Center for Biological Diversity v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency and Stephen Johnson
Case Number: 3:2007cv02794
Filed: May 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Joseph C. Spero
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 16:1538 Endangered Species Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER, signed 12/16/13, re 133 Second Stipulation Regarding Amendment to Stipulated Injunction and Order filed by Environmental Protection Agency, Lisa Jackson. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/16/13. (klhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2013)
August 28, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER by Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 130 Stipulation Regarding Amendement to Stipulated Injunction (lrc, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/28/2013)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 129 ORDER RELATING CASE NO.: C-11-5108 NC and NOT RELATING Case No.: C-07-2794 JCS and Case No.: C-11-293 JCS.. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 11/2/11. (jjoS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011) Modified on 11/2/2011 (jjoS, COURT STAFF).
October 19, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTLING PLAINIFF'S CLAIMS FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND COSTS. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 10/18/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/19/2010)
September 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SECOND JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME WITHIN WHICH TO FILE PLAINTIFFS'MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 09/8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2010)
July 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 123 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER ENLARGING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF'S TO FILE MOTION FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 7/.8/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/8/2010)
May 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 121 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATED INJUNCTION AND ORDER, docket no. 104 . Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 5/17/10. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/17/2010)
March 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER GRANTING re 111 Letter filed by CropLife America, RISE-Responsible Industry for a Sound Environment for J. Michael Klise to appear telephonically on 3/26/10 at 1:30 PM. Court to initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 3/15/2010. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/15/2010)
December 16, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 102 JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 12/16/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/16/2009)
November 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 CORRECTED JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING BRIEFING SCHEDULE. Further Case Management Conference re-set for 3/26/2010 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco (date of 2/19/10 vacated). Motion Hearing set for *3/26/2010 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/30/09. *Please note that date has been changed by the Court.(klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2009)
November 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER GRANTING re 92 Letter filed by Environmental Protection Agency, Lisa Jackson, Stephen Johnson for Erik E. Petersen to appear by phone for the status conference on 11/13/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/10/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/12/2009)
November 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER GRANTING re 90 Letter filed by Reckitt Benckiser Inc., for Thomas W. Stoever, Jr., to appear telephonically at the status conference on 11/13/9 at 1:30 PM. Court to initiate the phone contact. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/10/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/10/2009)
November 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 89 STIPULATION AND ORDER REQUESTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Status Conference set for 11/13/2009 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom A, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/3/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/4/2009)
April 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING 69 12th Joint Case Management Statement and Request for Continuance filed by Center for Biological Diversity. Further Case Management Conference prev. set for 4/10/9 at 1:30 PM, has been re-set for 6/12/2009 at 1:30 PM. Updated joint cmc statement due 6/5/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 04/06/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/6/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 2/13/9 at 1:30 PM has been re-set for 4/10/2009 at 01:30 PM. Joint updated cmc statement due by 4/3/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 02/09/09. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER GRANTING continuance of the Further Case Management Conference currently set for 1/9/9 at 1:30 PM. Further cmc continued to 2/13/2009 at 01:30 PM. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 1/5/9. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009)
November 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER GRANTING REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Further Case Management Conference previously set for 11/21/08 at 1:30 PM, has been continued to 1/9/2009 at 01:30 PM. Joint updated case management conference statement due by 1/2/9. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 11/17/08. (klh, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2008)
September 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER Granting re 58 Continuance of Further Case Management Conference filed by Center for Biological Diversity Further Case Management Conference set for 11/21/2008 01:30 PM. UPdated joint camse management conference statement due by 11/14/2008.. Signed by Judge Joseph C. Spero on 9/15/08. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/15/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Center for Biological Diversity v. Environmental Protection Agency et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Center for Biological Diversity
Represented By: John T Buse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Environmental Protection Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephen Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?