October 7, 2008 |
Filing
71
ORDER OF DISMISSAL. The parties having advised the Court that they have agreed to a settlement of the action, it is ordered that plaintiff's claims are dismissed without prejudice; provided, however, that if any party hereto shall certify to thi s Court, within ninety days, that the agreed consideration for the settlement has not been delivered, this order shall stand vacated and the action shall forthwith be restored to the calendar to be set for trial. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on October 7, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2008)
|
September 30, 2008 |
Filing
69
ORDER DENYING DEFERRED PORTION OF DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER BIFURCATING TRIAL OF MUNICIPAL LIABILITY CLAIM; DIRECTIONS TO PARTIES. Defendants' motion for summary judgment, to the extent the Court deferred ruling thereon , is denied. Trial of the instant claims is ordered bifurcated, such that plaintiff's federal claims against defendants Serna and Artiga, as well as plaintiff's state law claims, will be conducted in advance of and separately from the feder al claim against the City. The parties are directed to include in their Joint Pretrial Statement, a joint proposal or, if necessary, separate proposals, on the timing of the trial on the federal claim against the City. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 30, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2008)
|
September 26, 2008 |
Filing
68
ORDER ENLARGING TIME TO FILE PRETRIAL SUBMISSIONS. The pretrial submissions presently due September 29, 2008 are now due October 3, 2008. Further, any responses to motions in limine shall be filed no later than noon, October 8, 2008, and a chambers copy of each such response shall be provided no later than 4:00 p.m., October 8, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 26, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/26/2008)
|
September 23, 2008 |
Filing
64
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Plaintiff is ordered to file in the public record, no later than September 29, 2008, a redacted version of the Supplemental Briefing. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 23, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/23/2008)
|
September 15, 2008 |
Filing
62
ORDER GRANTING IN PART, DENYING IN PART, AND DEFERRING RULING IN PART ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. To the extent defendants seek summary judgment on the Seventh Cause of Action, the motion is granted. To the extent defendants seek summary judgment on the First, Fourth, Fifth, Sixth, Eighth, and Ninth Causes of Action, and on the claim for punitive damages, the motion is denied. To the extent defendants seek summary judgment on the Second and Third Causes of Action, the Court defers ruling on the motion. Hwang is afforded leave to file, no later than September 23, 2008, supplemental opposition. As of September 23, 2008, the deferred portion of defendants' motion will be taken under submission. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 15, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
|
September 10, 2008 |
Filing
59
ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 12, 2008. Having read and considered the papers filed in support of and in opposition to defendants' motion for summary judgment and/or partial summary judgment, the Court deems the matter suitable for decision on the parties' submissions, and vacates the hearing scheduled for September 12, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 10, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/10/2008)
|
September 5, 2008 |
Filing
54
ORDER GRANTING ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE UNDER SEAL DECLARATION OF LT. DANIEL J. MAHONEY IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND/OR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 5, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
|