Glenbrook Capital Limited Partnership v. Kuo et al

Plaintiff: Glenbrook Capital Limited Partnership
Defendant: Mali Kuo, Douglas Watson and Digital Video Systems
Case Number: 3:2007cv02377
Filed: May 2, 2007
Court: California Northern District Court
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 30, 2009 101 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER by Judge Jeffrey S. White GRANTING 75 Motion to Dismiss. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
November 14, 2008 95 Opinion or Order of the Court ***erroneous entry***ORDER GRANTING 92 Unopposed Application for Relief from Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on November 14, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/14/2008) Modified on 11/14/2008 (hdj, COURT STAFF).
September 23, 2008 91 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER GRANTING 88 MOTION for Relief from Case Management Schedule. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 9/23/08. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
September 4, 2008 86 Opinion or Order of the Court NOTICE OF QUESTIONS. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on September 4, 2008. (jswlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/4/2008)
September 3, 2008 85 Opinion or Order of the Court DUPLICATE ENTRY - SEE DOCUMENT NO. 84. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2008) Modified on 9/3/2008 (jjo, COURT STAFF).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glenbrook Capital Limited Partnership v. Kuo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenbrook Capital Limited Partnership
Represented By: Marc W. Rappel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mali Kuo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Digital Video Systems
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?