Doe v. Geller et al Featured Case

Plaintiff uploaded to YouTube a portion of "Secrets of the Psychics," a NOVA video showing the magician James Randi challenging the performance techniques of Uri Geller. Subsequently, the defendants demanded that YouTube take down the video pursuant to the DMCA. Plaintiff seeks injunctive relief and damages for misrepresentation of copyright claims under the Digital Millennium Copyright Act.

Plaintiff: John Doe
Defendant: Uri Geller and Explorologist Ltd.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02478
Filed: May 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER by Judge Walker granting 24 motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2008).
December 7, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 34 . The ADR/ENE deadline of 12/13/2007 is vacated. The parties shall file, no later than 14 days after the Court's ruling on defendants' motion to dismiss/transfer, a proposed schedule for completion of ADR. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/7/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/7/2007)
December 6, 2007 Filing 36 Minute Entry: Hearing on Defendants' re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction, motion for improper venue, motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim held on 12/6/2007 before Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker ; the court submits the matters, court to issue order. (Court Reporter Belle Ball.) (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Date Filed: 12/6/2007)
November 29, 2007 Filing 35 JOINT CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT filed by John Doe. (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 29, 2007 Filing 34 STIPULATION and [PROPOSED] ORDER TO VACATE & CONTINUE 12-13-07 ADR/ENE DEADLINE UNTIL AFTER RULING ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS by Uri Geller, Explorologist Ltd.. (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 11/29/2007)
November 26, 2007 Filing 33 Reply to Opposition re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byUri Geller, Explorologist Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits 1 & 2)(Winelander, Richard) (Filed on 11/26/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 32 Declaration of Matthew Zimmerman in Support of 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byJohn Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A# 2 Exhibit B)(Related document(s) 30 ) (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 31 Declaration of Kurt Opsahl in Support of 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss filed byJohn Doe. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A-D# 2 Exhibit E-H# 3 Exhibit I-L# 4 Exhibit M# 5 Exhibit N# 6 Exhibit O-P# 7 Exhibit Q-T# 8 Exhibit U-V)(Related document(s) 30 ) (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 11/15/2007)
November 15, 2007 Filing 30 Memorandum in Opposition to Defendants' 24 Motion to Dismiss filed byJohn Doe. (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 11/15/2007) Modified on 11/20/2007 (gsa, COURT STAFF).
October 4, 2007 Filing 29 NOTICE by Uri Geller, Explorologist Ltd. Notice of Pendency of Other Action or Proceeding (Winelander, Richard) (Filed on 10/4/2007)
October 2, 2007 Filing 28 Certificate of Interested Entities by Richard Winelander (Winelander, Richard) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
October 2, 2007 Filing 27 Proposed Order re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Uri Geller, Explorologist Ltd.. (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
October 2, 2007 Filing 26 Appendix re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byUri Geller, Explorologist Ltd.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1# 2 Exhibit 2# 3 Exhibit 3# 4 Exhibit 4# 5 Exhibit 5# 6 Exhibit 6# 7 Exhibit 7# 8 Exhibit 8)(Related document(s) 24 ) (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
October 2, 2007 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support re 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed byUri Geller, Explorologist Ltd.. (Related document(s) 24 ) (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
October 2, 2007 Filing 24 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Uri Geller, Explorologist Ltd.. Motion Hearing set for 12/6/2007 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 10/2/2007)
September 25, 2007 Filing 23 NOTICE of Change of Address by Marcia Clare Hofmann (Hofmann, Marcia) (Filed on 9/25/2007)
September 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 17 selecting ENE for ADR Process. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/14/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2007)
September 14, 2007 Filing 21 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by defedant Uri Geller and Explorogist Ltd. (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/14/2007)
September 12, 2007 Filing 20 ADR Certification (ADR L.R. 3-5b) of discussion of ADR options by Parties and Counsel (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 9/12/2007)
September 11, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING TO CONTINUE re 18 . Good cause appearing, the court orders as follows: Compliance with FRCP Rule 26(f) shall occur no later than 10/26/2007. The case management conference currently set for 9/20/2007 is hereby vacated and continued to 12/6/2007 at 3:30 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 9/11/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2007)
September 11, 2007 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Case Management Statement due by 11/29/2007. Case Management Conference set for 12/6/2007 03:30 PM. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/11/2007)
September 7, 2007 Filing 18 STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO CONTINUE SEPTEMBER 20, 2007 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE by Uri Geller, Explorologist Ltd.. (Vucinich, Jeffrey) (Filed on 9/7/2007)
September 6, 2007 Filing 17 STIPULATION and Proposed Order selecting Arbitration by John Doe (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 9/6/2007)
September 5, 2007 Filing 16 ADR Clerks Notice re: Non-Compliance with Court Order. (tjs, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2007)
August 30, 2007 Filing 15 CLERK'S NOTICE : Case Management Conference Continued from 9/6/2007 to 9/20/2007 03:30 PM. Case Management Statement due by 9/13/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/30/2007)
August 15, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker granting 11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Richard Winelander. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/15/2007)
August 7, 2007 Filing 13 CLERK'S NOTICE : Case Management Conference set for 9/18/2007 09:00 AM. Case Management Statement due by 9/11/2007. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 8/7/2007 (cgk, COURT STAFF).
