Ortega v. Giamalvo
Plaintiff: Lazarus A. Ortega
Defendant: Michael Giamalvo
Case Number: 3:2007cv04436
Filed: August 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth D. Laporte
Nature of Suit: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER re 104 Stipulation filed by Michael Giamalvo. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on December 20, 2011. (edllc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/20/2011)
November 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER OF CONDITIONAL DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D Laporte on 11/2/2011. (kns, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 11/2/2011)
September 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 101 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 09/30/2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/30/2011)
September 27, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 99 ORDER Vacating Writ of Habeas Corpus Ad Testificandum re 96 . Writ Vacated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/27/2011)
September 12, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 96 WRIT of habeas corpus ad testificandum issued for attendance of plaintiff at settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nandor J. Vadas on 09/12/2011. (njvlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 9/12/2011)
June 16, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER DENYING Defendants' Motion to Dismiss 85 . Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte. (lhS, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/16/2011)
April 4, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 84 CASE MANAGEMENT AND PRETRIAL ORDER FOR JURY TRIAL. Signed by Judge Elizabeth D. Laporte on 4/4/2011. (cgk, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/4/2011)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ortega v. Giamalvo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lazarus A. Ortega
Represented By: Sarah Ratcliffe Choi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Giamalvo
Represented By: J. Randall Andrada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?