Estate of Agrippina Spichka by her Administrator Lubov Philpson et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Wagdy Samuel and Estate of Ann Hall by her Administrator Leslie Hall
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc., Pharmacia Corporation and G.D. Searle LLC
Case Number: 3:2007cv02212
Filed: April 23, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Charles R. Breyer
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 18, 2011 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 39 Stipulation filed by Pfizer, Inc., Estate of Ann Hall by her Administrator Leslie Hall terminated.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 8/18/2011. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/18/2011)
February 24, 2011 38 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER : (1) Vacating Dismissal and (2) Granting Motion to Withdraw (C-07-2212 CRB, C-10-4345 CRB). Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/22/11. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2011)
February 11, 2011 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITH PREJUDICE SUBJECT TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/7/11. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 26, 2011 35 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Sarah Burris, Anna DeDonno, Estate of Agrippina Spichka by her Administrator Lubov Philpson, Estate of Anna Rivera O'Neal by her Administrator Robert O'Neal, Estate of Boris Adesman by his administrator Alex Adesman, Isabel Salgado Garcia, Khalil Kasht, Bella Khiemovich, Francisca Sanchez Miranda, Elba Lopez Perez, Gigoriy Rubinshteyn, Ismael Perez Sanchez, Angel Trinidad, Felicita Rosario Alvarez and Ana Brito terminated. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/25/11. (mcl, COURT STAFF)
January 10, 2011 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 1/10/2011. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
September 9, 2009 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER RE: MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 9/8/2009. (crblc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2009)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estate of Agrippina Spichka by her Administrator Lubov Philpson et al v. Pfizer, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wagdy Samuel
Represented By: Marc David Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ann Hall by her Administrator Leslie Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Represented By: Stuart M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pharmacia Corporation
Represented By: Stuart M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G.D. Searle LLC
Represented By: Stuart M. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?