Wilson v. Compass Vision, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Deborah Wilson
Defendant: Compass Vision, Inc. and National Medical Services, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2007cv03431
Filed: June 29, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: Bernard Zimmerman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 232 STIPULATED SETTLEMENT AND CONSENT JUDGMENT RE: Third-Party Attorney's Fees and Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/17/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/17/2011)
February 25, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 229 FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/24/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2011)
February 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 228 ORDER RE FURTHER FILINGS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/17/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/17/2011)
February 15, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 227 ORDER re (136 in 3:09-cv-02016-BZ, 449 in 3:07-cv-05642-BZ, 151 in 3:08-cv-04118-BZ, 226 in 3:07-cv-03431-BZ) Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/15/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/15/2011)
February 8, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 226 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Order to Show Cause Hearing set for 2/28/2011 03:00 PM. Show Cause Response due by 2/16/2011.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/8/2011. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2011)
January 10, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 221 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting (432) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/10/2011)
December 21, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER DENYING DEFENDANTS' RULE 50 MOTIONS AS MOOT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/20/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/21/2010)
December 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 211 JUDGMENT IN A CIVIL CASE FOLLOWING JURY VERDICT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/15/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2010)
December 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 204 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; denying (377) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/6/2010)
December 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER TO PAY ADDITIONAL ATTENDANCE FEE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/2/2010)
November 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting (381) Ex Parte Application in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/30/2010)
November 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 201 ORDER ALLOWING ATTORNEY CHRISTIAN GREEN ACCESS TO BUILDING FOR TRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/29/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/29/2010)
November 18, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 199 SUPPLEMENTAL PRETRIAL ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/18/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/18/2010)
November 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; denying (343) Motion in Limine in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/16/2010)
November 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER TO BRING PERSONAL ELECTRONIC EQUIPMENT INTO THE COURTROOM FOR USE AT TRIAL. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/12/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/15/2010)
November 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 192 ORDER REQUIRING NATIONAL MEDICAL SERVICES TO FILE JURY INSTRUCTIONS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/5/2010. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2010)
October 27, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER ADVANCING TIME OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/27/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2010)
October 20, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; vacating hearing (267) Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; denying (268) Motion to Shorten Time in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/20/2010)
September 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE re (263 in 3:07-cv-05642-BZ) MOTION The State of California, Department of Consumer Affairs' Motion for Relief from NonDispositive PreTrial Order of Magistrate Judge re (253) Order, MOTION The State of Calif ornia, Department of Consumer Affairs' Motion for Relief from NonDispositive PreTrial Order of Magistrate Judge re (253) Order, filed by California State Board of Pharmacy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/7/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/7/2010)
August 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 185 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting (212) Motion for Summary Judgment in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2010)
August 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 182 ORDER RE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/11/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2010)
August 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS OF THE CALIFORNIA STATE BOARD OF PHARMACY re (246 in 3:07-cv-05642-BZ) Objection filed by California State Board of Pharmacy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/3/2010)
July 16, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; denying (227) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal; denying (235) Motion to Seal Case; denying (236) Motion to Seal Case in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2010)
July 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting in part and denying in part (213) Administrative Motion to File Under Seal in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/2/2010)
July 1, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 177 ORDER RE: NOTICE TO COURT CONCERNING ORDER ON DIEPENBROCK HARRISON'S MOTION TO WITHDRAW. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/1/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/1/2010)
June 25, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 175 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/25/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/25/2010)
June 17, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; denying (188) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ; denying (82) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 3:08-cv-04118-BZ; denying (65) Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. in case 3:09-cv-02016-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/17/2010)
June 15, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 172 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; DENYING (201) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/15/2010)
June 14, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 171 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/14/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2010)
June 11, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 170 ORDER TO REPLY. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/10/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/11/2010)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting (189) Ex Parte Application in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ; granting (83) Ex Parte Application in case 3:08-cv-04118-BZ; granting (66) Ex Parte Application in case 3:09-cv-02016-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/4/2010)
May 6, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; denying (169) Motion to Sever in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/6/2010)
March 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 164 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/5/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/5/2010)
February 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/10/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2010)
February 9, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 162 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/9/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2010)
February 8, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 160 ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; Granting re (142) Motion to Amend the Answer; Finding as Moot re (149) Motion to Appear by Telephone; Finding as Moot re (150) Motion to Appear by Telephone; Finding as Moot re (152) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/8/2010)
February 2, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER CONTINUING TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/2/2010. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/2/2010)
December 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER GRANTING LETTER REQUEST TO CONTINUE TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/29/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/29/2009)
December 17, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 155 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONE CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/16/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/17/2009)
December 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER SCHEDULING TELEPHONIC DISCOVERY CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/11/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/11/2009)
October 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER for Substitution of Attorney. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 10/9/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/9/2009) Modified on 10/13/2009 (slh, COURT STAFF).
