Bibo et al v. Federal Express Inc.
Plaintiff: Paul Bibo, Georgia Shields, Alex Galvez, Marc Garvey and Bryan Peter
Defendant: Federal Express Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv02505
Filed: May 10, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting 197 motion for final approval of class action settlement. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2012)
August 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 194 ORDER granting re 190 motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement and unsealing settlement-related documents. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 8/28/2012. (tehlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2012)
June 12, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 182 STIPULATION AND ORDER to File Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/11/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/12/2012)
May 9, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 179 ORDER on Request for Telephonic Appearance by Defendant. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 05/09/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/9/2012)
February 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 172 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue Joint Case Management Conference re 171 . The parties may appear by telephone for further Case Management Conferences, unless otherwise directed by the Court. Case Management Statement due 4/30/2012. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 5/7/2012 at 1:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/27/2012. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/28/2012)
November 29, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 170 STIPULATION AND ORDER to Continue the Further Case Management Conference to 3/5/2012 01:30 PM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 11/28/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2011)
April 28, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting re 151 Defendant's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/28/2011)
March 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 158 STIPULATION AND ORDER Continuing 151 First MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on the Individual Plaintiffs' split shift claims. Motion Hearing set for 4/25/2011 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2, 17th Floor, San Francisco before Hon. Thelton E. Henderson. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/14/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 STIPULATION AND ORDER Appointing Kerr & Wagstaffe LLP as Additional Class Counsel. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/17/2011. (tmi, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
September 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 141 STIPULATION AND ORDER re 140 Stipulation filed by Federal Express Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 17, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2010)
September 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER RE DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 9/9/10. (lmh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2010)
September 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER re 131 Letter filed by Alex Galvez, Marc Garvey, Georgia Shields, Paul Bibo, Bryan Peter, 134 Letter filed by Federal Express Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on September 2, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/2/2010)
August 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 133 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS' AUGUST 11, 2010 LETTER re 131 Letter filed by Alex Galvez, Marc Garvey, Georgia Shields, Paul Bibo, Bryan Peter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on August 20, 2010. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/20/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 127 STIPULATION AND ORDER allowing filing of second amended complaint. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 06/10/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
April 26, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 116 Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file amended complaint. Plaintiffs shall file amended complaint on or before 05/03/10. (tehlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/26/2010)
April 12, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for filing opposition. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 04/12/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/12/2010)
March 24, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 119 STIPULATION AND ORDER continuing the hearing date on the Motion for Leave to Amend to 5/3/2010 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 12, 19th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 03/24/10. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/24/2010)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER GRANTING 99 Stipulation to continue telephonic case management conference. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 4/29/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
April 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER by Judge Thelton E. Henderson granting in part and denying in part 69 Motion to Certify Class. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/21/2009)
February 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER continuing hearing. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on February 24, 2009. (tehlc4, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/24/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER extending deadline for filing reply memorandum. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 02/03/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATION AND ORDER re: protection of confidential discovery materials. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 12/11/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
October 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 58 STIPULATION AND ORDER dismissing plaintiff Bryan Peter. Bryan Peter terminated. Signed by Judge Thelton E. Henderson on 10/02/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bibo et al v. Federal Express Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul Bibo
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgia Shields
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alex Galvez
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Garvey
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan Peter
Represented By: Daniel L. Feder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Express Inc.
Represented By: Keith A. Jacoby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?