August 2, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Vaughn R. Walker for all further proceedings. Judge Bernard Zimmerman no longer assigned to the case.. Signed by Executive Committee on 8/2/07. (as, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/2/2007)
August 1, 2007 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of Impending Reassignment to U.S. District Judge (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/1/2007)
July 31, 2007 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Attorney Richard Winelander for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice -[Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 34611008912] Filed by Defendants Uri Geller & Explorologist Ltd.. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
July 31, 2007 RECEIVED ORDER: [Proposed] Order Granting re 11 Application of Richard Winelander to Appear Pro Hac Vice Submitted by Defendants Uri Geller & Explorologist Ltd.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
July 31, 2007 Filing 9 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Scheduling by John Doe. (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 7/31/2007)
July 30, 2007 Filing 8 STIPULATION Joint Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Re Scheduling by John Doe. (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
July 30, 2007 Filing 7 NOTICE by John Doe of Filing Defendant's Waiver of Service of Summons (McSherry, Corynne) (Filed on 7/30/2007)
May 14, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION (Marcia Hofmann) FOR ADMISSION OF ATTORNEY TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman; granting 5 . (ls, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/14/2007)
May 10, 2007 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Marcia Hofmann for Leave to Appear in Pro Hac Vice, [Filing Fee: $210.00, Receipt Number 34611006228] Filed by Plaintiff John Doe, a/k/a Brian Sapient. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/10/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/11/2007 (tn, COURT STAFF).
May 10, 2007 RECEIVED ORDER: [Proposed] Order Granting Application for Admission of Attorney to Appear Pro Hac Vice re 5 Submitted by Plaintiff John Doe, a/k/a Brian Sapient. (tn, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2007 Filing 4 REPORT on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding Copyrights Infringement. (cc: form mailed to register). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007)
May 8, 2007 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties Filed by Plaintiff John Doe, a/k/a Brian Sapient. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007)
May 8, 2007 Filing 2 ADR SCHEDULING ORDER: Case Management Statement due 8/13/2007 & Initial Case Management Conference set for 8/20/2007 at 4:00 PM.. (Attachments: #(1) BZ Standing Order). (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007) Additional attachment(s) added on 5/9/2007 (tn, COURT STAFF).
May 8, 2007 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyrights Infringement & Jury Trial Demanded - [Summons Issued] against Uri Geller & Explorologist Ltd., [Filing Fee: $350.00, Receipt Number 34611006131]. Filed by Plaintiff John Doe, a/k/a Brian Sapient. (tn, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/8/2007)
May 8, 2007 SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Uri Geller & Explorologist Ltd.. (tn, COURT STAFF)
May 8, 2007 CASE DESIGNATED for Electronic Filing. (tn, COURT STAFF)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Doe v. Geller et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Doe
Represented By: Jason M. Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uri Geller
Represented By: Richard Winelander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Explorologist Ltd.
Represented By: Richard Winelander
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?