83 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/10/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2010)
October 22, 2010 80 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2010)
September 28, 2010 79 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING HEARING RE: DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/28/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
September 17, 2010 78 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 9/17/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
July 15, 2010 77 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE DISPOSITIVE MOTION REPLY BRIEF DEADLINE re 75 Order,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 7/15/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/15/2010)
February 24, 2010 75 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO AMEND CASE MANAGEMENT DEADLINES re 72 Status Report, filed by First Federal Mortgage Bankers Inc., Juan Murillo, Maria Munoz, Francisco Cervantes, Maria Murillo, Bobby Ray Lee, Teresa Diaz, Amalia Rios, Martha Jimenez. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/24/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2010)
February 19, 2010 74 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING PARTIES TO SUBMIT CHAMBERS COPIES re 72 Status Report, 73 Stipulation Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 2/19/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/19/2010)
January 28, 2010 71 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND re 69 Stipulation, filed by First Federal Mortgage Bankers Inc., Juan Murillo, Maria Munoz, Francisco Cervantes, Maria Murillo, Bobby Ray Lee, Teresa Diaz, Amalia Rios, Martha Jimenez. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/28/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/28/2010)
January 22, 2010 68 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER VACATING PRETRIAL & TRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/22/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/22/2010)
January 20, 2010 67 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE CASE STATUS re 66 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 1/20/2010. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/20/2010)
December 2, 2009 66 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE UPDATED JOINT STATUS REPORT BY 1/15/2010. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 12/2/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2009)
November 19, 2009 64 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT re 62 Order. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/19/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/19/2009)
November 12, 2009 62 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 11/12/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
October 22, 2009 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER FOR PARTIES TO FILE JOINT STATUS REPORT. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/22/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/22/2009)
April 27, 2009 59 Opinion or Order of the Court SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 4/27/2009. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/27/2009)
April 13, 2009 56 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER CONTINUING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 55 Letter filed by First Federal Mortgage Bankers Inc., Juan Murillo, Maria Munoz, Francisco Cervantes, Maria Murillo, Bobby Ray Lee, Teresa Diaz, Amalia Rios, Martha Jimenez. Signed by Judge James Larson on 4/13/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
March 30, 2009 54 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE AND SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/30/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
October 30, 2008 53 Opinion or Order of the Court AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (correcting dates and adding signature); ORDER REFERRING PARTIES TO A SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE re 51 Case Management Scheduling Order,. Signed by Judge Maria-Elena James on 10/30/2008. (mejlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/30/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Murillo et al v. Cervantes et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amalia Rios
Represented By: Matthew John Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Murillo
Represented By: Heidi M. Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha Jimenez
Represented By: Matthew John Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Murillo
Represented By: Heidi M. Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Munoz
Represented By: Matthew John Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francisco Cervantes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teresa Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bobby Ray Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Federal Mortgage Bankers Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Blanco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eagle Literacy Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Century Mortgage Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?