Grewal v. Choudhury et al
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grewal
Defendant: Amit Choudhury and Amisil Holdings Ltd
Case Number: 3:2007cv04218
Filed: August 16, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Maria-Elena James
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Contract Default
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 374 ORDER by Judge Charles R. Breyer denying 368 Motion (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/5/2010)
March 22, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 364 ORDER OVERRULING OBJECTIONS TO TURNOVER ORDER re 356 Objection filed by Amit Choudhury. Signed by Judge James Larson on 3/22/10. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/22/2010)
September 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 355 TURNOVER ORDER NO. 2 in aid of execution following judgment-debtor's examination. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/30/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2009)
September 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 351 ORDER RESCHEDULING JUDGEMENT-DEBTOR EXMAINATION re 350 Stipulation filed by Elizabeth Grewal. Signed by Judge James Larson on 9/14/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/14/2009)
August 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 348 ORDER re: Clarium Settlement (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/11/2009)
August 6, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 345 ORDER for Appearance and Examination. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 08/06/09. (rbe, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/6/2009)
June 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 331 ORDER modifying order of 6/24/09. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 6/30/09. (mcl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/30/2009)
April 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 323 ORDER re: Allante Settlement (crblc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2009)
February 25, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 262 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER IN AID OF EXECUTION re 255 Proposed Order filed by Elizabeth Grewal. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/25/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/25/2009)
February 20, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 247 CERTIFICATION of Facts Constituting Contempt. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/20/2009. (jllc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/20/2009)
February 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 243 JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/13/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/13/2009)
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 235 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO SHORTEN TIME re 226 Proposed Order, filed by Elizabeth Grewal. Signed by Judge James Larson on 2/10/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
January 29, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 211 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 207 Stipulation filed by Elizabeth Grewal. Signed by Judge James Larson on 1/29/09. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/29/2009)
December 23, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 201 AMENDED TURNOVER ORDER IN AID OF EXECUTION FOLLOWING JUDGMENT DEBTORS EXAMINATION re 200 Order. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/23/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/23/2008)
December 22, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 200 TURNOVER ORDER IN AID OF EXECUTION FOLLOWING JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S EXAMINATION. Signed by Judge James Larson on 12/22/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/22/2008)
November 20, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER SCHEDULING JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION re 192 Proposed Order filed by Elizabeth Grewal. Signed by Judge James Larson on 11/20/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/20/2008)
October 27, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER CONTINUING DATE TO APPEAR FOR EXAMINATION re 177 Proposed Order filed by Elizabeth Grewal. Signed by Judge James Larson on 10/27/08. (jlsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 10/27/2008)
September 11, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 154 WRIT of Execution issued against Amit Choudhury in the amount of $1,923,740.00 (mcl, COURT STAFF)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grewal v. Choudhury et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elizabeth Grewal
Represented By: E. Jeffrey Banchero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amit Choudhury
Represented By: Harvey Lewis Leiderman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amisil Holdings Ltd
Represented By: David S. Reidy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?