October 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; vacating hearing (127) Motion to Appoint Lead Plaintiff and Lead Counsel in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/7/2009)
August 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER STAYING ACTION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 8/19/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/19/2009)
August 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 144 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO EXTEND TIME FOR EXCHANGE OF INITIAL DISCLOSURES.Signed by Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 08/06/2009. (ahy, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/7/2009)
August 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part (138) Motion to Dismiss in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/5/2009)
July 21, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 139 BRIEFING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 7/20/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/21/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 134 ORDER RELATING CASE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 6/20/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
April 22, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER GRANTING STAY, IN PART, AND SCHEDULING STATUS CONFEENCE AND HEARING ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO STAY by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman granting in part and denying in part (111) Motion to Stay in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting in part and denying in part (99) Motion to Stay in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ; granting in part and denying in part (30) Motion to Stay in case 3:08-cv-04118-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/22/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 STIPULATION AND ORDER re (111 in 3:07-cv-03431-BZ) MOTION to Stay filed by Compass Vision, Inc., (100 in 3:07-cv-05642-BZ) Brief filed by Compass Vision, Inc., (31 in 3:08-cv-04118-BZ) Brief filed by Compass Vision, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 4/13/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/31/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 108 ORDER Granting Parties to Appear Telephonically for Settlement Conference. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 3/9/09. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/9/2009)
March 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 100 ORDER SCHEDULING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 3/3/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/3/2009)
January 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 99 REVISED ORDER SCHEDULING JURY TRIAL AND PRETRIAL MATTERS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 1/13/2009. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/13/2009)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 12/22/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
December 18, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 96 ORDER re (83 in 3:07-cv-05642-BZ, 83 in 3:07-cv-05642-BZ) Order, Set Hearings Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 3/10/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/18/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/18/2008)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER re (56 in 3:07-cv-05642-BZ, 56 in 3:07-cv-05642-BZ) Order, Set Hearings Settlement Conference Rescheduled for 1/13/2009 10:00 AM.. Signed by Judge MARIA-ELENA JAMES on 12/4/08. (bjt, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008)
November 26, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATION AND ORDER to continue the Telephonic Status Conference to 2/2/2009 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom G, 15th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 11/25/08. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/26/2008)
November 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting (78) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/5/2008)
September 17, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER SETTING FURTHER STATUS CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/17/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/17/2008)
September 9, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 89 AMENDED ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY RE MR. PERLBERGER.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 9/9/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/9/2008)
September 8, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting (71) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/8/2008)
September 5, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Bernard Zimmerman in case 3:07-cv-03431-BZ; granting (68) Motion to Appear by Telephone in case 3:07-cv-05642-BZ (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/5/2008)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE.. Signed by Judge Bernard Zimmerman on 2/1/2008. (bzsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Compass Vision, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deborah Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Compass Vision, Inc.
Represented By: Catherine Anne Salah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Medical Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?