Sophia et al v. Myicis et al

Plaintiff: Christina Sophia and William Florian
Defendant: Myicis and Wayne Hicks
Case Number: 3:2007cv02364
Filed: May 1, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sonoma
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 29, 2008 45 Opinion or Order of the Court JUDGMENT: in favor of plaintiff and agianst defendant Wayne Hicks in the amount of $300,810.96. (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2008)
December 2, 2008 40 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT TO A UNITED STATES DISTRICT JUDGE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/1/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2008)
November 21, 2008 36 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DENYING REQUEST TO APPEAR AT HEARING BY TELEPHONE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/21/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/21/2008)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sophia et al v. Myicis et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christina Sophia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Florian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Myicis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wayne Hicks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?