Furnace v. Sullivan et al
Plaintiff: Edward Terran Furnace
Defendant: Paul Sullivan, D. Morales and J. Soto
Case Number: 3:2007cv04441
Filed: August 28, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: Monterey
Presiding Judge: Maxine M. Chesney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on June 14, 2013. (mmclc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/14/2013)
April 13, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 38 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of D. Morales, J. Soto, Paul Sullivan against Edward Terran Furnace, defendants motion for summary judgment is hereby GRANTED and judgment shall be entered in favor of all defendants. (tl, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2010)
April 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR PLAINTIFF'S OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on April 30, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/30/2009)
January 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Maxine M. Chesney on January 26, 2009. (mmcsec, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/26/2009)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Furnace v. Sullivan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Terran Furnace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Sullivan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Morales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Soto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?