Alemozaffar v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Plaintiff: Mehrdad Alemozaffar
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco, Jesse Serna, Gary Moriyama, J McGrath, J. Reymundo and G. Coviello
Case Number: 3:2007cv04494
Filed: August 30, 2007
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of California
Office: San Francisco Office
County: San Francisco
Presiding Judge: Jeffrey S. White
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER GRANTING 130 REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/4/10. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/4/2010)
August 31, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER GRANTING 124 Stipulation TO CONTINUE THE 9/4/2009 CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 8/31/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 8/31/2009)
July 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER Granting 122 Stipulation to Continue Case Management Conference. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on July 9, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 7/9/2009)
April 24, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 118 ORDER VACATING PENDING DEADLINES AND SETTING A FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/24/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/24/2009)
April 14, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER GRANTING 115 Stipulation RE: GAG ORDER. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/14/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/14/2009)
April 8, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER (1) Continuing Dates; (2) Granting Request to Hear Motion for Gag Order on Shortened Time; and (3) Setting a Hearing on Defendants Motion to Change Venue. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 4/8/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/8/2009)
March 30, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER Granting re 101 Stipulation Regarding Expert Discovery filed by Mehrdad Alemozaffar. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/30/09. (fj, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/30/2009)
March 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER DENYING 96 Plaintiff's request. In the future, the parties shall address all requests to the Court in pleading form. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/23/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/23/2009)
March 19, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 93 Notice of Questions. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on March 19, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/19/2009)
March 13, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER GRANTING 80 MOTION to Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 3/13/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 3/13/2009)
February 26, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER re Requests to File Documents Under Seal. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 26, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/26/2009)
February 12, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER GRANTING 71 Stipulation Re: Deadline to Complete Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/12/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/12/2009)
February 11, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 72 ORDER GRANTING 66 MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages re Reply to Motion for Partial Summary Judgment . Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/11/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/11/2009) Modified on 2/11/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
February 10, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER 1) Permitting Supplemental Reply Brief; 2) Continuing Hearing; and 3) Order to Show Cause. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 2/10/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/10/2009)
February 4, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER Granting 64 Stipulation re Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on February 4, 2009. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/4/2009)
January 5, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND PRETRIAL DATES. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on 1/5/09. (jjo, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/5/2009) Modified on 1/5/2009 (jjo, COURT STAFF).
December 15, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER Granting 47 Stipulation re Expert Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 15, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/15/2008)
December 3, 2008 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting 42 Stipulation re Discovery. Signed by Judge Jeffrey S. White on December 3, 2008. (jswlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 12/3/2008)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alemozaffar v. City and County of San Francisco et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehrdad Alemozaffar
Represented By: Jeremy Daniel Cloyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of San Francisco
Represented By: Sean F. Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesse Serna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J McGrath
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Reymundo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Coviello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?