Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. et al v. Nuvelo Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. and Juan Pablo Cabrera
Defendant: Nuvelo Inc., Ted W. Love, Gary S. Titus and Shelly D. Guyer
Movant: The Lidard Group and The Petronis Group
Case Number: 3:2007cv04056
Filed: August 8, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Martin J. Jenkins
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:78m(a) Securities Exchange Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER cancelling hearing on unopposed motion for distribution of settlement and taking the motion on the papers re 173 Stipulation, filed by Todd A. and Amy A. Stephens, Frank C. and Patricia A. Petronis, Juan Pablo Cabrera. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 7/13/2012. (beS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/16/2012)
July 6, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer granting 160 Motion for Attorney Fees (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/6/2011)
June 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER REGARDING MOTION FOR ATTORNEYS' FEES AND EXPENSES AND FOR COSTS AND EXPENSES TO SETTLEMENT CLASS REPRESENTATIVES. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on June 20, 2011. (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/20/2011)
February 11, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 154 ORDER Continuing Stay of Litigation to Finalize Settlement Documents (2/24/2011) re 153 Stipulation filed by Nuvelo Inc., Case stayed.. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 2/10/2011. (be, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2011)
January 26, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER re 149 Stipulation filed by Gary S. Titus, Ted W. Love, Nuvelo Inc., Michael D Levy. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2011)
January 19, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER. The court finds that a brief stay of its 1/14 order is appropriate. Defendants shall provide the documents and briefing requested in the 1/14 order no later than 1/26/2011. Should the parties conclude the settlement process prior to that time, defendants may request a further stay. (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/19/2011).
January 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER (vrwlc3, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2011)
October 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER. The parties shall respond to this discovery-related order on or before November 4, 2010. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/13/2010).
September 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER. On or before October 4, 2010, plaintiffs shall file a letter brief in response to defendants' letter of September 27, 2010. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2010).
July 30, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/30/2010).
July 7, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 126 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINES re 125 filed by Nuvelo Inc. The deadline for Defendants to produce all documents in response to document requests outstanding as of 3/25/2010 shall be extended to 7/30/2010. The deadlines for Lead Plaintif f to serve Identification Interrogatories, for Defendants to file responses thereto, and for Lead Plaintiff to serve FRCP 30(b)(6) deposition notices shall each be extended by 60 days. The parties shall work in good faith to resolve any outstanding discovery disputes in a manner that permits discovery necessary to mediation, to be produced in a timely manner, and any delay in bringing such disputes to the attention of the Court until after the mediation shall not operate to waive or otherwise p rejudice the rights of the moving party to obtain the discovery requested. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file a motion for class certification shall be extended sixty days, to 11/15/2010. The hearing on Plaintiffs' motion for class certification shall be rescheduled to 1/27/2011 at 10:00 AM. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 7/7/2010. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/7/2010)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 STIPULATION AND ORDER setting Further Case Management Conference for 10/15/2009 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 6, 17th Floor, San Francisco. Signed by Judge Vaughn R. Walker on 09/30/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
May 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STIPULATION AND ORDER SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE re doc 86 filed by Todd A. and Amy A. Stephens, Frank C. and Patricia A. Petronis, Juan Pablo Cabrera. Lead Plaintiffs have until 5/15/2009 to file an opposition to the motion to dismiss. Defendants shall have through and including 6/10/2009 to file a reply brief. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn RWalker on 5/13/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/13/2009)
March 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 83 STIPULATION AND ORDER. Lead Plaintiffs shall have through and including 5/13/2009 to file an opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss. Defendants shall have through and including 6/8/2009 to file a reply brief Doc re 82 filed by Nuvelo Inc. The hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss was noticed for 6/25/2009 at 2:30 PM. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 3/31/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/31/2009)
January 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER AS MODIFIED BY THE COURT re [Doc #73] Stipulation filed by Nuvelo Inc. Plaintiffs shall have through and including 1/23/2009 to file the Amended Consolidated Complaint. Defendants shall have through and including 3/24/2009 to respond to the Amended Consolidated Complaint. Signed by Judge Vaughn R Walker on 1/9/2009. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/14/2009)
December 12, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 71 STIPULATION AND ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR LEAD PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CONSOLIDATED AMENDED COMPLAINT until 1/14/2009. Signed by Chief Judge Vaughn R Walker on 12/12/2008. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/12/2008)
December 4, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting [doc #34] Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file an amended consolidated complaint not later than 12/31/2008. (vrwlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/4/2008).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W. et al v. Nuvelo Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Electrical Workers Pension Fund, Local 103, I.B.E.W.
Represented By: Samuel Howard Rudman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Pablo Cabrera
Represented By: Nicolette Tropiano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nuvelo Inc.
Represented By: Marisa Megur Seifan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ted W. Love
Represented By: Marisa Megur Seifan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary S. Titus
Represented By: Marisa Megur Seifan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shelly D. Guyer
Represented By: Marisa Megur Seifan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: The Lidard Group
Represented By: Evan J. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Movant: The Petronis Group
Represented By: Christopher J. Keller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?