Higgins v. Farr Financial Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Howard B. Higgins
Defendant: Farr Financial Inc., Zenith Investment Group LLC and Amaechi George Ozor
Case Number: 3:2007cv02200
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 7:25 Fraud - Commodities Leverage Contracts
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 25, 2011 256 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSING CASE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/25/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/25/2011)
October 11, 2011 250 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 249 Stipulation for Dismissal with Prejudice as to Farr Financial Inc. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/11/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/11/2011)
September 29, 2011 248 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING AS MODIFIED 247 Stipulation. Case Management Statement due by 10/21/2011. Case Management Conference set for 10/28/2011 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/29/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/29/2011)
August 4, 2011 241 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 239 Stipulation: Bench Trial set for 11/7/2011 08:00 AM before Hon. Jeffrey S. White. Pretrial Conference set for 10/17/2011 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Jeffrey S. White.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 8/4/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/4/2011)
June 7, 2011 210 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 209 Stipulation RE: ADDITIONAL TIME TO FILE REPLY. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 6/7/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/7/2011)
May 26, 2011 204 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE PARTIES' STIPULATION 203 to extend time for Defendant to file opposition to Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 5/26/2011. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/26/2011)
October 19, 2010 147 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SCHEDULING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/19/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
October 13, 2010 145 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 144 Stipulation to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on October 13, 2010. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010)
September 28, 2010 137 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 136 CHANGE OF LOCAL COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/28/10. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/28/2010)
March 1, 2010 129 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER re 128 Stipulation to Continue Initial Case Management Conference to April 16, 2010. Case Management Conference set for 4/16/2010 01:30 PM in Courtroom 11, 19th Floor, San Francisco.. Signed by Judge JEFFREY S. WHITE on 3/1/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/1/2010)
January 5, 2010 126 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 125 Stipulation TO CONTINUE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2010)
October 27, 2009 121 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING AS MOOT 119 Stipulation To Continue. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 10/27/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2009)
October 26, 2009 120 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting 113 Motion to Dismiss (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/26/2009)
August 25, 2009 114 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE RE FARR FINANCIAL'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/25/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/25/2009)
August 19, 2009 111 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 110 Stipulation to Extend Time by Four Days for All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/19/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 3, 2009 109 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 108 Stipulation to Extend Time for All Defendants to Respond to Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2009)
June 30, 2009 105 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White granting in part and denying in part 87 Motion to Dismiss; granting 90 Motion for Leave to File (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
April 30, 2009 102 Opinion or Order of the Court Notice of Questions for Hearing. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on April 30, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
March 5, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 100 Stipulation to Continue. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 5, 2009. (jswlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2009)
February 3, 2009 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 94 Stipulation Re Plaintiff's Opposition to Farr Financial's Motion to Dismiss Counts IX and XI of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/3/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/3/2009)
January 12, 2009 89 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re 87 MOTION to Dismiss Counts IX and Xi of Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/12/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/12/2009)
January 5, 2009 86 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 85 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants To Respond to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
September 18, 2008 81 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Vacating Hearing Date. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 18, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/18/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Higgins v. Farr Financial Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Howard B. Higgins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Farr Financial Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zenith Investment Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amaechi George Ozor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?