Kob v. County of Marin
Plaintiff: Barbara Kob
Defendant: County of Marin
Case Number: 3:2007cv02211
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2003 Job Discrimination
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER REGARDING DISPOSITIVE MOTION DATES re 128 Stipulation filed by County of Marin. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/20/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2009)
November 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 122 DISCOVERY ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/3/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/3/2009)
October 28, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 AMENDED PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/29/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/28/2009)
October 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 BRIEFING ORDER ON DISCOVERY DISPUTES AND CONTINUANCE OF HEARING OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/5/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/6/2009)
September 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 62 NOTICE. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/22/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/22/2009)
May 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 41 PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 5/11/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/11/2009)
March 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL DATES AND CORRESPONDENCE DEADLINES re 32 Stipulation filed by County of Marin, Barbara Kob. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/17/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2009)
November 24, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER - Amended Notice of Settlement Conference and Settlement Conference Order. Settlement Conference set for 4/14/2009 09:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 11/24/2008. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/24/2008)
November 13, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER GRANTING TELEPHONE APPEARANCE re 25 Letter filed by Barbara Kob. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/13/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/13/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kob v. County of Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara Kob
Represented By: David M. Poore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Marin
Represented By: Stephen Robert Raab
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?