Chattler -v- United States of America
Plaintiff: Julie Chattler
Defendant: United States of America and United States Department of State
Case Number: 3:2007cv04040
Filed: August 7, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Alameda
Presiding Judge: James Larson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1330 Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 3, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/3/2009)
September 1, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER VACATING SEPTEMBER 4, 2009 HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO AMEND ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on September 1, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/1/2009)
July 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 175 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of United States Department of State, United States of America against Julie Chattler. 1. Defendants motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED.2. Plaintiffs motion for partial summary judgment is hereby DENIED.3. Defendants motions to strike are hereby DENIED. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/14/2009)
July 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 174 ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT; DENYING DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STRIKE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on July 10, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/10/2009)
May 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER RE: ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING DATE ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; VACATING MAY 22, 2009 HEARING; SETTING JULY 31, 2009 HEARING; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The issues presented by the parties' respective motion s other than the issue of prudential exhaustion are appropriate for determination without oral argument; the hearing scheduled for May 22, 2009 is vacated. The hearing on the issue of prudential exhaustion is scheduled for July 31, 2009, at 9:00 a.m . The Case Management Conference scheduled for June 19, 2009 is continued to September 18, 2009; a Joint Case Management Statement shall be filed no later than September 11, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 20, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/20/2009)
May 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 165 ORDER SHORTENING TIME FOR RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION. Counsel for defendants is ordered to respond to plaintiff's administrative motion on or before Wednesday, May 20, 2009 at 5:00 p.m. Eastern Daylight Time. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on May 19, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/19/2009)
May 18, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER Re Joint Letter of May 14, 2009. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/18/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/18/2009)
May 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 159 ORDER Requiring Further Meet and Confer Re Defendants' Privilege Log 155 156 . Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/15/2009 02:30 PM in Courtroom C, 15th Floor, San Francisco. The Court shall initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edward M. Chen on 5/12/2009. (emcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/12/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUGMENT. The hearing on plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, defendants' motion for summary judgment, and defendants' motions to strike is continued from May 1, 2009 to May 22, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 24, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. The Case Management Conference is continued from April 17, 2009 to June 19, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
March 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT, DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUD GMENT, AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO STRIKE. The hearing on plaintiff's motion for partial summary judgment, defendants' motion for summary judgment, and defendants' motions to strike is continued to May 1, 2009. To the extent plaint iff seeks leave to file a supplemental brief, the motion is denied as premature and without prejudice to plaintiff's making a specific showing as the need for filing a supplemental brief. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on March 11, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/11/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFF'S ADMINISTRATIVE MOTION TO FILE EXHIBIT D UNDER SEAL; DIRECTIONS TO PLAINTIFF. Plaintiff is directed to file in the public record, no later than February 27, 2009, a redacted version of Exhibit D. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 12, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF'S AND DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT; ORDER CONTINUING HEARING ON MOTIONS. The deadline for filing oppositions is extended from February 13, 2009 to February 20, 2009. The deadline for filing replies is extended from February 20, 2009 to February 27, 2009. The hearing on the motions for summary judgment is extended from March 6, 2009 to March 13, 2009. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 9, 2009. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/9/2009)
January 7, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER by Judge Edward M. Chen denying 99 Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as moot; granting in part and denying in part 104 Defendants' Motion for Protective Order (emclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/7/2009)
February 6, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER RE: JOINT STIPULATION RE: BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY; STAYING DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF MOTION TO STAY DISCOVERY; CONTINUING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Pursuant to the parties' stipulation filed F ebruary 4, 2008, plaintiff shall file opposition to the motion to stay on or before February 8, 2008, and defendants shall file their reply on or before February 12, 2008. The Court will hear argument on the motion to stay discovery on February 22, 2008, at 9:00 a.m. Discovery is stayed until resolution of defendants' motion to stay discovery. The Case Management Conference is continued from February 15, 2008 to April 11, 2008. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on February 6, 2008. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2008)
February 1, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER by Judge Illston denying plaintiff's request for leave to file a motion for reconsideration (SI, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/1/2008)
August 13, 2007 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER. Signed by Judge James Larson on 8/10/2007. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/13/2007)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chattler -v- United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julie Chattler
Represented By: Megan E. Waples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of State
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?